Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Prime Healthcare Services Centinela Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Bonita Finney And Angela Gordon As, Finney Bonita, Gordon Angela, represented by Moore Johnson, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with David Sotelo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid Sotelo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management267 days |
Filing DateNovember 20, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions310 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time310 days |
COMPLAINT ON REJECTED CREDITOR'S CLAIM FOR: 1. BREACH OF COTRACT ;ETC
Date: November 20, 2017SUMMONS -
Date: November 20, 2017Notice of Related Cases -
Date: November 20, 2017NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 04, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING -
Date: December 04, 2017NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -
Date: December 13, 2017NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -
Date: December 14, 2017Minute Order -
Date: January 26, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: February 13, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: February 14, 2018CROSS-COMPLA1NT FOR DAMAGES 1. FINANCIAL ELDER ABUSE 2. PHYSICAL ELDER ABUSE; ETC.
Date: February 15, 2018Minute Order -
Date: February 26, 2018NOTICE OF RULING RE CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 27, 2018NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION
Date: March 08, 2018Minute Order -
Date: March 27, 2018Minute Order -
Date: April 16, 2018STATEMENT OF RULING RE: DENIED PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: April 16, 2018ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE
Date: April 19, 2018NOTICE OF RULING DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: April 25, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: May 01, 2018NOTICE OF APPEAL/CROSS-APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE) (APPELLATE)
Date: May 02, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: May 03, 2018NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED JURISDICTION)
Date: May 03, 2018APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)
Date: May 08, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT
Date: May 15, 2018NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL)
Date: June 27, 2018NOTICE OF FEES DUE FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL (CIVIL)
Date: July 23, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: July 27, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: July 30, 2018NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL
Date: August 14, 2018Minute Order -
Date: August 14, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: September 26, 2018OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2017-12-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2017-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Designation of Record on Appeal
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: September 26, 2018Ntc to Prty re fee Clk's Transcpt
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: September 26, 2018Notice of Appeal
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: August 14, 2018Minute order entered: 2018-10-03 00:00:00
Date: October 03, 2018Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Brief-Reply
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Notice
Date: August 29, 2018Order
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.