Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Aldar Mini Storeage, L.P., A California Limited Partnership, World Of Pentecost, Inc., A, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Lynch, Craig M, Mullen, Ray T, Tragish, Murray, against Arutunyan, Tigran, Ghasabyan, Khachartur, Thv Enterprises, A Califronia Corporation, Thv Hayknarik, Llc., A California Limited Liablity Company, World Of Pentecost, Inc., (total of 5) See All represented by Alexander, Thomas M, Jr., Dessy, Ronald D, Slater, G Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarmann, Bernard C., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management182 days |
Filing DateMay 31, 2020 |
Category26-Cv Other Real Property-Civil Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedApril 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Motion to Compel
Date: November 14, 2022Motion to Strike
Date: April 14, 2022Court Trial
Date: October 28, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: September 09, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: November 12, 2021Demurrer First Amended Complaint
Date: November 30, 2020Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: December 21, 2020Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: October 13, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: November 30, 2020Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: October 29, 2020Motion to Strike
Date: November 04, 2020Case Status Conference
Date: May 26, 2023Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: September 20, 2024Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition)
Date: May 11, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: March 01, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 18, 2023Motion to Continue
Date: November 14, 2022Motion (Pre-Disposition)
Date: May 11, 2023Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition
Date: July 20, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: May 11, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: January 05, 2023Motion to Continue
Date: August 24, 2023Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: August 02, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 26, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: April 19, 2022Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw (Pre-Disposition)
Date: August 25, 2022Ruling
Date: July 15, 2022Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition)
Date: May 26, 2023Motion (Pre-Disposition)
Date: May 26, 2023Final Case Management Conference
Date: October 25, 2024Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: August 02, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: May 11, 2023Motion to Continue
Date: February 23, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: May 26, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: November 21, 2022Demurrer First Amended Complaint
Date: November 04, 2020Ruling
Date: December 17, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: June 14, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: August 09, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: November 29, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: September 19, 2022Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw (Pre-Disposition)
Date: February 02, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: December 05, 2022Further Case Management Conference
Date: February 16, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: June 01, 2020Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: December 16, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: May 26, 2023Demurrer
Date: March 11, 2021Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: September 14, 2020Fee Waiver-Hearing on Waiver of Fees (Pre-Disposition)
Date: March 11, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 09, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 13, 2022Demurrer
Date: May 03, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: November 30, 2020Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 27, 2023Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: March 22, 2022Motion to Strike
Date: April 07, 2022Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: March 30, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: November 17, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: November 08, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 06, 2022Declaration Motion 2-2-22
Date: January 05, 2022POS Motion 2-2-22
Date: January 05, 2022NOM 2-2-22
Date: January 05, 2022Proposed Order on Motion 2-2-22
Date: January 05, 2022NOT Motion for Continuance
Date: January 21, 2022Dec MT ISO Motion Continuance
Date: January 21, 2022Memo of PS and As ISO Motion Continuance
Date: January 21, 2022NOT Hrg Motion to Strike
Date: January 25, 2022Dec of MT ISO Motion to Strike
Date: January 25, 2022Memo of Ps and As
Date: January 25, 2022Notice Joinder for Gasabyan re AMS v THV
Date: February 04, 2022Proposed Order on Motion 2-2-22
Date: February 09, 2022POS Order 2-9-22
Date: February 09, 2022Order on Motion 2-2-22
Date: February 09, 2022NOT of Non Opposition Mtn for Cont
Date: February 11, 2022NOE Order THV adv AMS
Date: February 16, 2022Oppositiont_to_Motion_to_ENTS_Verified_022222
