Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Angeles, Monica, Franchise Tax Board, Kingston Wellness, Inc., filed a(n) Civil case represented by Geghamyan, Hasmik, Vazquez, Lauren A., against Angeles, Monica, represented by Geghamyan, Hasmik, Kumin, Matthew, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 18, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions277 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time2069 days |
This complaint is a notice of ruling in a legal case between Kingston Wellness, Inc. and Monica Angeles. The notice states that on September 14, 2016, Judge Harold Kahn overruled Cross-Defendant Kingston Wellness, Inc.'s demurrer to the second amende...
ORDER GRANTING FOURTH EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: December 22, 2014PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PLAINTIFF KINGSTON WELLNESS, INC.
Date: October 17, 2014ORDER RE REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES A141624 DIV 5
Date: April 25, 2014SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT ANGELES, MONICA
Date: April 21, 2015SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT ANGELES, MONICA
Date: June 15, 2016NOTICE OF STATE TAX LIEN (TRANSACTION ID # 15025015) FILED BY CLAIMANT FRANCHISE TAX BOARD
Date: January 26, 2015NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: November 18, 2013ORDER ISSUTING ALTERNATIVE WRIT OF MANDATE (A141624 DIV. 5)
Date: May 20, 2014ORDER RE BRIEFS ETAL A141624 DIV 5 (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT)
Date: April 25, 2014ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FOR KINGSTON WELLNESS INC
Date: May 27, 2014ORDER SUSTAINING CROSS-DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: May 03, 2016ORDER OVERRULING CROSS-DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: September 14, 2016ORDER DENYING CROSS-DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: September 14, 2016ORDER RE: DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: October 20, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2019 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUL-30-2019 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event | KINGSTON WELLNESS INC PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 63301709) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KINGSTON WELLNESS, INC. | |
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 63301663) | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $60.00 FOR TRANSACTION (), PAYABLE TO LAUREN A VAZQUEZ, DOC #1909486650, WARRANT #38205532, DATED DEC-06-2018 | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $20.00 FOR TRANSACTION (), PAYABLE TO LAUREN A VAZQUEZ, DOC #1909486654, WARRANT #38205532, DATED DEC-06-2018 | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $30.00 FOR TRANSACTION (), PAYABLE TO LAUREN A VAZQUEZ, DOC #1909486652, WARRANT #38205532, DATED DEC-06-2018 | |
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $20.00 FOR TRANSACTION (), PAYABLE TO LAUREN VASQUEZ, DOC #1909177624, WARRANT #38177335, DATED JUL-10-2018 | |
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $20.00 FOR TRANSACTION (), PAYABLE TO LAUREN VASQUEZ, DOC #1909177623, WARRANT #38177335, DATED JUL-10-2018 | |
June 19, 2018 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.