Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ebarle, David, Rubeshaw, Robert, Jackson, T'Jade, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cipinko, Sanford Michael, against City And C0Unty Of San Francisco, Does 1 To 50, Ebarle, David, Rubeshaw, Robert, represented by Ammons, David W., Toschi, Steven Craig, Trembath, Robin Yvonne, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Cynthia Ming-mei Lee presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 14, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions206 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time498 days |
This complaint is a cross-complaint filed by Robert Rubeshaw against David Ebarle and Does 1-20. Rubeshaw alleges that the cross-defendants are responsible for injuries and damages sustained by the plaintiff, T Jade Jackson. Rubeshaw claims that if h...
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY TOSCHI, STEVEN CRAIG
Date: May 28, 2013SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT RUBESHAW, ROBERT
Date: October 02, 2012DEMAND FOR JURY FILED BY DEFENDANT EBARLE, DAVID
Date: August 21, 2012REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND C0UNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO
Date: August 10, 2012NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: May 14, 2012AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT EBARLE, DAVID
Date: September 11, 2012ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT EBARLE, DAVID
Date: August 10, 2012ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT RUBESHAW, ROBERT
Date: August 06, 2012ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND C0UNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO
Date: August 10, 2012ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT OF ROBERT RUBESHAW FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT EBARLE, DAVID
Date: October 02, 2012NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF JACKSON, T'JADE
Date: July 03, 2013STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER FILED BY EBARLE, DAVID JACKSON, T'JADE
Date: November 01, 2012ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT RUBESHAW, ROBERT
Date: October 01, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2013 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
September 24, 2013 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF OCT-08-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
August 19, 2013 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
July 31, 2013 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
July 23, 2013 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-19-2013 - CASE SETTLED PER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED ON 7/3/13. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON OCT-08-2013 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206) | |
July 22, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF CIPINKO, SANFORD MICHAEL ON AUG-25-2013 THROUGH SEP-10-2013 FILED BY PLAINTIFF JACKSON, T'JADE | |
July 18, 2013 | Tentative Ruling |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Matter on Calendar for Thursday, July 18, 2013, Line 10, DEFENDANT CITY AND C0UNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO's MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Off calendar. Notice of Settlement filed ...
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
|
July 18, 2013 | Hearing |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
|
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANT CITY AND C0UNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED ON JULY 3, 2013. UDGE: ERNEST GOLDSMITH, CLERK: LESLEY FISCELLA, NOT REPORTED. | |
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUL-18-2013 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.