Date: February 22, 2022civ150_Notice_of_Limited__and_POS_print_as
Date: February 22, 2022Separate Statement ISO Mtn to Compel
Date: February 22, 2022Points Authorities ISO Mtn to Compel
Date: February 22, 2022Notice of Hearing Motion to Compel
Date: February 22, 2022Dec of Tragish ISO Mtn to Compel
Date: February 22, 2022Notice_of_Jonder_and_Joinder_022222
Date: February 23, 2022Sep Statement ISO Mtn to Compel SR
Date: February 24, 2022Points Authorities ISO Mtn to Compel SR
Date: February 24, 2022Dec ISO Mtn to Compel SR
Date: February 24, 2022Notice of Hrg and Motion to Compel SR
Date: February 24, 2022Opposition_to_Motion_to_of_Documents_032222
Date: March 22, 2022Substitution Of Attorney-Civil - Tigran Arutyunyan
Date: March 22, 2022Substitution Of Attorney-Civil - THV Enterprises
Date: March 22, 2022Substitution Of Attorney-Civil - THV Hayknarik LLC
Date: March 22, 2022Opposition_to_Motion_to_822_docx_Google_Docs
Date: March 28, 2022proposed ORDER AFTER HEARING 03 30 22
Date: April 01, 2022Supplement_to_Opposition_more_complete_040422
Date: April 05, 2022SUB_IN_040722
Date: April 07, 2022sUBSTITUTION_OF_ATTORNEY_Corrected_041322
Date: April 13, 2022NOTICE OF RULING MTC 033022
Date: April 14, 2022signed_Declaration_in_Su_elieved_Print_as
Date: June 10, 2022signed_Notice_and_Motion_Counsel_Print_as
Date: June 10, 2022PS AND AS ISO MTC COURT ORDER
Date: June 30, 2022DEC ISO MTC COURT ORDERR
Date: June 30, 2022NOT OF HRG MTC COURT ORDER
Date: June 30, 2022NOT OF HRG AND MOTION TO COMPEL RFP 2
Date: July 06, 2022DEC ISO MTC RFP 2
Date: July 06, 2022PS AND AS ISO MTC
Date: July 06, 2022Amended Notice of Motion to Compel RFP Set 2
Date: July 14, 2022Amended Notice of Motion to Compel Court Order
Date: July 14, 2022Notice of Non Opp to MTC Court Order
Date: July 21, 2022Notice of Non Opposition to MTC RFP
Date: July 21, 2022SOA-THV Hayknarik LLC
Date: August 05, 2022SOA-THV Enterprises
Date: August 05, 2022SOA-Tigran Arutyunyan
Date: August 05, 2022proposed ORDER.doc
Date: August 11, 2022PROPOSED order.doc
Date: August 11, 2022Proposed Order Cover Sheet
Date: August 11, 2022SOA- Tigran
Date: August 15, 2022SOA- THV Hayknarik
Date: August 15, 2022SOA- THV Enterprises
Date: August 15, 2022Not Assocation Counsel w Declaration ISO
Date: September 13, 2022CORRECTED Not of Assoc
Date: September 19, 2022Notice and Motion for Cont
Date: September 29, 2022Ps and As ISO Mtn Cont
Date: September 29, 2022proposed ORDER for Cont.doc
Date: September 29, 2022Dec ISO Mtn Cont
Date: September 29, 2022proposed Order
Date: September 29, 2022Ps and As
Date: September 29, 2022Notice and Motion
Date: September 29, 2022Dec ISO Motion
Date: September 29, 2022Not Non Opposition Mtn for Cont
Date: November 04, 2022Not Non Opposition Mtn to Compel
Date: November 04, 2022THV's Ps&As MTC
Date: November 09, 2022THV's Ntc. Motion & MTC
Date: November 09, 2022THV'S Proposed Order Re MTC
Date: November 09, 2022POS re MTC
Date: November 09, 2022GAS Decl. iso THV's MTC
Date: November 09, 2022Ntc. of Errata re MTC
Date: November 09, 202266310Subst00818c
Date: November 11, 2022Not of Cont
Date: November 15, 2022Not of Ruling
Date: November 15, 2022THV Enterprises
Date: November 21, 2022Tigran Arutyunyan
Date: November 21, 2022THV Hayknarik LLC
Date: November 21, 2022Order After Hrg Mtn to Compel
Date: November 23, 2022AMENDED Ntc. Motion & MTC
Date: November 30, 2022Second Amended Ntc. Motion & MTC
Date: December 06, 2022Amended Not of Ruling
Date: December 19, 2022[DRAFT] Proposed Order Re MTC
Date: January 05, 2023Substitution_of_Attorney_ner_01_12_2023_12_04
Date: January 12, 2023Ntc. of Entry of Order
Date: February 08, 2023mc_050_032023_cOMPLETE
Date: March 20, 202379162ALDAR002078
Date: July 18, 202379321MOTIO0245e1
Date: July 20, 202379321PROPO002ff3
Date: July 20, 202379321NOTIC01a995
Date: July 20, 202379321PROPO031783
Date: July 20, 202380577Reque01b08f
Date: August 11, 202380577Oppos00fca3
Date: August 11, 2023Decl Lynch ISO Reply to Opp
Date: August 17, 2023Reply to Limited Opposition
Date: August 17, 2023Decl Tragish ISO Reply to Opp
Date: August 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
October 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Continue 08/24/2023 Court Trial 7 days |
|
October 28, 2024 | Hearing |
Court Trial 7 days Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
October 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Continue 08/24/2023 Final Case Management Conference Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
September 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Continue 08/24/2023 Mandatory Settlement Conference FCMC: 10/25/24 1:30pm Div H; JT: 10/28/24 9am Div H; TE: 10 days |
|
September 20, 2024 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference FCMC: 10/25/24 1:30pm Div H; JT: 10/28/24 9am Div H; TE: 10 days Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
October 30, 2023 | Hearing |
Court Trial 7 days Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Trial 7 days |
|
October 27, 2023 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference
Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference FCMC 10/27/2023 Court Trial 10/30/2023 (H) T/E 7 days |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.