Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Animashaun Isaac, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Liskey Robert John Esq., against Hevedia Daniel, Target Corporation, represented by Burnett Sean Raymond, Farley Jessica, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Elaine Lu presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElaine Lu Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF UNRUH CIVIL RIGHTS ACT (CIVIL CODE 51, 52) ;ETC
Date: December 12, 2017CLERK?S NOTICE OF VOIDING OF FILING
Date: January 22, 2018ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING (SUPERIOR COURT)
Date: December 28, 2017ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER
Date: December 13, 2017CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: January 22, 2018REQUEST FOR REFUND
Date: June 25, 2018Minute Order -
Date: August 01, 2018Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: October 22, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment to Independent Calendar Court as ...)
Date: November 30, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment to Independent Calendar (IC) Court)
Date: December 04, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: January 03, 2019Order - Order re: Plaintiff's Motion to Have Case Restored to Active Status
Date: February 15, 2019Motion for Leave - Motion for Leave Restoration of Case
Date: January 23, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Order Reinstating case to active status)
Date: February 15, 2019Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint First Amended
Date: February 21, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: May 08, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 04, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: May 09, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: April 25, 2019Answer - ANSWER TO PLTF'S UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: May 24, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: May 09, 2019Case Management Order
Date: May 09, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: June 04, 2019Case Management Order
Date: June 18, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: March 18, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2017-12-13T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-12-12T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing (Superior Court)
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Clerk's Notice of Voiding of Filing
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Reimbursement of Fees
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order Re Reassignment to Independent Calendar (IC) Court))
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Motion for Leave (Restoration of Case)
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: June 18, 2019Declaration
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order Re Reassignment to Independent Calendar Court as ...))
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Order (re: Plaintiff's Motion to Have Case Restored to Active Status)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Answer (TO PLTF'S UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Amended Complaint (First Amended)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Reinstating case to active status))
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: March 18, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.