Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Carrie Teasdale, Betty C, Carrie Teasdale, Betty C., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Cass, Michael Leroy, Cass, Peggy Lee, Does 1-10, Weaver, Peggy Lee, represented by Law Offices Of John F Mansour, Law Offices Of Michael J Ponce, Mansour Law Group, Mansour Law Group,Aplc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with David E Driscoll presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 10, 2017 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a second amended cross-complaint filed by Michael L. Cass, the defendant and cross-complainant, against Betty C. Carrie Teasdale and ROES 1-10, the cross-defendants. The case is filed in the Superior Court of the State of California...
Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 04, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 07, 2023Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 10, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 24, 2020Notice of Association of Counsel for Plaintiff Filed
Date: March 10, 2020Motion Filed
Date: July 10, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 09, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: July 13, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 03, 2022Motion Filed
Date: July 24, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 24, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 23, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 24, 2020Reply Filed
Date: September 04, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: August 24, 2020Motion Filed
Date: July 13, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: August 07, 2020Amended Complaint Filed
Date: June 30, 2022Comment: (Imaged)
Date: October 30, 2019Declaration re:
Date: June 17, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 05, 2023Stip re: jury Instructions/Verdict/Stay/Dispo Material filed
Date: July 11, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: June 09, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 23, 2024Notice Filed
Date: May 05, 2023Notice Filed
Date: June 29, 2023Objection Filed
Date: June 15, 2023Proof of Electronic Service
Date: June 08, 2022Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: October 21, 2020Notice of Cross Appeal Filed
Date: April 05, 2024Reply Filed
Date: September 04, 2019Clerk's Notification of Filing Cross Appeal
Date: April 08, 2024Objection Filed
Date: September 04, 2019Jury Fees Posted
Date: July 24, 2023Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: July 11, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 05, 2020Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: July 26, 2023Notice of Default on Appeal Filed
Date: April 03, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: July 10, 2018Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: May 18, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 28, 2019Objection Filed
Date: February 17, 2021Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint
Date: April 28, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 21, 2020Ex Parte Application
Date: February 28, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: February 17, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: August 03, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: April 28, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 03, 2021Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 17, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 17, 2021Statement of
Date: March 28, 2023Closing arguments presented by party.
Date: March 07, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 18, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 13, 2020Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: April 17, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Exhibits List Filed
Date: February 21, 2023Notice Filed
Date: September 01, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 05, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 14, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 21, 2023Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: June 15, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 28, 2023Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: September 14, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 07, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 15, 2022Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: September 18, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: March 07, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: January 05, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 17, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 20, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 31, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: July 10, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 14, 2018Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: January 05, 2018Comment: (Imaged)
Date: February 26, 2018Reply Filed
Date: July 12, 2018Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 22, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: July 09, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: February 16, 2018Declaration re:
Date: November 23, 2022Notice Filed Re:
Date: February 22, 2018Motion Filed
Date: June 13, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: March 14, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 10, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 02, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: February 22, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 27, 2017Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 21, 2017Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 23, 2017Notice Filed Re:
Date: June 19, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 19, 2018Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: March 26, 2018Notice of Association of Counsel for Plaintiff Filed
Date: June 27, 2019Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted Filed
Date: August 02, 2017Notice Filed Re:
Date: February 22, 2018Demurrer Filed
Date: August 02, 2017Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 17, 2018Motion Filed
Date: June 10, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: April 04, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 01, 2018Supplemental Complaint Filed
Date: February 16, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: June 10, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: June 19, 2018Motion re:
Date: November 23, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: September 13, 2017Motion Filed
Date: June 19, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 26, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 28, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: April 13, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 27, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 16, 2018Reply Filed
Date: September 06, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 22, 2018Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: July 10, 2017Declaration re:
Date: November 23, 2022Objection Filed
Date: July 03, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: January 05, 2018Motion Filed
Date: January 05, 2018Ex Parte Filed
Date: December 11, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 21, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: July 17, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: February 16, 2018Declaration re:
Date: November 23, 2022Objection Filed
Date: May 24, 2021Summons Issued on
Date: March 26, 2018Comment: (Imaged)
Date: July 17, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: July 10, 2017Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: February 21, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: August 28, 2018Proof of Electronic Service
Date: January 11, 2023Reply Filed
Date: February 26, 2019Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: March 28, 2019Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: February 16, 2018Points and Authorities Filed
Date: August 02, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 10, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 28, 2018Reply Filed
Date: May 24, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: August 28, 2018Jury Fees Posted
Date: August 10, 2023Motion Filed
Date: August 28, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 21, 2020Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: January 21, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: August 03, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: August 14, 2020Declaration re:
Date: August 26, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 19, 2019Motion Filed
Date: August 02, 2019Proof of Service
Date: August 31, 2022Proof of Service
Date: January 19, 2023Amended Complaint Filed
Date: December 11, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Trial Brief Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Notice Filed
Date: September 15, 2022Trial Brief Filed
Date: February 02, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 17, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 12, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 25, 2023Notice Filed Re:
Date: September 13, 2019Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 02, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 25, 2019Motion Filed
Date: July 10, 2018Answer Filed
Date: October 10, 2017Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: December 11, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: August 28, 2018Notice Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 02, 2023Exhibits List Filed
Date: February 02, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 20, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 20, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 24, 2020Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 02, 2023Motion re:
Date: November 23, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 28, 2018Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 02, 2023Points and Authorities Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Notice of Association of Counsel for Plaintiff Filed
Date: October 29, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 23, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: July 11, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: March 22, 2024Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 05, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: February 16, 2023Reply Filed
Date: August 24, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 08, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 21, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: September 09, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 08, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: June 17, 2022Answer Filed
Date: July 21, 2021Reply to Motion re:
Date: June 23, 2022Motion to Bifurcate
Date: December 29, 2021Declaration re:
Date: August 26, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 07, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 03, 2021Reply Filed
Date: October 13, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 05, 2020Proof of Service by Certified Mail as to:
Date: August 03, 2022Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: April 22, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: October 18, 2023Clerk's Notification of Filing Of Notice of Appeal Filed
Date: March 25, 2024Ex Parte Application
Date: June 06, 2022Response Filed to:
Date: March 28, 2023Proof of Service
Date: February 03, 2022Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 09, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 17, 2022Amended Document Filed re:
Date: February 17, 2023Notice of Association of Counsel for Plaintiff Filed
Date: April 01, 2022Reply Filed
Date: September 25, 2023Motion re:
Date: June 07, 2022Reply Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Brief Filed
Date: March 21, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: February 03, 2021Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: January 23, 2024Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: March 22, 2024Objection Filed
Date: June 15, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: June 23, 2022Objection Filed
Date: September 18, 2023Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal
Date: March 22, 2024Declaration re:
Date: June 08, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 10, 2023Motion re:
Date: June 08, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: October 05, 2020Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: March 21, 2023Proof of Electronic Service
Date: August 23, 2023Notice Filed
Date: August 03, 2022Declaration re:
Date: August 03, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: March 22, 2024Trial Brief Filed
Date: July 07, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 21, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 28, 2023Notice Filed
Date: August 23, 2023Receipt of Records/Exhibits filed
Date: August 10, 2023Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: July 06, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 06, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 02, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: February 20, 2019Notice Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 02, 2023Comment: (Imaged)
Date: August 16, 2018Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 02, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: July 02, 2019Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 02, 2023Special Verdict filed.
