Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Combs Dismissed 1 10 19 Crystal Lee, Hom Alexander Kwong Tomizo, Rogers Gini Wong, Navarro Kasey, Weisberg Dismissed 1 29 19 Steven, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Cheren Daniel J, Weisberg Louis Steven Esq., against Combs Dismissed 1 10 19 Crystal Lee, Hom Alexander Kwong Tomizo, Rogers Gini Wong, represented by Bartholomew Diane Louise, Birdt Jonathan Wesley, Macdonald Scott L, Moscatel Abby Jane, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Laura A. Seigle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 12, 2018 |
CategoryPremise Liability (E.G., Dangerous Conditions Of Property, Slip/Trip And Fall, Dog Attack, Etc.) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Special Verdict
Date: October 07, 2021Judgment - JUDGMENT ON SPECIAL VERDICT
Date: October 08, 2021Complaint
Date: March 12, 2018COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (NEGLIGENCE)
Date: March 12, 2018Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Answer To Cross Complaint; Filed by: Alexander Kwong Tomizo Hom (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Kasey Navarro (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Gini Wong Rogers (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Alexander Kwong Tomizo Hom (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Summons on Cross Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Crystal Lee Combs (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Alexander Kwong Tomizo Hom (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Alexander Kwong Tomizo Hom (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Kasey Navarro (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Notice Notice of Change of Email Address; Filed by: Gini Wong Rogers (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ex-Parte Proceedings) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Special Verdict; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Witness List -Amend, Joint; Filed by: Alexander Kwong Tomizo Hom (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Updated -- On the Complaint filed by STEVEN WEISBERG ET AL on , judgment entered on is vacated
Date: December 16, 2021Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict; Filed by: Kasey Navarro (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Crystal Lee Combs (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Alexander Kwong Tomizo Hom (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Alexander Kwong Tomizo Hom (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Gini Wong Rogers (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Gini Wong Rogers (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Alexander Kwong Tomizo Hom (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Gini Wong Rogers (Defendant); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Alexander Kwong Tomizo Hom (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Kasey Navarro (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Judgment on Special Verdict; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Alexander Kwong Tomizo Hom (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Kasey Navarro (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Kasey Navarro (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Alexander Kwong Tomizo Hom (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by STEVEN WEISBERG ET AL on , judgment entered on as to Kasey Navarro is
Date: December 16, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 12, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: March 12, 2018Proof of Personal Service - of Summons
Date: October 05, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: August 31, 2018Demand for Jury Trial
Date: November 02, 2018Summons - Summons on Cross Complaint
Date: November 02, 2018Answer
Date: November 02, 2018Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 02, 2018Cross-Complaint
Date: November 02, 2018Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: November 02, 2018Demand for Jury Trial
Date: December 04, 2018Answer
Date: December 04, 2018Cross-Complaint
Date: December 06, 2018Cross-Complaint
Date: December 20, 2018Answer
Date: December 20, 2018Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: December 31, 2018Answer - Answer To Cross Complaint
Date: December 31, 2018Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 23, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: March 16, 2020Association of Attorney
Date: April 03, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: April 07, 2020Answer
Date: April 10, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: April 22, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: August 05, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: July 29, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: August 10, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: August 19, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/20/2020
Date: August 20, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 20, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT)
Date: August 27, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: September 01, 2020Answer
Date: September 04, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 15, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 17, 2020Notice - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: September 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: September 30, 2020Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT GINI WONG ROGERS’ OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: January 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CHALLENGE THE GOOD FAITH OF A SETTLEMENT...)
Date: February 05, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: March 03, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: March 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: July 22, 2021Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO PRECLUDE GOLDEN RULE ARGUMENT
Date: September 03, 2021Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE REPTILE THEORY ARGUMENT;
Date: September 03, 2021Witness List
Date: September 07, 2021Exhibit List
Date: September 07, 2021Statement of the Case
Date: September 10, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: September 10, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE ALL TESTIMONY
Date: September 13, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF KASEY NAVARROS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE ALL TESTIMONY
Date: September 13, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE ALL TESTIMONY
Date: September 13, 2021Witness List - WITNESS LIST -AMEND, JOINT
Date: September 20, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 21, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: September 21, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: September 22, 2021Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: September 23, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL - IN PROGRESS)
Date: September 23, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: September 23, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL - IN PROGRESS)
Date: September 24, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: September 24, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL - IN PROGRESS)
Date: September 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS)
Date: September 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS)
Date: September 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS)
Date: September 30, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS)
Date: October 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL - IN PROGRESS)
Date: October 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC)
Date: October 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS)
Date: October 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS)
Date: October 06, 2021Jury Instructions
Date: October 06, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL - DELIBERATIONS)
Date: October 07, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: October 08, 2021Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict
Date: October 22, 2021Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial
Date: October 26, 2021Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: October 28, 2021Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT
Date: November 19, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: December 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT H...)
