Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Peterson Jillian, Sartory Jennifer, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Cha John Sung, Raines Feldman Llp, against Does 1-10, Jordan Jillian, Peterson Jillian, Peterson Jillian Rhonda, Peterson Jill R., (total of 11) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Holly J. Fujie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHolly J. Fujie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management58 days |
Filing DateMay 30, 2018 |
CategoryIntentional Infliction Of Emotional Distress (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeTransfrd To Lasc North West Dist. |
Case Cycle Time13 days |
Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATES)
Date: January 25, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: January 25, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 18, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 18, 2021Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: June 18, 2021Other - - OTHER - EXHIBITS 1-9
Date: June 29, 2021Other - - OTHER - EXHIBITS10-20
Date: June 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS)
Date: July 19, 2021Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: September 20, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JILLIAN PETERSON
Date: July 22, 2021Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: October 15, 2021Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - APPEAL - NOTICE OF DEFAULT ISSUED N.O.A. 9/20/21; B315730
Date: December 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: December 03, 2021Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance - APPEAL - NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE N.O.A. 9/20/21; B315730
Date: December 21, 2021Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal
Date: February 01, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: February 23, 2022RETURNED MAIL
Date: February 16, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: February 25, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]
Date: February 25, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 03, 2022Request
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Declaration (JILLIAN PETERSON)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Receipt (JURY FEES )
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Telephonic Appearance) of )
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Motion re: (PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Declaration (AMENDED DECLARATION OF JILLIAN PETERSON)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Other - (Exhibits10-20)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings))
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order)])
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued (N.O.A. ; B315730)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference re Appeal ; Status Conference re Mandatory ...) of )
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Notice-Related Cases
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Medical Records)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Other - (Defendants' Settlement Conference Statement)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Telephonic Appearance))
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE AVAILABILITY; DECLARATION OF JILLIAN PETERSON)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Notice (of Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Defendant Jillian Peterson's Requests for Admission to Plaintiff Jennifer Sartory (Set One)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Attachment
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Receipt of Plaintiff's Motions to Compel Discovery)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order re Telephonic Appearance)])
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Order (Denying Peremptory & Striking Statement of Disqualification)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO COURT REPORTER)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal Medical Records; Trial Setting Conf...))
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Continuance of Trial Dates))
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Order Denying Peremptory & Striking Statement ...) of )
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Order Denying Peremptory & Striking Statement ...))
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JILLIAN PETERSON'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Other - (Exhibits 1-9)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Jillian Peterson)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance (N.O.A. ; B315730)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Motion re: (MOTION TO USE SETTLED STATEMENT IN LIEU OF REPORTER’S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Status Confer...))
Date: April 15, 2022Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Appeal ; Status Conference re Mandatory ...))
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Receipt (JURY FEES )
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Receipt of Plaintiff's Motions to Compel Discovery)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Other - (Defendants' Settlement Conference Statement)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Defendant Jillian Peterson's Requests for Admission to Plaintiff Jennifer Sartory (Set One)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO COURT REPORTER)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Notice (of Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Telephonic Appearance))
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Telephonic Appearance) of 04/29/2020)
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order re Telephonic Appearance)])
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE AVAILABILITY; DECLARATION OF JILLIAN PETERSON)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Declaration (JILLIAN PETERSON)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Declaration (AMENDED DECLARATION OF JILLIAN PETERSON)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Order Denying Peremptory & Striking Statement ...))
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Order (Denying Peremptory & Striking Statement of Disqualification)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Motion re: (PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal Medical Records; Trial Setting Conf...))
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Continuance of Trial Dates))
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Medical Records)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance (N.O.A. 9/20/21; B315730)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Jillian Peterson)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings))
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JILLIAN PETERSON'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Other - (Exhibits 1-9)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued (N.O.A. 9/20/21; B315730)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Other - (Exhibits10-20)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: May 30, 2018COMPLAINT FOR: 1. TRESSPASS TO PERSONAL PROPERTY ETC...
Date: May 30, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: May 30, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 31, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Date: May 31, 2018NOTICE OF RELATED CASE
Date: June 08, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: June 14, 2018Notice -
Date: July 18, 2018Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-07-27 00:00:00
Date: July 27, 2018Cross-Complaint -
Date: August 16, 2018Other - - Other - Defendants' Settlement Conference Statement
Date: October 26, 2018Minute Order - (Court Order)
Date: October 15, 2018Notice - Notice of Non-Receipt of Plaintiff's Motions to Compel Discovery
Date: October 26, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: October 29, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: November 02, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)
Date: December 03, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)
Date: February 26, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: March 21, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: May 23, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: June 05, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: June 24, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: August 12, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: November 04, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: November 13, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 10, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 24, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 13, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 27, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Date: January 28, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 30, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO COURT REPORTER
Date: January 31, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE AVAILABILITY; DECLARATION OF JILLIAN PETERSON
Date: February 03, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: February 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE)
Date: April 29, 2020Motion to Seal - MOTION TO SEAL MEDICAL RECORDS
Date: July 10, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: July 13, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SEAL MEDICAL RECORDS; TRIAL SETTING CONF...)
Date: September 01, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION JILLIAN PETERSON
Date: October 01, 2020Notice of Attachment
Date: October 01, 2020Motion re: - MOTION RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE
Date: October 01, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION AMENDED DECLARATION OF JILLIAN PETERSON
Date: October 05, 2020Order - ORDER DENYING PEREMPTORY & STRIKING STATEMENT OF DISQUALIFICATION
Date: October 26, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 06, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.