Date: August 10, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: September 06, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 24, 2018Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: April 11, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 11, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 02, 2023Notice Filed Re:
Date: March 07, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: July 17, 2018Reply Filed
Date: July 31, 2018Trial Brief Filed
Date: February 02, 2023Dismissal Filed as to Cause of Action
Date: May 01, 2019Ex Parte Application
Date: December 29, 2021Declaration re:
Date: November 23, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 18, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: September 06, 2018Order Filed Re:
Date: September 28, 2018Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 06, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 21, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 10, 2019Summons Issued and Filed
Date: July 10, 2017Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 24, 2021Comment: (Imaged)
Date: August 16, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 16, 2018Amended Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: June 21, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: September 06, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 24, 2022Reply Filed
Date: November 27, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 07, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 24, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: August 03, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 02, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 02, 2019Reply Filed
Date: August 31, 2022Trial Brief Filed
Date: February 02, 2023Answer Filed
Date: January 10, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 26, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Witness List Filed
Date: February 02, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Motion Filed
Date: February 21, 2019Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 02, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Notice Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 25, 2020Jury Fees Posted
Date: August 15, 2023Declaration re:
Date: August 26, 2019Declaration re:
Date: August 26, 2019Notice
Date: March 28, 2023Jury Fees Posted
Date: August 15, 2023Jury Fees Posted
Date: August 15, 2023Motion Filed
Date: June 23, 2020Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: January 02, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: July 10, 2018Answer Filed
Date: April 24, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: September 06, 2018Answer Filed
Date: December 12, 2018Motion Filed
Date: January 25, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 09, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 22, 2018Comment: (Imaged)
Date: September 11, 2018Proof of Service
Date: January 11, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: August 28, 2018Motion Filed
Date: October 16, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 10, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: November 19, 2018Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: November 09, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 13, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 19, 2018Notice Sent re:
Date: September 12, 2018Comment: (Imaged)
Date: August 16, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 17, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: July 10, 2017Summons Issued on
Date: February 16, 2018Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: March 26, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 31, 2018Amended Document Filed re:
Date: July 13, 2023Reply Filed
Date: August 09, 2018Peremptory Challenge Under CCP 170.6 Filed
Date: July 11, 2017Ex-Parte Motion Filed re:
Date: April 10, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 02, 2019Reply Filed
Date: February 16, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 28, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 11, 2018Motion Filed
Date: July 02, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 16, 2018Motion to Strike
Date: August 03, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: June 13, 2018Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: June 21, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 02, 2023Answer Filed
Date: March 26, 2018Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: July 11, 2017Motion Filed
Date: March 14, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 11, 2023Comment: (Imaged)
Date: September 11, 2018Amended Answer/Response Filed
Date: July 23, 2021Proof of Electronic Service
Date: September 26, 2022Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: November 29, 2022Declaration re:
Date: August 03, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Declaration re:
Date: November 23, 2022Proof of Service
Date: January 19, 2023Answer Filed
Date: September 26, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 02, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 02, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: April 17, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 19, 2018Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 02, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Statement of Case Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Reply to Motion re:
Date: January 18, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 11, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 22, 2018Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 02, 2023Jury Fees Posted
Date: August 15, 2023Reply Filed
Date: August 31, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: July 17, 2018Notice Sent re:
Date: September 12, 2018Trial Brief Filed
Date: February 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2024 |
Department S22 - SBJC
Judge: Driscoll, David E |
||
April 11, 2024 |
Department S22 - SBJC
Judge: Driscoll, David E |
||
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Received from Postal Service Clerk's Notification of Filing of Notice of Appeal - Mansour Law Group - No forwarding address |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Clerk's Notification of Filing Cross Appeal | |
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cross Appeal Filed against cross-respondent |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default on Appeal Filed Failure to timely designte record on appeal |
|
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notification of Filing Of Notice of Appeal Filed Sent to parties |
|
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Appeal Packet Forwarded To The Court Of Appeal On This Date | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed of Michael J Ponce ISO Motion for Reasonable Attorney's Fees/Costs |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion for Attorney Fees Reasonable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.