Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Pavletich Electric & Communications, Inc., Zurich American Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Quigley, Patrick M, against Pavletich Electric & Communications, Inc., represented by O'Brien, Patrick Kevin, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Thomas S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management186 days |
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2020 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 08, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)
Date: January 04, 2022Order to Show Cause
Date: February 20, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: October 05, 2021Ruling
Date: January 09, 2024Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal
Date: March 06, 2024Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication
Date: May 26, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: September 09, 2022Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw (Post-Disposition)
Date: October 09, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: August 18, 2020Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: October 12, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: May 11, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: May 06, 2021Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: July 08, 2020Further Case Management Conference
Date: January 04, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: July 21, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: August 06, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 09, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 06, 2023Pleading - Request for Dismissal
Date: March 01, 2024Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition
Date: May 14, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: July 14, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: May 10, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: May 12, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: July 14, 2021Ruling
Date: May 14, 2021Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: June 04, 2020Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 02, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 17, 2022Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition
Date: April 27, 2023Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal
Date: April 25, 2024Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: April 27, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: May 24, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: July 06, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: February 17, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: June 09, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: March 09, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: September 02, 2021Ruling
Date: January 10, 2024Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw (Pre-Disposition)
Date: November 29, 2023Further Case Management Conference
Date: October 20, 2020Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: July 22, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: September 07, 202190987Reque00e80b
Date: January 30, 2024Notice of Further CMC 1.4.22
Date: January 06, 202253226CaseM00bd19
Date: February 09, 2022Pleading - CMC Statement 3-9-2022 - Zurich
Date: February 18, 202254461Reque00acb4
Date: March 08, 2022DOE 3
Date: March 09, 2022DOE 4
Date: March 09, 2022DOE 5
Date: March 09, 2022DOE 2
Date: March 09, 2022POS
Date: April 07, 2022proof
Date: April 12, 2022Cross-Complaint
Date: April 14, 2022Demand for Jury and Posting Jury Fees
Date: April 14, 2022Answer to Complaint
Date: April 14, 2022Summons
Date: April 14, 2022POS
Date: April 21, 2022Gandola. Answer to complaint
Date: April 28, 2022Ntc of Unavailability of Counsel
Date: May 05, 2022stmt of dmg
Date: May 05, 202257370CaseM003c4e
Date: May 09, 2022AMENDMENT
Date: May 19, 2022PROOF
Date: May 23, 202258759DEFEN0031d0
Date: June 08, 2022Pleading - Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: January 03, 2024NTC
Date: November 29, 2023pos
Date: July 21, 2022RFD as to our X-C
Date: July 28, 2022RFD as to Complaint-in-Intervention
Date: July 28, 202261920CaseM00b6ae
Date: August 12, 202218Z6782-Answer to Plaintiff's Complain
Date: August 12, 202218Z6774-Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: August 12, 202218Z6981-Amended POS - Answer; Initial
Date: August 12, 2022Pleading - CMC Statement 9-9-2022 - Zuirch
Date: August 22, 2022CASE
Date: August 23, 202262451CaseM0150ef
Date: August 24, 202262451Notic00a48b
Date: August 24, 20221904777-CMS - 9 9 22
Date: August 26, 20221904737-Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees
Date: August 26, 2022Gandola. CMC 8 26 22
Date: August 26, 202286918Commi00413e
Date: November 17, 20231979817-Req. Dismissal - Signed by PA
Date: January 05, 202368900Reque00c2f3
Date: January 07, 2023Gandolas. Separate Statement
Date: February 01, 2023Gandolas. Ntc of MSJ Ps and As
Date: February 01, 2023Gandolas. Dec of DWE in support for MSJ
Date: February 01, 2023Pleading - Notice of Change of Address
Date: February 02, 2023Gandola.Request for Judicial Notice w Docs
Date: February 01, 2023Gandola.AMENDED Ntcs of MSJ
Date: February 02, 20237045co00e7bc
Date: February 06, 2023Gomez. Request for Dismissal
Date: February 09, 202371032Docum00852d
Date: February 16, 202371444Lette00aea0
Date: February 24, 2023Gandola. Memo of Costs
Date: February 24, 2023Ltr to Court
Date: March 01, 202372264DECLA0471dd
Date: March 11, 202372264SEPAR015783
Date: March 11, 202372264MEMOR0245f1
Date: March 11, 202372264PROPO0303c7
Date: March 11, 202372264DEFEN00cdff
Date: March 11, 202372264DECLA06df94
Date: March 11, 202372264DECLA05f5f4
Date: March 11, 2023Gandola. Ntc of Entry of Judgement or Order
Date: November 09, 2023449519.1682837.mc053
Date: September 18, 2023449519.1682838.mc052
Date: September 18, 2023449519.1682839.mc051
Date: September 18, 2023Gandolas. Prop Judgment
Date: October 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2024 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal continued from 03/06/2024 CRC 3.1385 as to Hugo Gomez' Complaint in Intervention Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal continued from 03/06/2024 CRC 3.1385 as to Hugo Gomez' Complaint in Intervention |
|
April 25, 2024 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal crc 3.1385 as to Plaintiff's Complaint Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ruling 01/10/2024 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal crc 3.1385 as to Plaintiff's Complaint |
|
March 07, 2024 | Hearing |
Notice of Hearing Order to Show Cause re Dismissal 05/06/2024 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 17. |
|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Order to Show Cause re Dismissal 05/06/2024 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 17. |
|
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ruling 01/09/2024 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal crc 3.1385 as to Hugo Gomez's Complaint in Intervention |
|
March 06, 2024 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal crc 3.1385 as to Hugo Gomez's Complaint in Intervention Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
March 01, 2024 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Partial) with prejudice as to the Complaint, entire action of Plaintiff. |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Pleading - Request for Dismissal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.