Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lopez Jacob, Williams Brian, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Aiwazian Edwin, Kramer Daniel Jonathan, Parker-Fawley Elizabeth M., Zabehi Tara, Mehvary Shahin Yousef, (total of 6) See All against Rosendin Electric Inc., represented by Court Kimberly Anne, Espinosa Sayuri P., Payne Mark Joseph, Sinclair Brian Christopher, Zielinski Kenneth James, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Maren Nelson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaren Nelson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management868 days |
Filing DateApril 17, 2018 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Motion for Class Certification
Date: February 01, 2021Plaintiffs' opposition to Defendant's motion to strike class allegations
Date: March 02, 2020Joint Informal Discovery Conference Report; Filed by:
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Updated Notice of Further Status Conference; Filed by: Rosendin Electric, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by:
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Request for Informal Discovery Conference - Complex; Filed by: Rosendin Electric, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Status Conference Statement; Filed by: Jacob Lopez (Plaintiff); Brian Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Document:Report-Status Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Report /Statement; Joint; Filed by: Rosendin Electric, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Document:Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Order of Remand; Signed and Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Rosendin Electric, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order; Filed by: Jacob Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Payment of Civil Complex Fee; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Joint Informal Discovery Conference Report; Filed by: Rosendin Electric, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Motion to Strike; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Order Authorizing Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Motion for Class Certification; Filed by: Jacob Lopez (Plaintiff); Brian Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Further Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Strike; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Amended Complaint Second; Filed by: Jacob Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: Rosendin Electric, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Disassociation of Attorney; Filed by: Karina J. Lo (Attorney)
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: Jacob Lopez (Plaintiff); Brian Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Joint Case Management Conference Statement; Filed by: Rosendin Electric, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Complaint -
Date: April 17, 2018Civil Deposit -
Date: April 17, 2018Summons -
Date: April 17, 2018Other - - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER (COMPLEX LITIGATION PROGRAM)
Date: May 02, 2018Minute Order -
Date: May 02, 2018Notice of Appearance -
Date: June 07, 2018Other - - FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES ECT....
Date: June 04, 2018Notice - NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF CIVIL COMPLEX FEE
Date: June 07, 2018Notice - NOTICE OF REMOVAL
Date: June 08, 2018Minute Order -
Date: June 13, 2018Notice - BC702388 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT
Date: June 22, 2018Minute Order -
Date: June 26, 2018ORDER FOR REMAND
Date: July 02, 2018Answer - DEFENDANT ROSENDIN ELECTRIC, INC.S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: July 26, 2018Other - - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER (COMPLEX CASES AND CLASS ACTIONS)
Date: July 31, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) -
Date: August 23, 2018Minute Order -
Date: July 31, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint -
Date: August 23, 2018Other - - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Date: September 12, 2018Notice of Ruling
Date: October 19, 2018Stipulation and Order - to Continue Status Conference; Order
Date: September 17, 2018Initial Status Conference Report - Initial Status Conference Report /Statement; Joint
Date: October 22, 2018Order - Order Authorizing Electronic Service
Date: October 24, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Initial Status Conference)
Date: October 24, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 12, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment - Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order
Date: December 12, 2018Status Conference Statement - Joint Status Conference Statement
Date: February 15, 2019Answer - Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: January 14, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Further Status Conference)
Date: February 19, 2019Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling at Further Status Conference
Date: February 19, 2019Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATIUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Date: May 16, 2019Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AT FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: May 22, 2019Informal Discovery Conference - JOINT INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE REPORT
Date: June 17, 2019Informal Discovery Conference
Date: August 08, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: August 30, 2019Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AT AUGUST 30, 2019 INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: September 19, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 20, 2019Notice - UPDATED NOTICE OF FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: September 26, 2019Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Date: October 10, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: October 17, 2019Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: October 17, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: December 09, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: December 09, 2019Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AT FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: December 13, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: December 18, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: December 18, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 13, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/13/2020
Date: January 13, 2020Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AT FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: January 24, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 02, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 23, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 23, 2020Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: June 23, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE CLASS ALLEGATIONS)
Date: July 15, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: July 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: July 24, 2020Other - - ROSENDIN ELECTRIC, INC.'S DISCOVERY PLAN RE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION
Date: August 04, 2020Other - - PLAINTIFFS JACOB LOPEZ AND BRIAN WILLIAMS' DISCOVERY PLAN
Date: August 04, 2020Status Conference Statement - JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Date: August 27, 2020Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: September 01, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: September 01, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: September 01, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: September 01, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: September 02, 2020Notice of Ruling - AMENDED NOTICE OF RULING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 11, 2020Other - - OTHER - JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN
Date: September 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: September 22, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: September 22, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 02, 2020Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT
Date: November 02, 2020Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: November 02, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF TARA ZABEHI ISO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EX PARTE
Date: January 27, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: January 28, 2021Motion for Class Certification
Date: February 01, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: February 01, 2021Trial Brief - PLAINTIFFS' TRIAL PLAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION
Date: February 01, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 01, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: March 01, 2021Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Rosendin Electric, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Other - Joint Discovery Plan; Filed by: Rosendin Electric, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: Jacob Lopez (Plaintiff); Brian Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order (Complex Litigation Program); Signed and Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling at Further Status Conference; Filed by:
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order (Complex Cases and Class Action); Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Notice Of Appearance; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Request for Informal Discovery Conference - Complex; Filed by: Jacob Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Message Board Posting Case Anywhere; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Rosendin Electric, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Address; Filed by: Rosendin Electric, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Declaration of Tara Zabehi ISO Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Ex Parte; Filed by:
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Deposition Transcript of Ernesto Lopez ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: Jacob Lopez (Plaintiff); Brian Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Reporter's Transcript of Proceedings ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Ex Parte Application, etc; Filed by:
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Message Board Posting Change in Scheduled Appearance Time set for May 21, 2019; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Request for Informal Discovery Conference - Complex; Filed by: Rosendin Electric, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Answer to Second Amended Complaint; Filed by: Rosendin Electric, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Deposition Transcript of Jacob Macias ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: October 18, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: October 18, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF RULING AT OCTOBER 18, 2019 FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: October 28, 2019Status Conference Statement - PLAINTIFFS' STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Date: December 02, 2019Response - ROSENDIN ELECTRIC, INC.'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Date: December 04, 2019Opposition - PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGEMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: December 05, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: December 05, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: March 12, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: March 12, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 30, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: April 06, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 06, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 09, 2021Response - PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE
Date: April 20, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 20, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF TARA ZABEHI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO ORDER
Date: April 20, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: May 05, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: May 11, 2021Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: June 07, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 07, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: June 14, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 23, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: July 01, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: July 01, 2021Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING CERTIFIED REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDING HELD
Date: August 23, 2021Order - ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: September 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: September 13, 2021Other - - DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF JACOB MACIAS 4/06/2021
Date: September 13, 2021Other - - REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS 6/30/2021
Date: September 13, 2021Order - FURTHER ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: September 16, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 12, 2021Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL OF THE ACTION
Date: November 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: November 18, 2021Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: November 19, 2021Complaint
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order (Complex Litigation Program)
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Order of Remand
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-31 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order (Complex Cases and Class Action)
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Status Conference; Order)
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Report (/Statement; Joint)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ((Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Order (Authorizing Electronic Service)
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Complaint ((2nd))
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Complaint (Second)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Answer (to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on ...))
