Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Duke Realty Limited Partnership, Insurance Company Of The West, Madrigal, Adriana Quintero, Marquez, Rafael Carvajal, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Fisher, Edward D., The Law Offices Of Arash Khorsandi, Pc, against Does 2-100, Duke Realty Corporation, Duke Realty Limited Partnership, Genie Industries, Inc., Gregg Electric, Inc., (total of 12) See All represented by Friedenthal, Heffernan & Brown, Llp, Haight Brown & Bonesteel, Haight Brown & Bonesteel Llp, Horton, Oberrecht & Kirkpatrick, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Donald Alvarez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald Alvarez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Non-Motor Vehicle Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 11, 2020Summons Issued on
Date: September 02, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: September 25, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: August 28, 2020Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: August 25, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 11, 2020Notice Sent re:
Date: August 21, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: October 07, 2020Notice Sent re:
Date: October 13, 2020Answer Filed
Date: September 24, 2020Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: June 11, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 28, 2020Answer Filed
Date: September 02, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: June 11, 2020Motion Filed
Date: August 26, 2020Reply Filed
Date: September 17, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: October 13, 2020Answer Filed
Date: December 07, 2020Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: November 24, 2020Notice Filed
Date: December 10, 2020Answer Filed
Date: November 09, 2020Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: December 04, 2020Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: November 24, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 09, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 15, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 24, 2020Dismissal Filed as to Complaint
Date: October 12, 2021Demurrer Filed
Date: February 22, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 25, 2020Stipulation & Order filed
Date: March 11, 2022Compendium of Exhibits ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: February 06, 2024Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: February 18, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 12, 2023Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 08, 2021Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint
Date: October 13, 2022Answer Filed
Date: February 08, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 23, 2020Separate Statement Filed
Date: July 07, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order
Date: July 05, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: January 14, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: January 10, 2022Declaration re:
Date: July 07, 2021Notice Filed
Date: July 07, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: January 10, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 18, 2022Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 27, 2023Answer Filed
Date: January 15, 2021Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Judgment by Court filed
Date: July 15, 2022Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed
Date: May 13, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 01, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: November 02, 2020Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: January 10, 2022Proof of Service
Date: December 05, 2023Amended Answer Filed
Date: February 22, 2021Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: June 24, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: May 05, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: February 01, 2022Reply Filed
Date: December 30, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment Filed
Date: December 05, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 29, 2021Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice Filed
Date: December 06, 2021Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: January 27, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 21, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: August 10, 2023Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: June 12, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: April 08, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: July 28, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: July 07, 2021Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: March 30, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 30, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: July 21, 2022Demurrer Filed
Date: November 02, 2020Separate Statement Filed
Date: June 12, 2023At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: March 29, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 03, 2020Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: December 21, 2021Declaration re:
Date: July 07, 2021Declaration ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: February 06, 2024Stipulation & Order filed
Date: October 17, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: December 05, 2023Dismissal Filed as to:
Date: September 07, 2023Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: July 07, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: April 08, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: June 12, 2023At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: March 30, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: October 06, 2023Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: June 12, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 23, 2023Declaration re:
Date: July 07, 2021Separate Statement ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: February 06, 2024Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: December 02, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: December 05, 2023Complaint in Intervention Filed
Date: October 13, 2020Rqst for Judicial Notice ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: February 06, 2024Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: April 01, 2021Evidentiary Objections ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: February 06, 2024Answer Filed
Date: May 13, 2022(Proposed) Order re Evidentiary Obj ISO Opp Electronic Filed
Date: February 06, 2024Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: October 25, 2022Reply Filed
Date: November 21, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: May 09, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: August 11, 2023Answer Filed
Date: November 05, 2020Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 17, 2023Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: June 12, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 30, 2023Amended Complaint Filed
Date: June 20, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: April 07, 2022Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: February 06, 2024Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: January 18, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 23, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: July 28, 2020Motion Filed
Date: August 24, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 28, 2020Answer Filed
Date: August 25, 2020Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: September 02, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 26, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: August 03, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 28, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 11, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 11, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: August 26, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
March 21, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
February 20, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Compendium of Exhibits ISO Opposition Filed Electronically | |
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration ISO Opposition Filed Electronically | |
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement ISO Opposition Filed Electronically Separate Statement ISO Opposition Filed Electronically |
|
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Rqst for Judicial Notice ISO Opposition Filed Electronically Request for Judicial Notice ISO Opposition Filed Electronically |
|
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Evidentiary Objections ISO Opposition Filed Electronically | |
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
(Proposed) Order re Evidentiary Obj ISO Opp Electronic Filed (Proposed) Order re Evidentiary Obj ISO Opposition Electronically Filed |
|
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Opposition to Motion Filed Electronically |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.