Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Andrew Milder D, Milder Andrew, Dominguez Jorge P., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Holley Shawn, Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump & Aldisert Llp, Nemecek & Cole, represented by Cole Jonathan Berres, Cole Marshall, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Rupert A. Byrdsong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRupert A. Byrdsong Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management889 days |
Filing DateMay 06, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions160 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeArbitration Award |
Case Cycle Time1456 days |
OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE MOTION HEARING
Date: February 07, 2018Document:Notice of Appeal Filed by: Appellant
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Document:Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-04-28T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2015-08-07T00:00:00Document:Motion to Tax Costs Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-10-13T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-09-28T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2015-06-25T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-03-08T00:00:00Document:Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-02-23T00:00:00Document:Notice of Designation of Record Filed by: Appellant, Appellant in Pro Per
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2015-05-06T00:00:00Document:1N11's Ntc of Hrng on Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-06-24T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-10-19T00:00:00Document:Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-10-23T00:00:00Document:Notice of Appeal Filed by: Appellant, Appellant in Pro Per
Date: 2015-10-22T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Appellant, Appellant in Pro Per
Date: 2015-11-02T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-06-24T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-10-21T00:00:00Document:Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Document:Notice of Designation of Record Filed by: Appellant, Appellant in Pro Per
Date: 2015-11-02T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff in Pro Per APPP
Date: 2015-11-30T00:00:00Document:Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2015-05-07T00:00:00Document:Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-02-17T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-02T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Document:Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Document:Response Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-04-08T00:00:00Document:Request Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Document:Response Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Document:Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Document:Memorandum of Costs Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-04-08T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Document:Notice-Hearing-Motion-New Trial Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Document:Exhibit Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Status Conference/Evidentiary Hearing) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00Document:Notice of Lodging Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Objection to Proposed Judgment Submitted by Defendants; Filed by:
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00Document:Remittitur Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Appellant, Appellant in Pro Per
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Document:Supporting Docs/ P's & A's Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Document:Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-12-04T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2015-06-25T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Document:Memorandum of Costs Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2015-09-18T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-13T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff in Pro Per APPP
Date: 2015-08-17T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Opposition TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES; Filed by: Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff in Pro Per APPP
Date: 2015-08-20T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-13T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid RESPONDENT PAID SUPPLEMENTAL $114.89; Filed by:
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Brief Status Conference Statement; Filed by: Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump et al. LLP (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Response to notice of related cases; Filed by: Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-25T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued "U1"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Notice of Continuance of Hearing; Filed by: Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal N.O.A. B298984; Filed by:
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-17T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal N.O.A. B303175; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Reply to Order Striking Statement of Disqualification; Filed by: Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid APPELLANT PAID $120.89; Filed by:
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Declaration ISO new trial motion; Filed by: Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-25T00:00:00Exhibit List for Opposition to Motion for Fees; Filed by: Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00Order Re: Motion for Appellate Attorney Fees; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00Appeal - Certificate of Clerk Re: Missing Record For Appeal N.O.A B298984; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Document:Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) NOA:; "U2"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Order Re: Striking Statement of Disqualification: Verified Answer; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs on Appeal; Filed by: Shawn Holley (Defendant); As to: Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal "U1"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Shawn Holley (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Request for Refund of Reporter Appeal Transcript Deposit;NOA ;; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Document:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2015-08-07T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-01-14T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Document:Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Motion for New Trial; Filed by: Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-24T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Updated -- Motion for Attorney Fees: Filed By: Shawn Holley (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date:
Date: 2023-03-17T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed B298984; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-12-07T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Document:Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-use CSR Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2015-12-14T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-05-21T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid Respondent $84.73; Filed by:
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Judge
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Judge
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-use CSR Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2015-08-31T00:00:00Document:Memo of Costs on Appeal Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Order on Media Request to Permit Coverage; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-06-26T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Order Ruling (10//18/18); Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Document:Response Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Judge
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Defendant
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript;B303175, NOA ;; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Media Request to Photograph, Record, or Broadcast; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Notice of Related Cases) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript;B298984, NOA ;; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial; Filed by: Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-14T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid APPELLANT PAID $133.25 "U1"; Filed by:
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid RESPONDENT PAID $1465.19; Filed by:
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-25T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Andrew Milder (Appellant)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Default NOA: B298984; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Appellate Order Extension of Time NOA: B298984; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid APPELLANT PAID $171.25; Filed by:
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Opposition to Memo of Costs; Filed by: Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Reply TO DEFENDANTS’ OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL; Filed by: Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-16T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 24, 2023Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-25T00:00:00PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE?CIVIL
Date: April 13, 2018Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -
Date: May 24, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL
Date: July 31, 2017AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: September 17, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL
Date: October 16, 2017Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 06, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 19, 2019Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL "U2"
