Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Williams, Barbara, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kashani, Jonathan M, against Maldonado, Mariclare, Wilson, Troy, represented by Ford Walker Haggerty & Behar, Mcclaugherty & Associates, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Jay H Robinson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJay H Robinson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Motor Vehicle Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 20, 2024Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: October 08, 2021Instructions to the jury-given-filed
Date: February 20, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: October 24, 2022Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically
Date: November 30, 2023Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: February 01, 2023Notice Filed
Date: November 21, 2023Proof of Service
Date: November 16, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: January 10, 2023Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: February 07, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 27, 2022Index of Exhibits
Date: June 01, 2022Objection Filed
Date: October 24, 2022Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: June 01, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: June 01, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: October 27, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 01, 2021Amended Answer/Response Filed
Date: January 27, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 02, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 07, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: November 05, 2021Ex Parte Order Filed
Date: August 02, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: February 13, 2020Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: June 02, 2022Demurrer Filed
Date: November 05, 2021Notice Filed Re:
Date: March 10, 2020Reply Filed
Date: December 07, 2021Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 21, 2020Notice
Date: December 30, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: December 16, 2021Answer Filed
Date: October 29, 2021Answer Filed
Date: December 14, 2021Notice Filed
Date: January 07, 2022Notice Filed
Date: February 01, 2021Ex Parte Application
Date: January 10, 2023Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically
Date: November 30, 2023Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: November 05, 2021Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically
Date: November 30, 2023Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically
Date: November 30, 2023Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically
Date: November 30, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 10, 2023Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically
Date: December 05, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: December 05, 2023Proof of Service
Date: December 05, 2023Notice of Association of Counsel for Plaintiff Filed
Date: November 16, 2023Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically
Date: December 05, 2023Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: December 12, 2022Declaration re:
Date: September 21, 2022Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically
Date: November 29, 2023Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically
Date: November 30, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 06, 2023Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: December 05, 2023Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: October 20, 2021Declaration re:
Date: November 05, 2021Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically
Date: December 05, 2023Motion re:
Date: December 04, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 17, 2021Trial Setting Order filed
Date: March 06, 2023Order signed and Filed
Date: December 14, 2021Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically
Date: December 06, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 24, 2022Proof of Service
Date: December 07, 2023Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically
Date: December 06, 2023Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: January 29, 2024Witness List Filed
Date: January 30, 2024Separate Statement Filed
Date: October 24, 2022Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically
Date: December 08, 2023Instructions to the jury-given-filed
Date: February 14, 2024Statement of Case Filed Electronically
Date: December 06, 2023Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically
Date: December 06, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: October 18, 2022Notice Filed
Date: December 07, 2023Statement of Case Filed Electronically
Date: December 07, 2023Reply Filed
Date: November 01, 2022Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically
Date: December 07, 2023Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically
Date: December 06, 2023Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically
Date: December 06, 2023Notice Filed
Date: December 06, 2023Jury Question Filed
Date: February 02, 2024Motion re:
Date: December 08, 2023Notice Filed
Date: December 07, 2023Proof of Service
Date: December 08, 2023Jury Fees Posted
Date: February 15, 2024Jury Fees Posted
Date: February 09, 2024Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: December 05, 2023Exhibits List Filed
Date: February 21, 2024Ex Parte Application
Date: August 01, 2022Motion Filed
Date: January 10, 2023Motion re:
Date: September 21, 2022Proof of Service
Date: February 14, 2024Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: March 27, 2023Notice
Date: August 09, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: November 18, 2022Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically
Date: November 30, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 12, 2022Exhibit List Filed Electronically
Date: December 08, 2023Instructions to the jury-given-filed
Date: February 05, 2024Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically
Date: December 07, 2023Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically
Date: December 08, 2023Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically
Date: December 11, 2023Jury Fees Posted
Date: February 05, 2024Notice Filed
Date: December 08, 2023Notice Filed
Date: February 14, 2024Verdict(s) form filed.
Date: February 15, 2024Jury Fees Posted
Date: February 05, 2024Jury Fees Posted
Date: February 20, 2024Jury Question Filed
Date: February 20, 2024Special Verdict filed.
Date: February 20, 2024Jury Fees Posted
Date: February 15, 2024Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: March 06, 2023Non Opposition To The Motion Filed
Date: June 04, 2021Ex Parte Application
Date: March 03, 2023Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically
Date: November 29, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: January 24, 2020Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 09, 2020Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 11, 2022Notice Imaged
Date: January 24, 2020Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: February 20, 2020Answer Filed
Date: March 10, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: January 24, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 12, 2021Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint
Date: May 04, 2021Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted Filed
Date: January 24, 2020Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: January 24, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 11, 2020Separate Statement Filed
Date: December 20, 2020Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 23, 2020Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: January 11, 2021Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: March 10, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: July 24, 2020Motion to Set Aside
Date: November 10, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatorie
Date: December 20, 2020Jury Fees Posted
Date: February 09, 2024Amended Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 23, 2021Balance Due on Case
Date: March 15, 2023Instructions to the jury-given-filed
Date: February 20, 2024Notice Filed
Date: March 01, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 24, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 18, 2021Proof of Service
Date: November 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2024 |
Department S35 - SBJC
Judge: Robinson, Jay H |
||
March 27, 2024 |
Department S35 - SBJC
Judge: Robinson, Jay H |
||
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Exhibits List Filed | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Exhibit(s) & Exhibit List Received From Courtroom; Clerk's Copy Returned To Courtroom. |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed Proposed Instructions to the Jury |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Instructions to the jury-given-filed deliberation room |
|
February 20, 2024 |
Department S35 - SBJC
Judge: Robinson, Jay H |
||
February 20, 2024 |
Department S37 - SBJC
Judge: Lee, Corey G |
||
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Fees Posted 156.70 Paid on 2/20/24 for 2/20/24 Trial date. |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Question Filed #1 (labeled as question #6) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.