Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Melville James R., Sanchez Nadine, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Kelly Michael A., Kelly Michael Albert, against Ahdout M.D. Doe Fifty-One Jualianne, American Medical Systems Llc, Azizad-Pinto Parisa M.D., Boston Scientific Corporation, Boston Scientific Scimed Inc., (total of 10) See All represented by Anderson Mark E., Farrugia Daniel Vincent, Laddon Tarifa Belle, Lukitsch Bethany Gayle, Manukyan Roy Chuck, (total of 13) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michelle Williams Court presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichelle Williams Court Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management222 days |
Filing DateJune 21, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions125 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES STRICT LIABILITY -MANUFACTURING DEFECT ;ETC
Date: June 21, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: June 22, 2018NOTICE OF ERRATA RE COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: June 29, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: July 23, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: July 25, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: July 30, 2018STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY 15 DAYS
Date: August 13, 2018Proof of Service -
Date: August 13, 2018Minute Order -
Date: August 17, 2018Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 17, 2018Reply - Reply in Support of Their Demurrer
Date: October 17, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 17, 2018Declaration - Declaration of Keola Robert in Support of Defendants Olympus America Inc.
Date: October 17, 2018Reply - Reply in Support of Demurrer
Date: October 17, 2018Notice of Continuance - Notice of Continuance of Hearings
Date: December 07, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: December 07, 2018Notice - Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: January 02, 2019Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: January 03, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: January 14, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: January 15, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 22, 2019Notice - Notice of filing documents subject to confidentiality agreement
Date: January 30, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: January 29, 2019Order - Order Proposed Order
Date: February 07, 2019Motion re: - Motion re: Motion to File Confidential Documents Under Seal
Date: February 13, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)
Date: February 07, 2019Declaration - Declaration of Shawn Rose
Date: February 13, 2019Declaration - Declaration of Keola Robert Whittaker
Date: February 13, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 13, 2019Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: February 15, 2019Answer
Date: March 15, 2019Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: March 18, 2019Answer
Date: March 19, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: March 22, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: March 25, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: May 01, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: April 08, 2019Order - Dismissal
Date: May 16, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: July 10, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: July 22, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF NAME CHANGE
Date: July 24, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: July 25, 2019Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: January 10, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: January 17, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: January 21, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: February 07, 2020Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: February 07, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER
Date: June 29, 2020Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: July 02, 2020Separate Statement
Date: July 02, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: July 07, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: July 08, 2020Notice - NOTICE JOINT STATEMENT
Date: July 29, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: July 10, 2020Notice - NOTICE JOINT STATEMENT FOR SEPTEMBER 21, 2020 INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: September 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO WR...)
Date: September 21, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: September 30, 2020Notice - NOTICE JOINT STATEMENT FOR OCTOBER 19 2020 INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: October 14, 2020Notice - NOTICE CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER'S STATEMENT IN ADVANCE OF HEARINGS ON 11/13/20
Date: November 12, 2020Notice - NOTICE OLYMPUS STATEMENT IN ADVANCE OF HEARINGS ON NOVEMBER 13, 2020
Date: November 12, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO RE...)
Date: November 13, 2020Proof of Service -
Date: August 27, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: September 12, 2018NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES
Date: September 12, 2018NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION OF RICHARD C. BEAULIEU TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE
Date: September 14, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: September 25, 2018NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT-CIVIL
Date: September 25, 2018Declaration - Declaration of Conor M. Kelly in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition
Date: October 11, 2018Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 11, 2018Opposition -
Date: October 11, 2018Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES
Date: February 10, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES;)
Date: February 10, 2021Notice - NOTICE JOINT STATEMENT FOR MARCH 11, 2021 INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: March 08, 2021Order - ORDER REGARDING FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL PROCEDURE
Date: June 18, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL;)
Date: June 18, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: June 18, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL
Date: July 07, 2021Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: September 27, 2021Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AS TO DEFENDANT JULIANNE AHDOUT, M.D.
Date: September 27, 2021Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES
Date: October 18, 2021Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES
Date: October 18, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: October 21, 2021Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)
Date: October 20, 2021Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AS TO DEFENDANT JULIANNE AHDOUT, M.D.
Date: November 03, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR DETERMINATION OF GO...)