Date: December 16, 2019Appeal - Notice of Default Issued "U2"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed B303175; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Errata; Filed by: Andrew Milder (Plaintiff); As to: Jonathan Berres Cole (Attorney)
Date: 2023-04-25T00:00:00Affidavit for Rlse Funds/Req for Payment Rptr Appeal Trnscpt;NOA , Jorge P. Dominguez #12523; Filed by:
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Brief Status Conference Statement; Filed by: Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Shawn Holley (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued "U2"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 24, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 25, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 25, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 30, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 10, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 15, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 14, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 25, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 16, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 20, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 30, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL
Date: October 16, 2017DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL
Date: October 16, 2017DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL
Date: January 09, 2018OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE MOTION HEARING
Date: January 30, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL
Date: January 09, 2018OPPOSITION OF MOTION TO WTHDRAW AS COUNSEL; DANA DORSETT
Date: January 30, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL
Date: February 08, 2018DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL
Date: February 08, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: April 10, 2018ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL
Date: April 09, 2018DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: May 03, 2018REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: May 21, 2018Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: June 24, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES)
Date: October 16, 2019Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: May 04, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES
Date: July 21, 2022Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR APPELLATE ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST PLAINTIFF
Date: July 27, 2022Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: August 09, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES
Date: January 24, 2023Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST FOR OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR FEES
Date: January 25, 2023Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR APPELLATE ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST PLAINTIFF
Date: January 27, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES; NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: February 06, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: MOTION TO RECUSE/DISQUALIFY-JUDGE TERESA A. B...)
Date: February 15, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES)
Date: March 17, 2023Order - ORDER RE: MOTION FOR APPELLATE ATTORNEY FEES
Date: March 17, 2023Motion for New Trial
Date: April 24, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION ISO NEW TRIAL MOTION
Date: April 25, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS’ OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: May 04, 2023Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANTS’ OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: May 16, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF TIME CHANGE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRAIL
Date: May 18, 2023Order - ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF ANDRE W. MILDER'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: June 27, 2023Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: July 12, 2023Ex-Parte Application Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-06-25T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING DENYING PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: June 28, 2023ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF
Date: August 03, 2018Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2015-08-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-12-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-12-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-30 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-05-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Appeal Filed by Appellant
Date: 2015-10-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-10 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-05-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2015-12-14T00:00:00Unknown Document Type Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-22 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00Motion Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-05-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record Filed by Appellant
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-05-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-27 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-10-23T00:00:00Brief Filed by Shawn Holley (Defendant); Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump & Aldisert, LLP (Defendant)
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record Filed by Appellant
Date: 2015-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Defendant
Date: 2015-08-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Brief Filed by Shawn Holley (Defendant)
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Shawn Holley (Defendant)
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-08-31 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-08-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Shawn Holley (Defendant)
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Appeal Filed by Appellant
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Reply to Opposition Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-12-07T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump & Aldisert, LLP (Defendant)
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Appellant
Date: 2015-11-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-12-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Appellant
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-02-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-09-18T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-02-23T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Notice Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Brief Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Order Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-01-14T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-11 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Defendant
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Notice Filed by Shawn Holley (Defendant); Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump & Aldisert, LLP (Defendant)
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-03-08T00:00:00Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-04-28T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-06-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-30 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-09 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Shawn Holley (Defendant)
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Notice Filed by Shawn Holley (Defendant); Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump & Aldisert, LLP (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-23 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Notice Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-29 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Notice Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Status Conference/Evidentiary Hearing) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-15 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Answer Filed by Shawn Holley (Defendant); Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump & Aldisert, LLP (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Order Filed by Judge
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Brief Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-20 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Brief Filed by Shawn Holley (Defendant); Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump & Aldisert, LLP (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Notice Filed by Shawn Holley (Defendant); Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump & Aldisert, LLP (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Motion Filed by Shawn Holley (Defendant); Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump & Aldisert, LLP (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Order Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Response Filed by Shawn Holley (Defendant); Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump & Aldisert, LLP (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Order Filed by Judge
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Response Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees; Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Notice of Related Cases)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered (SUPPLEMENTAL) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B303175) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Media Request to Photograph, Record, or Broadcast Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-05-06T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2015-05-07T00:00:001N11's Ntc of Hrng on Demurrer
