Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Antelope Valley-East Kern Water Agency, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Brunick William J., Mcelhaney Leland Paul, against All Persons Unknown Claiming An Interest Etal, Raquel Sisayan Llc, Southern California Edison Company, represented by Cirucci Patricia Anne Esq., Cummings Charles David Esq., Pranata D Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Elizabeth R. Feffer presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management125 days |
|
Filing DateMay 25, 2018 |
CategoryEminent Domain/Condemnation (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions122 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeConsolidated (Non-Lead Case) |
Case Cycle Time252 days |
Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Motion for Order of Possession; Filed by: Antelope Valley-East Kern Water Agency (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S (Dept. 39) OSC; Filed by:
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Application for Withdrawal; Filed by: Raquel Sisayan, LLC (Defendant); Type: No Fee
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Order for Withdrawal of Deposit; Filed by: Raquel Sisayan, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Order For Possession Pursuant To CCP ¿1255.460; Filed by:
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Brief Defendant's List of Expert Witnesses; Filed by: Raquel Sisayan, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Certificate Of Tax Information; Filed by: Los Angeles County Tax Collector (Non-Party)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Defendant's List of Expert Witnesses; Filed by: Raquel Sisayan, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Brief Defendant's Final Demand for Just Compensation; Filed by: Raquel Sisayan, LLC (Defendant)
Date: November 08, 2019SUMMONS -
Date: May 25, 2018COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN
Date: May 25, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: July 02, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 12, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: August 01, 2018ANSWER OF DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY TO COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN
Date: August 02, 2018ANSWER TO COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN
Date: August 02, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: September 06, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: September 11, 2018NOTICE OF DEPOSIT (CODE OF CIV. PROC. SECTION 1255.020)
Date: September 11, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: September 17, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: September 24, 2018Minute Order -
Date: September 27, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER OF POSSESSION; ETC.
Date: October 01, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: November 05, 2018Response - DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S (Dept. 39) OSC
Date: November 06, 2018Order - Order for Withdrawal of Deposit
Date: November 13, 2018Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: November 15, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Why All 33 Cases Should Not Be Related)
Date: November 27, 2018Case Management Order
Date: November 27, 2018Status Report - Status Report re its motion for prejudgment possession
Date: December 05, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Order To Show Cause Why All 35 Cases Should Not Be Related)
Date: December 08, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion for Order of Po...)
Date: December 17, 2018Order - Order For Possession Pursuant To CCP §1255.460
Date: December 19, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)
Date: February 01, 2019Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING DEFENDANT'S LIST OF EXPERT WITNESSES
Date: April 09, 2019Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANT'S LIST OF EXPERT WITNESSES
Date: April 09, 2019Proof of Publication
Date: May 28, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: July 24, 2019Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR TRIAL ONLY
Date: July 25, 2019Case Management Order
Date: September 23, 2019Certificate - CERTIFICATE OF TAX INFORMATION
Date: October 07, 2019Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANT'S FINAL DEMAND FOR JUST COMPENSATION
Date: November 08, 2019Notice - NOTICE FINAL OFFER OF COMPENSATION BY PLAINTIFF ANTELOPE VALLEY EAST KERN WATER AGENCY
Date: November 13, 2019Motion for Order (of Possession)
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Order (for Withdrawal of Deposit)
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion for Order of Po...))
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Application (for Withdrawal)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order To Show Cause Why All 35 Cases Should Not Be Related))
Date: 2018-12-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Why All 33 Cases Should Not Be Related))
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Status Report (re its motion for prejudgment possession)
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Defendant's List of Expert Witnesses)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Brief (Defendant's Final Demand for Just Compensation)
Date: November 08, 2019Motion for Order (CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR TRIAL ONLY)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Certificate (Of Tax Information)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...))
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Order for Publication (re: "Unknown Persons Claiming an interest, eta al)
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL EXCHANGE OF EXPERT TRIAL WITNESS INFORMATION AND VALUATION DATA
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Brief (Defendant's List of Expert Witnesses)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Notice (Final Offer of Compensation by Plaintiff Antelope Valley east Kern Water Agency)
Date: November 13, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.