Date: November 03, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SCHEDULING OF MSC)
Date: January 28, 2022Separate Statement
Date: January 31, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: January 31, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SCHEDULING OF MSC)
Date: February 02, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: April 04, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: April 07, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE;)
Date: April 11, 2022Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - NOT ENTERED
Date: May 06, 2022Notice of OSC - NOTICE OF OSC (NAME EXTENSION) SETTLEMENT/DISMISSAL
Date: April 18, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: May 18, 2022Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: May 25, 2022Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - NOT ENTERED
Date: June 21, 2022Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: June 22, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: July 01, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: July 08, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: August 02, 2022Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: August 09, 2022Summons
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-12T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (-Civil)
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Demurrer to Complaint
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Their Demurrer)
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: June 20, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: July 03, 2019Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: February 07, 2020Separate Statement
Date: February 07, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA
Date: March 13, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 17, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: March 20, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: April 01, 2020Motion to Quash
Date: March 25, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 16, 2020Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: June 04, 2020Answer
Date: June 08, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA
Date: June 24, 2020Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Hearing on Mo...))
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Demurrer)
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Keola Robert in Support of Defendants Olympus America Inc.)
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Order (Transferring complicated Personal Injury (PI) case to an Independent Calendar (IC) court)
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Transferring Complicated Personal Injury Case to An Independent Calendar Court
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (of Hearings)
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to be Admitted ...))
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Declaration (of Keola Robert Whittaker)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Shawn Rose)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Notice ( of filing documents subject to confidentiality agreement)
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Motion re: (Motion to File Confidential Documents Under Seal)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00[Proposed] Order Granting Application of Mark E. Anderson to appear as counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice))
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint))
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Answer (TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation and Protective Order- Confidential)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal Motion to File Confidential Documen...))
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint; ...))
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Order (Stipulated Order regarding discovery of electronically stored information)
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Notice ( of Name Change)
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion to Compel)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to written discovery [Res. ID: 4811])
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Notice (of Errata)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation to extend mediation deadline;))
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Mediation Deadline
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Stipulation to extend mediation deadline;) of 04/14/2020)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Continuance of Hearing(s) due to CO...))
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Motion to Quash (deposition subpoena for business records)
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to continue Trial Date
Date: 2020-06-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order Re: Stipulation and Order to continue ...))
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Stipulation and Order to continue ...) of 06/19/2020)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Opposition (To Motion To Quash Subpoena)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Reply (of Chaux, Azizad-Pinto and Cedars-Sinai to Olympus' Opposition to Quash Subpoenas)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Wr...))
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Notice (Joint Statement)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Wr...))
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Joint Statement for September 21, 2020 Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Wr...))
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of CSMC etc. Motion to Quash Olympus etc. Deposition Subpoena for Records)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Joint Statement for October 19 2020 Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference; Informal Discovery Conferen...))
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Re...))
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Notice (Cedars-Sinai Medical Center's Statement in Advance of Hearings on 11/13/20)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Olympus' Statement in advanced of hearing on November 13, 2020
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to continue trial and related dates
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Scheduling of an Informal Discovery Conferenc...))
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation to continue trial and related dates;))
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Notice (of Informal Discovery Conference and Time Change of Post-Mediation Status Conference)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Joint Statement for March 11, 2021 Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Order (Regarding Final Status Conference and Trial Procedure)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial;))
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order Regarding Final Status Conference and Trial Procedure])
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Change of Counsel)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Settlement (as to defendant Julianne Ahdout, M.D.)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Scheduling of MSC))
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (as to defendant Julianne Ahdout, M.D.)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00[Proposed] Order Determining Good Faith Settlement as to defendant Julianne Ahdout, M.D.
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Joint Stipulation To Continue Trial and Relat...))
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Joint Stipulation To Continue Trial and Related Dates
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Application and Order for Determination of Go...))
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00[Proposed] Order Granting Joint Stipulation To Continue Trial And Related Dates
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CSMC ETC. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: March 22, 2022Notice (OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERNCE AND TIME CHANGE OF POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Notice (JOINT STATEMENT FOR MARCH 11, 2021 INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees (JULIANNE AHDOUT, M.D.)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Notice (OLYMPUS STATEMENT IN ADVANCE OF HEARINGS ON NOVEMBER 13, 2020)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to written discovery)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation and [proposed] order to continue ...))
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.