Date: December 01, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: December 02, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: January 10, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: January 29, 2019Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: April 29, 2019Association of Attorney
Date: May 23, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: August 07, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS) OF 02/28/2020
Date: February 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS)
Date: February 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: March 06, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 06, 2020Exhibit List Filed by Kasey Navarro (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Alexander Kwong Tomizo Hom (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by Alexander Kwong Tomizo Hom (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Judgment (on Special Verdict) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Special Verdict Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT H...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (NUNC PRO TUNC)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Alexander Kwong Tomizo Hom (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (JURY TRIAL)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (JURY TRIAL)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict Filed by Kasey Navarro (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (JURY TRIAL - DELIBERATIONS)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ((JURY TRIAL - IN PROGRESS)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (JURY TRIAL - IN PROGRESS)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ((JURY TRIAL - IN PROGRESS)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ((JURY TRIAL)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Alexander Kwong Tomizo Hom (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ((JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ((JURY TRIAL - IN PROGRESS)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ((JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER) Filed by Alexander Kwong Tomizo Hom (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Witness List (-Amend, Joint) Filed by Alexander Kwong Tomizo Hom (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service (of Summons)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Answer (To Cross Complaint)
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Change of Email Address)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF DEFENDANT'S WEALTH OR ASSETS AT TRIAL)
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ex-Parte Proceedings) of 02/28/2020)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (For an Order Continuing Final Status Conference and Trial By Stipulation)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings))
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/20/2020)
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT) of 08/27/2020)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Motion to Contest Gini Wong Rogers' Application for Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT))
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00REPLY TO DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT GINI WONG ROGERS? OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Plaintiff's Notice of Unavailability
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON MOTION TO CHALLENGE THE GOOD FAITH OF A SETTLEMENT...))
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE))
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE))
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Amended Order Determining Good Faith Settlement and Dismissing Pending Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Order Determining Good Faith Settlement and Dismissing Pending Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine (IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE REPTILE THEORY ARGUMENT;)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY BY PLAINTIFFS THIRD-PARTY WITNESS, STEPHEN PFAHLFER;)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Motion in Limine (IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO PRECLUDE GOLDEN RULE ARGUMENT)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE))
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Witness List (-Amend, Joint)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF KASEY NAVARROS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE ALL TESTIMONY
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (JURY TRIAL))
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE ALL TESTIMONY
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE ALL TESTIMONY
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS))
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS))
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (JURY TRIAL - IN PROGRESS))
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (JURY TRIAL))
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS))
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((JURY TRIAL - IN PROGRESS))
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ((NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER))
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (NUNC PRO TUNC))
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ((JURY TRIAL))
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS))
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS))
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((JURY TRIAL - IN PROGRESS))
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ((JURY TRIAL - IN PROGRESS))
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER))
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Judment Notwithstanding the Verdict)
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Judgment (on Special Verdict)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (JURY TRIAL - DELIBERATIONS))
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ((JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS))
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (JURY TRIAL - IN PROGRESS))
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (JURY TRIAL - IN PROGRESS))
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Answer Filed by Gini Wong Rogers (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ex-Parte Proceedings) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Crystal Lee Combs (Dismissed ) (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Steven Weisberg (Dismissed ) (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Alexander Kwong Tomizo Hom (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Alexander Kwong Tomizo Hom (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Answer (To Cross Complaint) Filed by Alexander Kwong Tomizo Hom (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Alexander Kwong Tomizo Hom (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Crystal Lee Combs (Dismissed ) (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Answer Filed by Alexander Kwong Tomizo Hom (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Crystal Lee Combs (Dismissed ) (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Change of Email Address) Filed by Gini Wong Rogers (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by Alexander Kwong Tomizo Hom (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Kasey Navarro (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Steven Weisberg (Dismissed ) (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by Kasey Navarro (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by Crystal Lee Combs (Dismissed ) (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Answer Filed by Crystal Lee Combs (Dismissed ) (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Gini Wong Rogers (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Answer Filed by Alexander Kwong Tomizo Hom (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Kasey Navarro (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Gini Wong Rogers (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Plaintiff's Notice of Unavailability Filed by Kasey Navarro (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Kasey Navarro (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Gini Wong Rogers (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Alexander Kwong Tomizo Hom (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON MOTION TO CHALLENGE THE GOOD FAITH OF A SETTLEMENT...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance of Case Management Conference) Filed by Kasey Navarro (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Kasey Navarro (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Answer Filed by Gini Wong Rogers (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Alexander Kwong Tomizo Hom (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Gini Wong Rogers (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Gini Wong Rogers (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Crystal Lee Combs (Dismissed ) (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.