Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Garcia Marlene, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Balaban Daniel, Li Teresa, against Owiecki Robert J., Whittier City School District, represented by Bauermeister Linda, Bauermeister Linda S., Danforth Scott Dale, Kostrenich Robert Stephen, Wadlington Marlon Craig, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJon R. Takasugi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management656 days |
Filing DateOctober 11, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedApril 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Motion for Summary Judgment (by Defendant Robert J. Owiecki)
Date: July 01, 2021COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: October 11, 2017Declaration (of Joseph S. Schwartzberg)
Date: December 31, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 23, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: December 22, 2017Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Defendant Whittier City School Di...)
Date: February 20, 2019Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: May 02, 2019Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: January 08, 2020Notice of Joinder - NOTICE OF JOINDER (NAME EXTENSION) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 14, 2020Motion to Quash - MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSTION SUBPOENA AND FOR ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY SANCTIONS
Date: December 03, 2020Motion to Quash - MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA AND FOR ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY SANCTIONS
Date: December 03, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION - PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: December 31, 2020Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: January 08, 2021Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: January 13, 2021Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER RE MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: January 13, 2021Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER TO MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: April 20, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS)
Date: April 13, 2021Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: May 12, 2021Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: April 20, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: May 19, 2021Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S MENTAL EXAMINATION, SESSION TWO
Date: August 12, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S MENTAL EXAMINATION, S...)
Date: September 14, 2021Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 24, 2021Reply - REPLY ADDITIONAL REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: October 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: September 30, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: October 14, 2021ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: January 08, 2018FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: March 28, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 15, 2021Application
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-12-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Ex Parte Application ( to Shortening Time to Hear the Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Diane S. Everstine)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Marlene Garcia)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Defendant Whittier City School Di...))
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Shortening Time to Hear t...))
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Protective Order-Confidential Designation Only)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Shortening Time to Hear t...))
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Re: Plaintiff's deposition and protective order)
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Notice of Lodging Exhibit "G" Under Seal)
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Declaration (Compendium of Evidence and Declarations)
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Order (Transferring Complicated Personal Injury (PI) Case to an Independent Calendar (IC) Court)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order REGARDING SETTING CASE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFER...))
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal Motion to Seal Exhibit G for Motion...))
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Trial Setting Order
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Separate Statement (of Undisputed Material Facts)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Unredacted Copy of Exhibit "G")
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Exhibit "G" Submitted in Support of Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Declaration (Compendium of Evidence, Declarations, and Exhibits)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Joinder (Name Extension) (MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFFS? MANDATORY SETTLEMENT STATEMENT)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application by defendant Whittier City Sc...))
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00in Department F
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/24/2020)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/24/2020)
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order advancing and vacating trial dates;))
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order advancing and vacating trial dates;) of 05/18/2020)
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/08/2020)
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)) of 07/06/2020)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Trial Setting Order
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Defendant Robert J. Owickie)
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00in Department F
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Trial setting Conference;))
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC); Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Notice (of Substitution of Attorney)
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal Motion to Seal Exhibit Submitted in...))
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Order (/Ruling On 7/21/2020 Hearing Denying Deft Whittier City School District's Mtn To Seal Exhibit G)
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] Order to Motion to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Reply (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial))
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Robert Owiecki's Motion To Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Reply (TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant Robert Owiecki's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Declaration (OF DR. ROGER LIGHT in Support of Motion For Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Declaration (OF ROBERT OWIECKI in Support of Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Reply (of Robert J Owiecki to Opposition to ExParte Specially Setting Hearing on MSJ)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Daniel K Balaban ISO Opposition to Defendant's ExParte)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Memorandum (Defendant Owiecki's Evidence Submitted in Support of Motion For Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Exparte Application For An Or...))
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Opposition (of Plaintiff to ExParte for Order Specially Setting Owiecki's MSJ)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Declaration (OF ROBERT KOSTRENICH, ESQ. in Support of Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Declaration (OF VLB ISO PLTF'S OPP TO DEF'S MTN TO COMPEL 2ND MENTAL EXAM)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Reply (PLTF'S RESP TO SEPARATE STMT TO DEF'S MTN TO COMPEL 2ND MENTAL EXAM)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (PLTFS' NOTICE OF LODGEMENT - EXHIBIT 3 RECORDING ISO OPP TO DEF' MTN TO COMPEL)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Plaintiff's Mental Examination, Session Two)
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Opposition (PLTFS' OPP TO DEF'S MTN TO COMPEL 2ND MENTAL EXAM)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Amended Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Mental Examination, Session Two)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing 9-14-21)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Hearing 9-14-21))
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Mental Examination, S...))
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Reply (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter - Hearing Held September 14, 2021))
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Order ([PROPOSED] COURT ORDER)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial and Order Plaintiff be Produced for Court Ordered IME)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Objection (EVIDENTIARY OBJECTION 1 IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Advancing and Vacating hearing on Ex Parte Applic...))
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Objection (EVIDENTIARY OBJECTION 2 IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing 9-30-21)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Reply (ADDITIONAL REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Order (Re Stipulation to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Deposition Subpoena And For Order Imposing Monetary Sanctions)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Depostion Subpoena and For Order Imposing Monetary Sanctions)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Opposition (- Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Declaration (of Teresa Li in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Notice (- Compendium of Evidence)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Separate Statement)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Declaration (of Scott D. Danforth)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiff's Evidence)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Marlene Garcia in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order Re Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Deposition Transcripts)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication filed on behalf of...))
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 02/24/2021)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation to Continue Trial and Related Dates)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order Re Stipulation to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Ruling on Submitted Matter (Hearing held 1-14-21)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC); Mandatory Settlement C...))
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STATEMENT OF POLICIES & PROCEDURES FOR REMOTE MSC)
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings))
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiffs' Opposition to the District's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing 4-13-21)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Separate Statement (in Support of Motion to Quash Subpoena (Whittier Union High School))
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Notice (OF TAKING NOTION TO QUASH OFF CALENDAR)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2022 | Hearing |
Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) |
|
April 29, 2022 | Hearing |
Department R at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650 Case Management Review |
|
April 11, 2022 | Hearing |
Department R at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650 Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise with Special Needs Trust |
|
March 23, 2022 | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) | ||
December 23, 2021 | Hearing |
Department C at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
December 23, 2021 | Hearing | ||
November 29, 2021 | Hearing |
Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650 Jury Trial |
|
November 15, 2021 | Hearing |
Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650 Final Status Conference |
|
October 22, 2021 | Hearing |
Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650 Jury Trial |
|
October 22, 2021 | Hearing | Jury Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.