Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Kelly, Patrick, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Pro Per, against Does 1-25 Inclusive, Jack Eugene Teeters, As Trustee Of The White,, Kelley, Shane Claridge, Shane Kelley, As Trustee Of The White, Thomas F., represented by Rotwein, Geoffrey, Swanson, Edward W, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Lynn O'Malley Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 02, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions65 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
VerdictDefendant |
Case Cycle Time1437 days |
This complaint is a document related to a legal case filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The case number is CGC-13-535823 and it was filed by David Yuen. The document is a proof of service, indicating that the plaintif...
MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELLY, PATRICK
Date: September 18, 2017CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: May 11, 2018CLERK'S NOTICE TO APPELLANT RE APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL
Date: April 27, 2018CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (APPEAL FILED 1-31-18)
Date: February 15, 2018MINUTES FOR OCT-30-2017 1:30 PM
Date: October 30, 2017MINUTES FOR OCT-25-2017 9:30 AM
Date: October 25, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION DEMURRER FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELLY, PATRICK
Date: April 08, 2016ORDER PURSUANT TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER ON DEMURRER
Date: March 13, 2014NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT KELLY, PATRICK
Date: April 02, 2014ORDER OVERRULING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 23, 2016PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT LIST (TRANSACTION ID # 61284787) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELLY, PATRICK
Date: October 25, 2017MINUTES FOR NOV-07-2017 1:30 PM
Date: November 07, 2017MINUTES FOR OCT-31-2017 9:00 AM
Date: October 31, 2017MINUTES FOR NOV-06-2017 9:00 AM
Date: November 06, 2017JURY VERDICT
Date: November 08, 2017MINUTES FOR NOV-02-2017 10:00 AM
Date: November 02, 2017MINUTES FOR NOV-08-2017 9:00 AM
Date: November 08, 2017ORDER TO RETURN ALL TRIAL EXHIBITS & DEPOSITIONS TO RESPECTIVE COUNSEL FOR SAFE KEEPING
Date: November 08, 2017ORDER - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES
Date: February 23, 2017ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO STRIKE AND COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY
Date: December 02, 2016ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' SECOND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: June 22, 2016MINUTES FOR SEP-20-2017 9:30 AM
Date: September 20, 2017ORDER DENYING THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE A141337 DIV 2
Date: April 04, 2014ORDER ON DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Date: February 05, 2014NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY PRO PER
Date: January 22, 2016OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELLY, PATRICK
Date: February 25, 2016CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: April 09, 2014NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: December 02, 2013MINUTES FOR OCT-23-2017 10:45 AM
Date: October 23, 2017OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELLY, PATRICK
Date: October 26, 2015ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SENT BY COURT
Date: June 29, 2016EXHIBITS A-E (TRANSACTION ID # 15203054) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELLY, PATRICK
Date: July 23, 2015ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' FIRST MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: June 22, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION DEMURRER FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELLY, PATRICK
Date: June 03, 2016DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELLY, PATRICK
Date: June 03, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15201076) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELLY, PATRICK
Date: July 21, 2015DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELLY, PATRICK
Date: April 08, 2016ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 11, 2017ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S TESTIMONY AND WITNESSES
Date: October 31, 2017DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELLY, PATRICK
Date: September 18, 2017NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT KELLY, PATRICK
Date: January 31, 2018REMITTITUR AFFIRMED A153667 DIV. 2
Date: March 27, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 18003024)
Date: January 04, 2018NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT KELLY, PATRICK
Date: January 31, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 61876581)
Date: April 04, 2018DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELLY, PATRICK
Date: December 31, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR AFFIRMED A153667 DIV. 2 | |
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION NOTICE | |
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event | APPEAL RECORD CERTIFIED TO THE COURT OF APPEAL - 2 VOLS CT, RT ATTACHED TO DESIGNATION [APPEAL FILED 1/31/18, A153667 DIV 2] | |
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event | COSTS OF PREPARATION ON APPEAL DEPOSITED (TRANSACTION ID # 18126038) BY RESPONDENT KELLEY, SHANE CLARIDGE AS EXECUTOR OF THE THOMAS F. WHITE ESTATE | |
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event | CLERK'S ESTIMATE OF COST OF APPEAL RECORD SENT TO RESPONDENT, ESTIMATED COST $430.00 | |
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event | CLERK'S NOTICE TO APPELLANT RE APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL | |
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 61876581) | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF KELLY, PATRICK TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT SHANE KELLEY, AS TRUSTEE OF THE WHITE, THOMAS F. 1991 TRUST ON THE COMPLAINT, SAID DEFENDANT TO HAVE JUDGMENT THEREON FOR $21,185.91 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $21,185.91, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (APPEAL FILED 1-31-18) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KELLY, PATRICK AS TO DEFENDANT SHANE KELLEY, AS TRUSTEE OF THE WHITE, THOMAS F. 1991 TRUST | |
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event | CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (APPEAL FILED 1-31-18) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.