Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Alber, William Francis, Northern California Collection Service, Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Cribb, Steven D, Lelievre, Andre J, against Alber, William Francis, Does 1 To 10, W.F. Albert Seafoods, Inc, William Francis Alber As An Individual And Dba, represented by Smith, James, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Marla J. Miller presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 20, 2011 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions483 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1046 days |
This complaint is a cross-complaint filed by William Alber against North Coast Fisheries, Inc. and other defendants. Alber alleges that he had a wholesale seafood business and had a long-standing relationship with Costco and North Coast Fisheries. In...
DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10
Date: October 15, 2012NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE, INC.
Date: April 14, 2014SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT ALBER, WILLIAM FRANCIS DBA W.F. ALBER
Date: December 12, 2013DECLARATION CCP 585 FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE, INC.
Date: October 15, 2012NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: June 20, 2011DECLARATION CCP 1033 FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE, INC.
Date: October 15, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
April 28, 2014 | Tentative Ruling |
Mtn To Recall And Quash Writ Matter on calendar for Monday, April 28, 2014, Line 4: DEFENDANT WILLIAM ALBER'S Motion To Recall And Quash Writ Off calendar per the notice of settlement filed on April 1...
Judge: MARLA J. MILLER |
|
April 28, 2014 | Hearing |
Mtn To Recall And Quash Writ
Judge: MARLA J. MILLER |
|
April 28, 2014 | Hearing |
DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT
Judge: MARLA J. MILLER |
|
April 28, 2014 | Hearing |
Re-Notice Of Motion And Motion To Recall And Quash Writ Of Execution And To Return Improperly Seized Assets;
Judge: MARLA J. MILLER |
|
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR APR-28-2014 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION, 302, CROSS DEFENDANT NORTH COAST FISHERIES, INC.'S DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT IS OFF CALENDAR PER THE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED ON APRIL 14, 2014. JUDGE: MARLA J. MILLER; CLERK: GINA GONZALES; REPORTER: SHERRY SAWYER CSR# 5976. | |
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION, 302, DEFENDANT WILLIAM ALBER'S MOTION TO RECALL AND QUASH WRIT IS OFF CALENDAR PER THE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED ON APRIL 14, 2014. JUDGE: MARLA J. MILLER; CLERK: GINA GONZALES; REPORTER: SHERRY SAWYER CSR# 5976. | |
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION, 302, CROSS COMPLAINANT WILLIAM ALBER'S RE-NOTICED MOTION TO RECALL AND QUASH WRIT OF EXECUTION AND TO RETURN IMPROPERLY SEIZED ASSETS IS OFF CALENDAR PER THE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED ON APRIL 14, 2014. JUDGE: MARLA J. MILLER; CLERK: GINA GONZALES; REPORTER: SHERRY SAWYER CSR# 5976. | |
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE, INC. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.