Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Lupian, Sigifredo, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Matern Law Group, against Gold Star Foods, Inc., A Delaware Corporation, represented by Sheppard,Mullin,Richter & Hampton, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Donald Alvarez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald Alvarez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2019 |
CategoryOther Employment Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Sigifredo Lupian, individually and on behalf of all other aggrieved employees, against Gold Star Foods, Inc., a Delaware corporation, and Does through 50, inclusive. The case number is CIVDS1936613 and it is assigned to the...
Notice Filed Re:
Date: June 03, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: October 13, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 21, 2022Response Filed to:
Date: September 23, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 22, 2022At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: October 20, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 23, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: September 15, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 22, 2022Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: March 25, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: September 15, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: September 15, 2021At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: June 01, 2020Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: April 22, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: September 23, 2021Reply to Motion re:
Date: September 30, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: September 23, 2021Motion to Stay
Date: March 25, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: April 22, 2022Declaration re:
Date: April 22, 2022Notice Imaged
Date: May 21, 2020Answer Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 15, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: April 28, 2022Declaration re:
Date: July 22, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: May 20, 2020Motion re:
Date: April 22, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: March 20, 2024Reply Filed
Date: July 28, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 08, 2024Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: March 01, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: July 22, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 10, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 28, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 04, 2019Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: December 02, 2022Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: December 04, 2019Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 04, 2019Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: October 10, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: March 21, 2024Reply to Motion re:
Date: April 28, 2022Proof of Service
Date: April 22, 2022Notice Imaged
Date: December 04, 2019Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: April 28, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: April 22, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: December 04, 2019Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: March 25, 2022Response Filed to:
Date: July 21, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: July 21, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: July 22, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: March 25, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: July 21, 2022Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 16, 2022Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: July 22, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Motion re:
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.