Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Giordani Rudolph, Viacom Inc, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Drexler David, Luciano Saerim Plaintiff In Intervention, against D.C. Berridge Llc, Flores William, Penske Truck Leasing Corporation, Events Best, represented by Mihai Rachel Ann, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJon R. Takasugi Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 29, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time710 days |
Document:Notice of Lien Filed by: Attorney for Lien Claimant
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Document:Notice of Lien Filed by: Attorney for Lien Claimant
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: VIACOM INC (Plaintiff in Intervention); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Order By the Court granting Motion to Intervene; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: VIACOM INC (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: VIACOM INC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Complaint in Intervention; Filed by: VIACOM INC (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: VIACOM INC (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Rudolph Giordani (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: D.C. Berridge LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: May 29, 2018Summons (Joint Debtor) -
Date: May 29, 2018NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF ACTION
Date: June 22, 2018NOTICE OF LIEN
Date: July 26, 2018D.C. BERRIDGE, LLC DBA BEST EVENTS? ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT OF RUDOLPH GIORDANI
Date: August 13, 2018NOTICE OF LIEN CLAIM
Date: September 04, 2018WILLIAM FLORES' ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT OF RUDOLPH GIORDANI
Date: September 25, 2018Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 08, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE)
Date: May 13, 2019Order - ORDER BY THE COURT GRANTING MOTION TO INTERVENE
Date: May 13, 2019Complaint in Intervention
Date: May 14, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: May 14, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: May 14, 2019Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE LIABILITY
Date: May 21, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: May 29, 2019Answer - ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION
Date: June 25, 2019Order - ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES.
Date: January 24, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: January 24, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: February 05, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)
Date: February 05, 2020Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS
Date: April 17, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: May 08, 2020Complaint
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Answer (to the Complaint in Intervention)
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Re Liability)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene))
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue the Trial Date an...))
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Complaint in Intervention
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Order (Re: Defendants' Ex Parte Application to continue trial and related dates.)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Order (By the Court granting Motion to Intervene)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue the Trial Date and All Trial-Related Dates)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement) of 02/05/2020)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement))
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: May 08, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: May 08, 2020Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.