Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bartoshuk, Barbara, filed a(n) (16) Unlimited Fraud case against Bruce Roberts, Agent, Hopkins & Carley A Law Corporation ,, Hopkins & Carley, A Law Corporation, Roberts, Bruce, Whittesley, Carleen, represented by Hansen, Craig A., Macleod, Bruce D, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Leland Davis III presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management113 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2014 |
Category(16) Unlimited Fraud |
Time To Trial1782 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions175 days |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Management Statement
Date: October 09, 20186.24.22 Notice of Change in Suite Number
Date: June 24, 2022Request For Dismissal
Date: November 06, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: October 24, 2017Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: July 27, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: January 19, 2017Opposition
Date: October 20, 2016Notice
Date: February 14, 2018Conversion Action
Date: July 27, 2015Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: March 20, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 28, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: March 14, 2017Notice
Date: March 11, 2015Declaration in Support
Date: March 20, 2019Conversion Action
Date: June 22, 2015Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 09, 2015Motion to Stay
Date: April 29, 2019Joinder
Date: April 29, 2019Stipulation
Date: April 24, 2019Notice of Motion and Motion for Stay
Date: March 21, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 20, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: February 04, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: January 25, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: January 24, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: March 07, 2018Opposition
Date: February 28, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: October 31, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: October 23, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: August 18, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: August 15, 2017Case Management Conference
Date: June 21, 2017Case Management Conference
Date: May 31, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: May 23, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: May 16, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: May 15, 2017Case Management Conference
Date: March 29, 2017Case Management Conference
Date: February 01, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: January 17, 2017Case Management Conference
Date: November 02, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: October 31, 2016Reply
Date: October 25, 2016Reply
Date: October 24, 2016Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 18, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: September 22, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: September 20, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: July 06, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: June 22, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: June 10, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: April 07, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: April 04, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: March 28, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: October 01, 2015Notice
Date: September 18, 2015Order
Date: September 16, 2015Document
Date: September 23, 2015Notice
Date: July 27, 2015Notice
Date: June 04, 2015Notice
Date: June 08, 2015Order
Date: May 28, 2015Order
Date: May 28, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: May 05, 2015Document
Date: April 16, 2015Document
Date: April 15, 2015Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: April 09, 2015Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: April 09, 2015Reply Filed
Date: April 07, 2015Amended Answer
Date: April 02, 2015Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: April 02, 2015Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 30, 2015Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 30, 2015Motion
Date: March 30, 2015Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 30, 2015Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 30, 2015Motion
Date: March 30, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: March 12, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: March 11, 2015Document
Date: March 11, 2015Answer (Unlimited)
Date: March 06, 2015Answer (Unlimited)
Date: February 23, 2015Complaint
Date: December 04, 2014Notice
Date: August 25, 2015Document
Date: August 20, 2015Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: August 14, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: July 29, 2015Answer (Unlimited)
Date: July 27, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | 6.24.22 Notice of Change in Suite Number | |
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE COMPLAINT Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE COMPLAINT |
|
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL TIME ESTIMATE 10 DAYS
Judge: Davis, III, Leland |
|
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: Grandsaert, John L. |
|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Stay 04/29/2019 Motion to Stay AND/OR ABATE Judge: Greenberg, Susan |
|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Joinder 04/29/2019 Joinder OF DEFENDANT CARLEEN WHITTELSEY, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE STUART G WHITTELSEY JR. FAMILY TRUST TO CO-DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY Judge: Greenberg, Susan |
|
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation TO STAY THE CASE AND TOLL STATUTORY TIME TO TRIAL Stipulation TO STAY THE CASE AND TOLL STATUTORY TIME TO TRIAL |
|
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Respondent's brief received REPLY BRIEF FOR DEFENDANTS BRUCE ROBERTS AND HOPKINS & CARLEY'S MOTION T Respondent's brief received REPLY BRIEF FOR DEFENDANTS BRUCE ROBERTS AND HOPKINS & CARLEY'S MOTION TO STAY & NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION |
|
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Joinder OF DEFENDANT CARLEEN WHITTELSEY, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE STUART G WHITTELSEY JR. Joinder OF DEFENDANT CARLEEN WHITTELSEY, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE STUART G WHITTELSEY JR. FAMILY TRUST TO CO-DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.