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Joint Statius Conference Statement
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Change in Scheduled Appearance Time set for May 21, 2019)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (at Further Status Conference)
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) re: Protective Order ; Fu...))
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Report - Complex (- JOINT)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (at August 30, 2019 Informal Discovery Conference)
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) (Class Allegations from Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Statement
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Updated Notice of Further Status Conference
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Status Conference Statement
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (as the Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling at October 18, 2019 Further Status Conference)
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Judgement on the Pleadings
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Rosendin Electric, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Status Conference Statement
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (at Further Status Conference)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Disassociation of Attorney
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/13/2020)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike Class Allegations))
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Rosendin Electric, Inc.'s Discovery Plan re Motion For Class Certification
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Plaintiffs Jacob Lopez and Brian Williams' Discovery Plan
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by:
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jacob Lopez (Plaintiff); Brian Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Rosendin Electric, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by:
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jacob Lopez (Plaintiff); Brian Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Document:Ntc of Removal to Federal Court Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Statement; Filed by:
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Jacob Lopez (Plaintiff); Brian Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling at Further Status Conference; Filed by:
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Message Board Posting - MESSAGE BOARD POSTING CASE ANYWHERE
Date: November 06, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 10, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: November 13, 2020Informal Discovery Conference - INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: November 25, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO ADVANCE THE H...)
Date: November 13, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS
Date: November 30, 2020Informal Discovery Conference
Date: November 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REQUEST FOR IDC)
Date: December 02, 2020Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: December 02, 2020Request for Informal Discovery Conference - Complex
Date: December 21, 2020Request for Informal Discovery Conference - Complex
Date: December 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 08, 2021Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: January 08, 2021Informal Discovery Conference Report - Complex - JOINT INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE REPORT
Date: January 21, 2021Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Joint Case Management Conference Statement
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Rosendin Electric, INC.'s Supplemental to Joint Case Management Conference Statement
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Plaintiffs Jacob Lopez and Brian Williams' Response to Defendant Rosedin Electric, Inc.'s Discovery Plan
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Other - (Joint Discovery Plan)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Amended Notice of ruling at Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Separate Statement (in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant - Further Responses (Set One))
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (Further Responses (Set One))
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Tara Zabehi in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion - Further Responses (Set One))
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (Further Responses to Special Interrogatories (Set Two))
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Case Anywhere)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (Further Responses to Special Interrogatories (Set One))
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Advance the H...))
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Address
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Request for IDC))
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Request for Informal Discovery Conference - Complex
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Joint Informal Discovery Conference Report
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Notice (of Informal Discovery Conference and Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application Hearing)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Request for Informal Discovery Conference - Complex ((Answer))
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Continue Class Certification Deadline)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Supreme Court Decision on Nara...))
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Trial Plan in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Compendium of Declarations in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Tara Zabehi in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Brian Williams Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Edwin Aiwazian in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Defendant Rosendin Electric, INC.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Dr. Richard Drogin in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Jacob Lopez in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Response to Order to Show Cause RE
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Defendant Rosendin Electric, Inc.'s Response to Order to Show Cause Re Discovery
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Tara Zabehi in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Order)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Request for Informal Discovery Conference - Complex
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why a Discovery Referee Should Not be...))
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Tara Zabehi in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Declarations of Kenneth Tivis)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Briefing Schedule re Plaintiffs' Discovery Motions)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Lodging of Deposition Transcripts (Jacob Macias & Ernesto Lopez)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Deposition Transcript of Ernesto Lopez 4/09/2021
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Class Certification; Hearing on Motion ...))
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Order (Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Reporter's Transcript of Proceedings 6/30/2021
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (certified Reporter's Transcript of Proceeding Held)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Stipulation for Dismissal of the Action and Declaration of Edwin Aiwazian in Support Thereof
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Deposition Transcript of Jacob Macias 4/06/2021
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Further Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Notice of Payment of Civil Complex Fee
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Notice Of Appearance
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Defendant Rosendin Electric, Inc's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for a Protective Order
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Status Conference))
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for a Protective Order Requir...))
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Notice (of Informal Discovery Conference and Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application Hearing)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.