Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
A.H. Voss Company filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Brayton, Alan Richard, Donadio, David R, against 4520 Corp., Abblummus Global, Inc., A C And S,Inc., A.H. Voss Company, Albay Construction, (total of 66) See All represented by Adams, Barbara Rose, Ammons, David W., Armstrong, William Henry, Barry, Nelson Clyde, Beilock, Steven Alan, (total of 30) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTeri L. Jackson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2001 |
CategoryAsbestos |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GOODRICH CORPORATION
Date: January 21, 2003ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT GRINNELL CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 04, 2005ORDER FOR FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 06, 2005ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY
Date: November 12, 2004ORDER GRANTING DFEENDANT EATON CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 17, 2005ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT A C AND S,INC.
Date: February 08, 2002ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.
Date: December 09, 2004ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT CRANE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 04, 2005ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT A.H. VOSS COMPANY
Date: May 24, 2004ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT TEMPORARY PLANT CLEANERS, INC.
Date: April 08, 2004ORDER FOR FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 03, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GRINNELL CORPORATION
Date: February 08, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. FKA ALLIEDSIGNAL
Date: February 06, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT A.H. VOSS COMPANY
Date: January 29, 2002PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET
Date: December 06, 2001ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY
Date: September 20, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Date: February 10, 2003ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY,INC.
Date: October 21, 2003ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BRAGG INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC.
Date: October 15, 2003ANSWER TO COMPLAINT TO COMPLT FILED BY DEFENDANT KEENAN PROPERTIES, INC
Date: April 09, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC.
Date: April 19, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BUDD COMPANY, THE
Date: April 22, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT TRIMON, INC.
Date: April 24, 2002AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 2 TO BE CRANE CO.
Date: August 08, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS COMPANY
Date: April 02, 2002ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT GATKE CORPORATION
Date: March 13, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION
Date: March 08, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ABBLUMMUS GLOBAL, INC.
Date: February 22, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY
Date: February 20, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT DILLINGHAM CONSTRUCTION N.A.,INC.
Date: February 21, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT 4520 CORP.
Date: February 20, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BWD AUTOMOTIVE
Date: February 25, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT OSCAR E. ERICKSON, INC.
Date: February 28, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BHC) TOSCO REFINING COMPANY
Date: February 27, 2002ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT MONSANTO COMPANY
Date: February 22, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT OAKFABCO, INC.
Date: March 06, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY
Date: March 07, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT LEAR SIEGLER DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP.
Date: February 21, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HENRY VOGT MACHINE CO.
Date: February 11, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ELLIOTT COMPANY
Date: February 13, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE,INC.
Date: February 21, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT FLUOR CORPORATION
Date: February 22, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ROSENDAHL CORPORATION
Date: February 14, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT DANA CORPORATION
Date: February 26, 2002AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE TRIMON, INC.
Date: March 07, 2002AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 8 TO BE KUBOTA CORPORATION
Date: June 04, 2003AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 3 TO BE FMC CORPORATION -TURBO PUMP OPERATION
Date: September 26, 2002ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT STUART RADIATOR CORE MANUFACTURING CO INC
Date: October 11, 2002DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT WESTBURNE SUPPLY, INC.
Date: January 06, 2006ORDER OF REMAND
Date: March 13, 2003ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 16, 2004AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 10 TO BE OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.
Date: September 24, 2003ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC.
Date: May 14, 2004ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: December 01, 2004ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.
Date: March 17, 2003ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GRINNELL CORPORATION
Date: May 19, 2004ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT EATON CORPORATION
Date: June 29, 2004ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD.
Date: July 09, 2004ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE: MOTION TO VACATE TRIAL DATE AND SET MAATER TO CMC
Date: August 09, 2005ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER.
Date: November 21, 2005ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC
Date: August 02, 2004ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Date: September 16, 2004Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013. ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ENTER DISMISSALS FILED 1/27/10. (206) | |
December 19, 2013 | Hearing |
DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
June 20, 2013 | Hearing |
DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
June 20, 2013 | Docket Event | CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-20-2013 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, MR. OREN NOAH. THE BRAYTON'S LAW FIRM HAS PROVIDED A COLOR CODED CHART TO THE COURT REGARDING THE STATUS OF DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION CASES. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206) | |
December 13, 2012 | Hearing |
DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event | CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF DEC-11-2012 TO ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-20-2013 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO REPORT TO THE COURT HOW MUCH TIME TOLLED AND DATES IN WHICH THE 5-YEAR STATUTE OF LIMITATION HAS BEEN EXTENDED. OREN NOAH APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY AND BERRY. (206) | |
December 15, 2011 | Hearing |
DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
December 15, 2011 | Docket Event | CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-15-2011 TO ASBESTOS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-13-2012 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 FOR THE STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY STAY AS TO THE ONLY REMAINING DEFENDANT, PLANT INSULATION. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY AND BERRY. (206) | |
December 16, 2010 | Hearing |
DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Judge: JAMES J. MCBRIDE |
|
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event | CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-16-2010 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-15-2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 206 FOR STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY STAY AS TO DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; COURT REPORTER DIANA L. GONZALEZ, CSR #7935, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL, BERRY & BERRY. (206) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.