Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Martin, Sean, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Choy, Randall Philip, Pro Per, against Does 1 To 50, Inclusive, Fenster, Christopher, Loftus, Shanon, represented by Dennis, O'Neil G, Leroux, Stephanie A, Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Joseph M. Quinn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 08, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Case Cycle Time933 days |
This complaint is a proof of service of summons and complaint in a legal case. The case number is CGC-14-538489 and it was filed on May 7, 2014. The plaintiff is Sean Martin and the defendant is Shanon Loftus. The document indicates that the summons ...
TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 15269006)
Date: September 28, 2015MINUTES FOR DEC-10-2015 9:00 AM
Date: December 10, 2015ORDER AWARDING PLAINTIFF SEAN MARTIN ATTORNEY FEES & COSTS FOR MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT.
Date: December 30, 2015CERTIFICATE OF MAILING (CCP SECTION 1013A(4)) OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT.
Date: January 21, 2016MINUTES FOR SEP-26-2016 1:30 PM
Date: September 26, 2016MINUTES FOR OCT-08-2015 10:00 AM
Date: October 08, 2015MINUTES FOR OCT-07-2015 10:00 AM
Date: October 07, 2015ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: June 19, 2015NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: April 08, 2014PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58086653) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTIN, SEAN AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: October 29, 2015ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: July 10, 2014AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT LOFTUS, SHANON AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: July 21, 2014ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ; POS FILED BY DEFENDANT LOFTUS, SHANON AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: June 02, 2014NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF(TRANSACTION ID # 58462686)
Date: January 21, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2016 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order Appointing Receiver To Enforce Judgment
Judge: JOSEPH M. QUINN |
|
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 59756827): PRO PER SUBSTITUTED FOR CHOY, RANDALL PHILIP AS ATTORNEY FOR MARTIN, SEAN AN INDIVIDUAL | |
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | TRIAL MOTION CALENDAR ON NOV-07-2016 IN DEPT. 514, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER TO ENFORCE JUDGMENT IS OFF CALENDAR PER REQUEST OF MOVING PARTY CHARLIE YU, ESQ BY TELEPHONE CALL. CASE HAS BEEN RESOLVED. (514) | |
October 24, 2016 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order Appointing Receiver To Enforce Judgment
Judge: JOSEPH M. QUINN |
|
October 21, 2016 | Docket Event | TRIAL MOTION IN DEPT. 514, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER TO ENFORCE JUDGMENT CONTINUED FROM OCT-24-2016 TO TRIAL DEPT. MOTION AT NOV-07-2016, 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 514 PER REQUEST OF MOVING PARTY CHARLIE YU, ESQ. COUNSEL TO GIVE NOTICE. (514) | |
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event | RELEASE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 59713975) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTIN, SEAN AN INDIVIDUAL | |
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | MINUTES FOR SEP-26-2016 1:30 PM | |
September 26, 2016 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order Appointing Receiver To Enforce Judgment
Judge: JOSEPH M. QUINN |
|
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | TRIAL MOTION IN DEPT. 514, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER TO ENFORCE JUDGMENT CONTINUED FROM SEP-26-2016 TO TRIAL DEPT. MOTION AT OCT-24-2016, 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 514 PER ORDER OF COURT. CHARLIE YU, ESQ., APPEARING WITH AND FOR SEAN MARTIN. DEFENDANTS SHANON LOFTUS AND CHRISTOPHER FENSTER APPEARING ON THEIR OWN BEHALF. JUDGE: JOSEPH M. QUINN, CLERK: A. MOK. PROCEEDINGS REPORTED BY: MITCH LYON, CSR#6840. | |
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event | REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER TO ENFORCE JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 59584210) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTIN, SEAN AN INDIVIDUAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.