Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Moore, Harvey M., against Lim, Lorraine, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Peter J. Busch presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 02, 2011 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time1262 days |
This complaint is a proof of service of summons and complaint in a case between Citibank, N.A. and Lorraine Lim. The document provides details of the service of the summons and complaint to Lorraine Lim. The service was made by substituted service, w...
ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (DENYING, IN PART)
Date: February 13, 2013NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67394458)
Date: March 15, 2022WAIVER OF INTEREST FILED BY PLAINTIFF CITIBANK, N.A.
Date: July 23, 2012WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY PLAINTIFF CITIBANK, N.A.
Date: July 23, 2012AMENDED ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION- WAGE GARNISHMENT (DENIED IN PART)
Date: March 11, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE ON APPLICATION AND NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67408343) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CITIBANK, N.A. SERVED MAR-19-2022, MAIL AS TO DEFENDANT LIM, LORRAINE AN INDIVIDUAL PROCESS COMPLETED BY DEFAULT SECTION. WRIT MAY ISSUE ON APR-25-2022 IF NO MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC. 683.110 C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CITIBANK, N.A. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT LIM, LORRAINE AN INDIVIDUAL $20,232.33 PRINCIPAL, $4,442.90 INTEREST, $45.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $24,720.23, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT ALL FURTHER PROCESSING TO BE DONE BY DEFAULT SECTION | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67394458) | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67394458) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CITIBANK, N.A. AS TO DEFENDANT LIM, LORRAINE AN INDIVIDUAL NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | COST BILL, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $4,442.90 INTEREST, $45.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 67394458) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CITIBANK, N.A. | |
April 17, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, PARTIALLY SATISFIED IN THE SUM OF $389.22 AS TO DEFENDANT LIM, LORRAINE AN INDIVIDUAL | |
March 11, 2013 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION- WAGE GARNISHMENT (DENIED IN PART) | |
February 13, 2013 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION Set for hearing on Wednesday, February 13, 2013, Line 13, PLAINTIFF CITIBANK, N.A.'S HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION Denied, in part. The court orders wage garnishment of $...
Judge: PETER J. BUSCH |
|
February 13, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (DENYING, IN PART) | |
February 13, 2013 | Hearing |
HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION
Judge: PETER J. BUSCH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.