Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hinojosa, Briana, filed a(n) Other Non Exempt Complaints case represented by Sutton, Joseph D., against Does 1-20, Inclusive, Off The Grid Services, Llc,, The Whole Cart, Llc,, represented by Schriner, Kyle L., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Ethan P. Schulman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEthan P. Schulman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2022 |
CategoryOther Non Exempt Complaints |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a class action complaint filed by Briana Hinojosa against The Whole Cart, LLC, Off the Grid Services, LLC, and Does 1-20. The complaint alleges various violations of labor laws and wage theft. The plaintiff claims that the defendant...
ORDER AFTER INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION 69816447)
Date: April 13, 2023MINUTES FOR APR-13-2023 9:00 AM
Date: April 13, 2023NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: December 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ORDER ASSIGINING COORDINIATION TRIAL JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 70747563) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HINOJOSA, BRIANA AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF THEMSELF, AND OTHERS PERSONS SIMILARLY-SITUATED | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER (ORDER RE: INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON PETITION FOR COORDINATION) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KIMBERLY EVANS (ALAMEDA CASE NO. 22CV018144) (TRANSACTION ID # 70469566) | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER (ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION MOTION JUDGE - JCCP 5280) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PETITIONER KIMBERLY EVANS (ALAMEDA CASE NO. 22CV018144 (TRANSACTION ID # 70419573) | |
June 02, 2023 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion To Stay This Action
Judge: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN |
|
May 24, 2023 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY THIS ACTION (TRANSACTION #70064073) | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLEX LITIGATION CALENDAR ON JUN-02-2023 IN DEPT. 304, NOTICE OF MOTION TO STAY THIS ACTION OFF CALENDAR PER COURT ORDER. (304) | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF JOSEPH D. SUTTON (TRANSACTION ID # 70045289) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HINOJOSA, BRIANA AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF THEMSELF, AND OTHERS PERSONS SIMILARLY-SITUATED | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF JOSEPH D. SUTTON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY (TRANSACTION ID # 70045289) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HINOJOSA, BRIANA AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF THEMSELF, AND OTHERS PERSONS SIMILARLY-SITUATED | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY (TRANSACTION ID # 70045289) (TRANSACTION ID # 70045289) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HINOJOSA, BRIANA AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF THEMSELF, AND OTHERS PERSONS SIMILARLY-SITUATED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.