Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Barbara Newton, Billy Cates, Individually And As Successor-In-Interest To The Estate Of Lois Cates, Paul Cates, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Frontier Management Llc, Frontier Senior Living, Frontier Senior Living, Llc, Kelland Lancaster, Samantha Davidson, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Thomas S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 25, 2022 |
Category35-Cv Other Non Pi/Pd/Wd Tort - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
RFD-Entire Action-FINAL
Date: January 24, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: August 01, 2023Ruling
Date: November 17, 2023Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: February 16, 2023Motion (Pre-Disposition)
Date: September 21, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: December 22, 2022Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: November 17, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 19, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: August 03, 2023Further Hearing - Pre-Disposition
Date: September 21, 2023Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition
Date: November 29, 2023Ruling
Date: September 05, 2023Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: May 02, 2023Ruling
Date: July 25, 2023Ruling
Date: December 01, 2023Order to Show Cause
Date: November 03, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: September 21, 2023Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition
Date: November 15, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: July 18, 2023Notice of Settlement-FINAL
Date: November 29, 2023Ex Parte re OST-MTC depos-PropOrd-FINAL.docx
Date: November 28, 2023Ex Parte re OST-MTC depos-MPA-FINAL
Date: November 28, 2023Ex Parte re OST-MTC depos-Decl-FINAL
Date: November 28, 2023Ex Parte-OST-MTC Depos-POS of Prop Ord-FINAL
Date: November 28, 2023Ex Parte re OST-MTC depos-Notice-FINAL
Date: November 28, 2023MTC-Proof of Service-Proposed Order-FINAL
Date: November 27, 2023MTC-Proposed Order-FINAL.docx
Date: November 27, 2023KG Declaration-FINAL
Date: November 27, 2023MTC Depos-MPA-FINAL
Date: November 27, 2023MTC-Notice of Motion-FINAL
Date: November 27, 2023Oppo to MTC RFP(1)
Date: November 17, 2023Oppo to MTC RFP(1) SS_
Date: November 17, 2023Pltffs Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees-FINAL
Date: November 03, 2022POS of Summons-Oakmont Mngmt Group LLC-FINAL
Date: December 02, 2022POS of Summons-Seven Oaks AL MC-FINAL
Date: December 02, 2022POS of Summons-Oakmont SL LLC-FINAL
Date: December 02, 2022POS of Summons-The Village at Seven Oaks-FINAL
Date: December 02, 2022POS of Summons-Samantha Davidson-FINAL
Date: December 15, 2022POS of Summons-Samantha Davidson-FINAL
Date: December 22, 2022RFD-Oakmont Defs only-FINAL
Date: January 17, 2023First Amended Complaint-FINAL
Date: January 19, 2023Amended Summons w-Attachment-FINAL
Date: January 19, 2023POS of Amended Summons-Seven Oaks AL MC-FINAL
Date: February 22, 2023POS of A-Sum-The Village at Seven Oaks-FINAL
Date: February 22, 2023POS of Summons-Frontier Management LLC-FINAL
Date: February 22, 2023POS of Summons-Frontier SR Living LLC-FINAL
Date: February 22, 2023POS of Amended Summons-Samantha Davidson-FINAL
Date: February 22, 2023Answer to FAC
Date: March 23, 2023Case Management Statement-FINAL
Date: July 17, 2023Case Management Statement - Updated Form-
Date: July 19, 2023RFD-Def Kelland Lancaster only-FINAL
Date: July 24, 2023MFP-Declaration-FINAL
Date: July 27, 2023MFP-Not and Motion-FINAL
Date: July 27, 2023MFP-Proposed Order-FINAL.docx
Date: July 27, 2023MFP-Proof of Service-Proposed Order-FINAL
Date: July 27, 2023MFP-MPA-FINAL
Date: July 27, 2023CM Statement 8-3-23-FINAL
Date: July 27, 2023Memo ISO PTC Arbitration- Final
Date: August 16, 2023Notice of Stay Pending PTC Arbitration- Final
Date: August 16, 2023Notice PTC Arbitration- Final
Date: August 16, 2023Declaration of NAP- Final- reduced
Date: August 16, 2023POS
Date: August 16, 2023Proposed Order- Final
Date: August 16, 2023Declaration of Samantha Davidson- Final
Date: August 16, 2023Case Management Statement-FINAL
Date: August 21, 2023MFP-Re-Notice and Motion (00501615xA1C62)
Date: August 22, 2023Resp to MTP
Date: September 08, 2023Opp MTC Arb-DZ Decl-FINAL
Date: September 08, 2023Opp MTC Arb-FINAL
Date: September 08, 2023Opp MTC Arb-Newton Decl.-FINAL
Date: September 08, 2023MFP-DZ Reply Decl-FINAL
Date: September 12, 2023MFP-Reply-FINAL
Date: September 12, 2023REPLY re PTC Arb
Date: September 15, 2023Ex Parte re OST-POS-Proposed Order-FINAL
Date: November 08, 2023Ex Parte re OST-MTC docs-PropOrd-FINAL.docx
Date: November 08, 2023Ex Parte re OST-MTC docs-Decl-FINAL
Date: November 08, 2023Ex Parte re OST-MTC docs-MPA-FINAL
Date: November 08, 2023Ex Parte re OST-MTC docs-Notice-FINAL
Date: November 08, 2023MTC-Proof of Service-Proposed Order-FINAL
Date: October 30, 2023MTC-Not and Motion-FINAL
Date: October 30, 2023MTC-MPA-FINAL
Date: October 30, 2023MTC-Declaration of BU-FINAL
Date: October 30, 2023MTC-Sep Statement-FINAL
Date: October 30, 2023MTC-Proposed Order-FINAL.docx
Date: October 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal crc 3.1385 |
|
April 15, 2024 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal crc 3.1385 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) (After Cond Settlement/Stay) with prejudice |
|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | RFD-Entire Action-FINAL | |
January 24, 2024 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) (After Cond Settlement/Stay) with prejudice |
|
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial PREFERENCIAL TRIAL SETTING CASE HAS PRIORITY ESTIMATE 10 DAYS |
|
January 08, 2024 | Hearing |
Jury Trial PREFERENCIAL TRIAL SETTING CASE HAS PRIORITY ESTIMATE 10 DAYS Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
January 08, 2024 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference
Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Filed 11/28/2023, (RE: 11/29 Ex-Parte Pending Approval for Order Shortening Time), Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Attendance at Depositions |
|
January 03, 2024 | Hearing |
Motion to Compel Filed 11/28/2023, (RE: 11/29 Ex-Parte Pending Approval for Order Shortening Time), Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Attendance at Depositions Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.