Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bode Concrete Llc, Cardinal Consulting Inc., Construction Testing Services, Inc., Kerman Morris Architects, Llp, Santos & Urrutia Associates, Inc., (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Civil case represented by Angel, Gary Allen, Lowenthal, Jeffrey Howard, Bauman, Richard Keith, Freedman, Karren Lee, Furukawa, Bruce N, (total of 7) See All against Al Norman Mechanical, Inc., Cardinal Consulting Inc., Construction Testing Services, Construction Testing Services, Inc., Cullinane Construction, (total of 11) See All represented by Angel, Gary Allen, Cominos, Dion Nicholas, Dion, Coque K., Dooling, John G, Gary, Todd B, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Cynthia Ming-mei Lee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia Ming-mei Lee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 07, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions149 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time1141 days |
This complaint is a document related to a case in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The case number is CGC-10-498405 and it was filed by Maryann E. Moran. The complaint is between Performing Arts LLC and Killarney Constructio...
ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT BODE CONCRETE LLC
Date: March 20, 2012NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY ATTORNEY FREEDMAN, KARREN LEE
Date: September 26, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT KERMAN MORRIS ARCHITECTS, LLP
Date: July 03, 2012NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY MARTIN, SUZANNE M.
Date: October 25, 2012NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY DOOLING, JOHN G
Date: January 03, 2013NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT OF JURY FEES
Date: January 28, 2013ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS: GARY, TODD B ADDED AS ATTORNEY FOR CULLINANE CONSTRUCTION
Date: March 01, 2012ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT SANTOS & URRUTIA ASSOCIATES, INC.
Date: February 16, 2012ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CARDINAL CONSULTING INC.
Date: October 25, 2010SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT BODE CONCRETE LLC
Date: March 20, 2012REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY DEFTS
Date: November 18, 2011ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO INTERVENE
Date: February 07, 2011ORDER - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: January 31, 2012ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT CARDINAL CONSULTING INC.
Date: December 02, 2010GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT MID-MARKET DEVELOPMENET COMPANY, INC.
Date: August 19, 2010ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 03, 2010GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT MURRAY, MICHAEL
Date: August 19, 2010NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: April 07, 2010ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: March 23, 2012ORDER DENYING CONSTRUCTION TESTING'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: March 23, 2012REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: June 08, 2012STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE FILED BY DEFENDANT CARDINAL CONSULTING INC.
Date: June 08, 2012REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN OPPOS OF MTN TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCO RESPONSES
Date: September 10, 2012ORDER AND STIPULATION FOR MOTION TO BE HEARD BY A MEMBER OF THE CA BAR SERVING AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE
Date: September 21, 2012ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY
Date: March 19, 2012OPPOSITION TO SEPARATE STATEMENT; POS FILED BY DEFENDANT CULLINANE CONSTRUCTION
Date: March 16, 2012SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLAINT TO CROSS COMPLAINANT CARDINAL CONSULTING INC.
Date: October 25, 2010ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT KERMAN MORRIS ARCHITECTS, LLP
Date: March 08, 2012ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT (ASPEN INSURANCE UK, LTD)
Date: January 02, 2013DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT KERMAN MORRIS ARCHITECTS, LLP
Date: August 16, 2012NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT BODE CONCRETE LLC
Date: September 26, 2012ORDER DENYING CARDINAL CONSULTING, INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 24, 2012ORDER DENYING CONSTRUCTION TESTING'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 24, 2012POS OF SUMMONS AND X-COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT BODE CONCRETE LLC
Date: March 22, 2012DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY BODE CONCRETE LLC
Date: May 10, 2013DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE
Date: April 24, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event | BALANCE OF CASE DISMISSED BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING MAY-21-2013 AT 10:30 AM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 21, 2013 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
May 21, 2013 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR MAY-21-2013 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610 | |
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY BODE CONCRETE LLC | |
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CONSTRUCTION TESTING SERVICES, INC. ON JUL-30-2010 AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT CONSTRUCTION TESTING SERVICES, INC. SERVED ERRONEOUSLY AS CONSTRUCTION TESTING SERVICES) | |
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
April 18, 2013 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CARDINAL CONSULTING INC. AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT KILLARNEY CONSTRUCTION CO., INC. CULLINANE CONSTRUCTION AL NORMAN MECHANICAL, INC. MURRAY, MICHAEL MID-MARKET DEVELOPMENET COMPANY, INC. | |
February 04, 2013 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR COURT
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
February 04, 2013 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
February 01, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT , CONDITIONAL, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PERFORMING ARTS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.