Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hair, Alan Scott, Hair, Mary Charles, Juicy Burger Corporation, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Turek, Daniel W., Whittington, Mark Joseph, against 3Mb, Llc, Bell, Robert E., Juicy Burger Corporation, Treble, Llc, represented by Hodges, Nathan M, Steinberg, Jody, Saldo, Jessica A., Thomasian, Elizabeth A, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Thomas S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management240 days |
Filing DateMarch 12, 2018 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Time To Trial552 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Order to Show Cause
Date: March 14, 2018Motion (Pre-Disposition)
Date: October 28, 2019Motion (Pre-Disposition)
Date: September 26, 2019Motion to Strike
Date: September 04, 2018Motion to Strike
Date: November 26, 2018Further Hearing - Pre-Disposition
Date: November 26, 2018Case Status Conference
Date: January 20, 2021Motion for Leave
Date: December 17, 2020Trial Setting Conference
Date: April 26, 2021Motion (Pre-Disposition)
Date: April 26, 20212022.01.13 Ntc of Name change
Date: January 13, 2022Stip to Continue Trial
Date: February 26, 2022184. Amendment to Complaint (DOE 4)
Date: April 07, 202255917Amend004d19
Date: April 07, 2022POS (DOE 4)
Date: April 19, 202257422Proof009b8b
Date: May 10, 202258937State003d04
Date: June 13, 202261636State004703
Date: August 08, 2022Request for Entry of Default (Alan Hair)
Date: September 28, 2022Request for Entry of Default (Mary Hair)
Date: September 28, 2022Statement of Damages (re Alan Hair)
Date: September 28, 2022Statement of Damages (Re Mary Hair)
Date: September 28, 2022Request for Entry of Default
Date: October 03, 2022Statement of Damages (Re Mary Hair)
Date: October 03, 2022Statement of Damages (re Alan Hair)
Date: October 03, 20222022.10.OppMtnSanc Dec (FINAL)
Date: October 31, 20222022.10.31 OppMtnSanc
Date: October 31, 2022Reply to Mtn for Sanctions
Date: November 04, 2022hair- 12-14-22 Notice of Settlement
Date: December 15, 202267977Notic00c264
Date: December 16, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: January 11, 202371087Reque0088d5
Date: February 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | 71087Reque0088d5 | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | 67977Notic00c264 | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | hair- 12-14-22 Notice of Settlement | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Reply to Mtn for Sanctions | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022.10.OppMtnSanc Dec (FINAL) | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022.10.31 OppMtnSanc | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Statement of Damages (Re Mary Hair) | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Statement of Damages (re Alan Hair) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.