Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Henry, Billy C, Sunrise Ford Inc A California Corporation, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Consumer Law Office Of Robert Stempler, Apc, Hoddick, Larry R., against Bruncati, Daniel, Bruncati, James, Bruncati, Robert, Does 2 Through 50, Ford Motor Company, (total of 7) See All represented by Callahan Thompson Sherman & Caudill, Callahan Thompson Sherman & Caudill Llp, Cedar Adams Pc, Cedar Adams, P.C., Law Office Of Michael Geller, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Jeffrey R Erickson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey R Erickson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2018 |
CategoryBusiness Tort |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a request for dismissal in a legal case. The plaintiff/petitioner is Billy C. Henry, and the defendant/respondent is Sunrise Ford, Inc. The case number is CIVDS1 822222. The request for dismissal form is filled out by attorneys Robe...
Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 02, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 18, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: March 03, 2020Separate Statement Filed
Date: March 07, 2023Notice Filed Re:
Date: February 08, 2019At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: February 14, 2020Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: August 08, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: February 25, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: August 19, 2020Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 07, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 02, 2023Amended Complaint Filed
Date: October 28, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 17, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 18, 2019Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 01, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: March 07, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: March 06, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: May 17, 2023Notice Filed Re:
Date: June 11, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: February 13, 2019Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: November 16, 2022At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: May 02, 2023Motion re:
Date: March 07, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: June 27, 2019Answer Filed
Date: October 14, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: October 28, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: March 06, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 07, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 03, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: November 26, 2019Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: October 30, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 26, 2020Notice Filed
Date: May 08, 2023Dismissal Filed as to Cause of Action
Date: August 13, 2019Stipulation & Order filed
Date: June 20, 2019Notice Filed
Date: November 15, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: May 06, 2019Reply Filed
Date: May 08, 2023Notice Filed Re:
Date: May 22, 2019Motion for Order
Date: August 02, 2022Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories
Date: March 06, 2023Answer Filed
Date: October 30, 2018Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed
Date: January 06, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 01, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 15, 2019Answer Filed
Date: September 24, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: August 02, 2022Declaration re:
Date: March 06, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: March 06, 2023At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: July 28, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: June 30, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 28, 2022Notice of Continuance Filed
Date: October 07, 2022Reply Filed
Date: May 08, 2023Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 07, 2022Motion re:
Date: July 25, 2022Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatorie
Date: March 06, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 11, 2022Notice
Date: August 28, 2023Stipulation and Order Filed
Date: September 13, 2023Notice
Date: August 28, 2023At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: September 11, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: February 08, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: April 28, 2022Summons Issued on
Date: June 16, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 20, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 23, 2018Objection Filed
Date: February 08, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 14, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 28, 2022Reply Filed
Date: August 18, 2022Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: August 23, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: January 18, 2019Brief Filed
Date: April 13, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: July 16, 2021Notice Imaged
Date: June 23, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: July 29, 2022Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: July 18, 2022Notice Filed
Date: June 24, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: June 11, 2021Declaration re:
Date: August 02, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 30, 2022Answer Filed
Date: January 17, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: December 04, 2019Reply Filed
Date: May 08, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 27, 2019Answer Filed
Date: December 09, 2022Declaration re:
Date: March 06, 2023Motion re:
Date: May 20, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: March 06, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: March 07, 2023Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: August 23, 2018Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Production of Doc
Date: June 11, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: February 17, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: August 29, 2022Conversion event
Date: August 19, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 05, 2019Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: August 28, 2018Separate Statement Filed
Date: July 16, 2021Notice Filed
Date: August 02, 2022Reply Filed
Date: July 12, 2022Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint
Date: March 22, 2022Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: March 14, 2022Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: May 15, 2023Amended Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 16, 2022At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: February 08, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: April 28, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: April 11, 2022Dismissal Filed as to Complaint
Date: June 29, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: August 19, 2020Objection Filed
Date: February 18, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: August 28, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: April 28, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 24, 2018Demurrer Filed
Date: August 24, 2022At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: April 13, 2023Reply Filed
Date: February 22, 2022Motion re:
Date: March 11, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: August 09, 2022Notice Filed
Date: June 24, 2022Ex Parte Application
Date: March 28, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: August 29, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: July 16, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: April 28, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 21, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: August 24, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 29, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 28, 2022Reply Filed
Date: February 17, 2022Notice Filed
Date: June 24, 2022Motion re:
Date: June 11, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 13, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 23, 2018Proof of service by Mail and Ack of receipt of service
Date: August 09, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: January 19, 2022Reply Filed
Date: July 19, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: February 08, 2022Reply Filed
Date: April 27, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: April 28, 2022At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: August 22, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: December 14, 2021Notice Imaged
Date: April 29, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 08, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: September 18, 2018Reply Filed
Date: April 28, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: May 27, 2022Brief Filed
Date: April 14, 2022Proof of Service
Date: February 08, 2022Notice Filed
Date: May 27, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: July 18, 2022Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: July 16, 2021Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: March 26, 2021Declaration re:
Date: February 17, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 03, 2022Stipulation and Order Filed
Date: August 10, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: August 09, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 23, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: August 23, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 14, 2022Reply to Motion re:
Date: April 28, 2022Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: March 11, 2022Objection Filed
Date: August 18, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: July 16, 2021Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Production of Doc
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2022-05-06T00:00:00Motion re:
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Motion re:
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Motion for Order
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Declaration re:
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2022-08-11T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2023 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
September 29, 2023 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Filed To continue mediation completion and further trial setting conference |
|
September 13, 2023 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
At-Issue Memorandum Filed filed by plaintiff |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Received File submit- Joint stip- Intake |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND CONSOLIDATING THE HEARINGS OF THREE MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF ??S MOTION PERMITTING PRETRIAL DISCOVERY RE DEFENDANTS PROFITS AND FINANCIAL CONDITION AND CONTINUING TRAIL SETTING CONFERENCE | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | At-Issue Memorandum Filed | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed on Plaintiff's Motions to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories (Set One), and Special Interrogatories (Set One ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.