Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Kenp Inc., Nguyen Khoa Dinh, Perez Elmo Jr., filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Chang Grace L., against Hoang Mike, Huynh Tuyet, Kenp Inc., Madrid Anthony A., Magnolia World Holding Llc, (total of 10) See All represented by Dimonte Anthony A., Roth Virgil L, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michael L. Stern presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael L. Stern Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management168 days |
Filing DateApril 02, 2018 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions289 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time665 days |
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. BREACH OF ORAL PARTNERSHIP AGREEMENT
Date: April 02, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: April 02, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Date: April 05, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: April 25, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: April 05, 2018PRROF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: May 09, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: May 09, 2018Minute Order -
Date: June 12, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: June 14, 2018Notice of Ruling
Date: January 17, 2019Answer - Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: January 30, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application of Defen...)
Date: February 01, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: February 07, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: February 13, 2019Order - Order to Continue Final Status Conference and Trial
Date: February 19, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing Trial...)
Date: February 14, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 20, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)
Date: February 19, 2019Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: March 20, 2019Separate Statement
Date: April 22, 2019Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: April 22, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING DATE
Date: April 24, 2019Separate Statement
Date: May 01, 2019Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: April 22, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 23, 2019Separate Statement
Date: April 23, 2019Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: May 02, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: May 15, 2019Reply - REPLY REPLY TO VIRGIL ROTH'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISQUALIFY
Date: May 20, 2019Reply - REPLY REPLY TO ADLI LAW GROUP'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISQUALIFY
Date: May 20, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: June 06, 2019Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT
Date: September 20, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING
Date: October 02, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ...)
Date: September 27, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: October 23, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: December 20, 2019Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL
Date: October 30, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: December 23, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/23/2019
Date: December 23, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 03, 2023Request for Dismissal
Date: January 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT)
Date: April 04, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 05, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF RULING
Date: April 07, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT)
Date: April 07, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 07, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE JUDGMENT ON STIPULATION)
Date: April 12, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: April 19, 2023Judgment - JUDGMENT ON STIPULATION
Date: April 12, 2023Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: May 17, 2023Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: May 16, 2023PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE; ETC.
Date: June 22, 2018REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE
Date: June 26, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT
Date: June 26, 2018Minute Order -
Date: June 28, 2018FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS
Date: July 02, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: July 02, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: July 12, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: July 16, 2018Minute Order -
Date: July 19, 2018NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 24, 2018DEFENDANTS' VERIFIED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: August 21, 2018CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FRAUD, ETC
Date: August 21, 2018Minute Order -
Date: September 17, 2018NOTICE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES
Date: September 19, 2018Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) - PORTIONS OF THE CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: October 09, 2018Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT;
Date: October 09, 2018Motion to Disqualify Counsel - ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANTS;
Date: October 09, 2018Other - - Other - DECLARATION OF ANTHONY DIMONTE
Date: October 22, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel for defendants Khoa D...)
Date: November 09, 2018Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling Re: Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Attorney for Defendants
Date: November 15, 2018Order - Order re disqualifying of counsel
Date: November 28, 2018Notice - Notice of order re disqualification of counsel
Date: December 07, 2018Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale
Date: May 18, 2023Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: May 24, 2023Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: May 25, 2023Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES )
Date: May 19, 2023Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: May 23, 2023Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: May 26, 2023Complaint
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-04-15T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-10 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Other - (DECLARATION OF ANTHONY DIMONTE)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT;)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (of Motion to Disqualify Attorney For Defendants)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel (Attorney for Defendants)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) (PORTIONS OF THE CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Other - (DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANTS)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Re: Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Attorney for Defendants)
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel for defendants Khoa D...))
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Order (re disqualifying of counsel)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal as to the Entity for Failur...))
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Notice (of order re disqualification of counsel)
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Answer (to Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application of Defen...))
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Order (to Continue Final Status Conference and Trial)
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing Trial...))
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Further Responses to Form Interrogatories [Set One] from Surgical Endo LLC)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Form Interrogatories [Set One] from Khoa Dinh Nguyen)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Notice ( of change of hearing date)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: June 10, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 11, 2019Motion to Enforce Settlement - MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Date: August 28, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 29, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)
Date: August 29, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 29, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/29/2019
Date: August 29, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Date: September 16, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT
Date: September 18, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 20, 2019Opposition (Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Requests for Production)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Opposition (Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Form Interrogatories)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Reply ( to Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories from Surgical Endo)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Reply ( to Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories from Khoa Nguyen)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion for Disqualification of Counsel)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for ...))
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Declaration ( of Virgil Roth ISO Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Disqualification of Counsel)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Lynn Roth re: Amended Proof of Service)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION OF DEFENDANTS COUNSELS)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Final Status Conference) of 06/06/2019)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Counsel))
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Virgil Roth's Opposition to Motion to Disqualify)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Reply (Reply to ADLI Law Group's Opposition to Motion to Disqualify)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement))
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Motion to Enforce Settlement (Agreement)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Enforce Settlement)
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF RULING)
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Declaration ( of Grace Lea Chang in Support of Reply to Opposition to Motion to Enforce Settlement)
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/23/2019)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/29/2019)
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 06/11/2019)
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Declaration ( of Susan Carter in Support of Reply to Opposition to Motion to Enforce Settlement)
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Notice ( of Non-Receipt of Opposition to Motion to Enforce Settlement)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement; Order to Show Cause ...))
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.