Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Leeman Phd, Whitney R, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Chanler, Clifford A, Hoffner, David S., against Dean Distributors, Inc, Does 1 To 150, Inclusive, represented by Gruppie, Guy R., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with John Kennedy Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn Kennedy Stewart Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions511 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time605 days |
This complaint is a proof of service of summons and complaint document in a legal case. The case number is CGC-13-533956 and it was filed on Oct-09-2013. The plaintiff is Whitney R. Leeman, Ph.D. and the defendant is Dean Distributors, Inc. The docum...
NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY DAVID S. HOFFNER TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY DEC-24-2014
Date: November 12, 2014NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: August 30, 2013ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT DEAN DISTRIBUTORS, INC
Date: October 15, 2013ORDER APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT JUDGMENT
Date: February 26, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2015 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAY-05-2015 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 56869721) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEEMAN PHD, WHITNEY R | |
February 26, 2015 | Tentative Ruling |
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Approve Proposition 65 Settlement And Consent Judgment Matter on calendar for Thursday, February 26 2015, Line 10, PLAINTIFF WHITNEY LEEMAN Motion To Approve Proposition...
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
|
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: - JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO TERMS OF PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT JUDGMENT - SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT JUDGMENT | |
February 26, 2015 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Approve Proposition 65 Settlement And Consent Judgment
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
|
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR FEB-26-2015 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, MOTION TO APPROVE PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. ORDER AND CONSENT JUDGMENT SIGNED. JUDGE: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH; CLERK: SEAN KANE; REPORTER: PAULA J. SHI, CSR #13358; DEPT. 302. (302/EHG) | |
January 26, 2015 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.