Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Stonebraker Dana, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Jaguar Land Rover North America Llc, represented by Takahashi Brian Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Daniel S. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel S. Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2017 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time351 days |
COMPLAINT 1. BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY ;ETC
Date: December 04, 2017SUMMONS -
Date: December 04, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: December 12, 2017DEFENDANT JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: January 08, 2018ORDER FOR REMAND
Date: January 29, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: March 15, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: March 15, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: March 20, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: March 20, 2018Minute Order -
Date: April 04, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: April 04, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: November 19, 2018Answer Filed by JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: DANA STONEBRAKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00Notice Filed by Court
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by DANA STONEBRAKER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-04 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-12-12T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-12T00:00:00Document:Order-Case Management Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-12T00:00:00Complaint Filed by DANA STONEBRAKER (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-04 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2019-01-29 00:00:00 | |
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Daniel S. Murphy |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Daniel S. Murphy 8:30 am | |
January 29, 2019 | Hearing |
in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Daniel S. Murphy |
|
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Final Status Conference Daniel S. Murphy 8:30 am | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2019-01-17 00:00:00 | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Daniel S. Murphy |
|
January 17, 2019 | Hearing |
in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Daniel S. Murphy |
|
December 03, 2018 | Hearing | Jury Trial scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
December 03, 2018 | Hearing | Final Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Vacated by Court on |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.