Date: 2015-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-05-21T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-06-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2015-06-24T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-06-25T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2015-06-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-06-25 00:00:00
Date: 2015-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2015-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-06-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2015-08-07T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-08-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-08-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-08-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-08-20 00:00:00
Date: 2015-08-20T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2015-08-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-08-31 00:00:00
Date: 2015-08-31T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2015-08-31T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-09-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2015-09-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2015-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2015-10-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-11-02T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal
Date: 2015-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record
Date: 2015-11-02T00:00:00Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt
Date: 2015-12-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2015-12-14T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2015-12-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-12-14 00:00:00
Date: 2015-12-14T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal
Date: 2016-02-17T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal
Date: 2016-02-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-03-08T00:00:00Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt
Date: 2016-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-22 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Unknown Document Type
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-10 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-30 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-30T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-07 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-07 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-27 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-08-20 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-08-20T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2015-08-31T00:00:00Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-10-19T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-05-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Defendant
Date: 2015-08-07T00:00:00Reply to Opposition Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-25T00:00:00Order Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-09-28T00:00:00Notice Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-06-25 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-06-25T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-11 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-11-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-09 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-30 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-15 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2018-04-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-08T00:00:00Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-29 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Response
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-22 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Request
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference))
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Order (Ruling (10//18/18))
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 11/14/2018)
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (of Hearing)
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-09 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Notice Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Request Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Order (Ruling (10//18/18)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Notice Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Notice Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Timothy D. Reuben, Esq. (Attorney); Dana Moon Dorsett, Esq. (Attorney)
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump & Aldisert, LLP (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Response Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-29 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Notice (of Status Conference) Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference/Evidentiary Hearing)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-27 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Order Filed by Judge
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-22 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Notice Filed by Shawn Holley (Defendant); Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump & Aldisert, LLP (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Notice Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Notice Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (of Hearing) Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- (NOA:) Filed by Andrew Milder (Appellant)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Notice of Default (NOA: B298984) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Appellate Order Extension of Time (NOA: B298984) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Default ("U2") Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Brief (Status Conference Statement) Filed by Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump & Aldisert, LLP (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Shawn Holley (Defendant); Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump & Aldisert, LLP (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) ("U1") Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Request (for Reconsideration of Peremptory Challenge) Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal (N.O.A. B303175) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed ("U2") Filed by Andrew Milder (Appellant)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Notice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript on Appeal (;B303175, NOA ;) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Brief (Status Conference Statement) Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed ("U1") Filed by Andrew Milder (Appellant)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Notice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript on Appeal (;B298984, NOA ;) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:; "U2") Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Opposition (to Memo of Costs) Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff); MILDER D ANDREW (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Certificate of Clerk Re: Missing Record For Appeal (N.O.A B298984) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail ("U2") Filed by Andrew Milder (Appellant)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered (SUPPLEMENTAL CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs on Appeal Filed by Shawn Holley (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES) Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Default ("U2") Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Notice of Related Cases) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B298984) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Exhibit List (for Opposition to Motion for Fees) Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees Filed by Shawn Holley (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00Request for Refund of Reporter Appeal Transcript Deposit (;NOA ;) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Order on Media Request to Permit Coverage Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-29T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Default ("U1") Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' Motion for Attorney Fees) Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees Filed by Shawn Holley (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Response (to notice of related cases) Filed by Andrew Milder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by LUCIE BARRON (Non-Party); ADR SERVICES, INC. (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-29 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Response
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Response
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Plaintiff Andrew Milder's supplemental brief in support of plaintiff's brief re: fraudulent inducement
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Status Conference/Evidentiary Hearing) of 10/18/2018)
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference/Evidentiary Hearing))
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Notice (of Status Conference)
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Brief (Status Conference Statement)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference))
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Brief (Status Conference Statement)
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Notice ( of Case Reassignment AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE (Dates Remain))
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge))
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge) of 02/26/2019)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Request (for Reconsideration of Peremptory Challenge)
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 03/21/2019)
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment)
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Opposition (to Memo of Costs)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) ("U1")
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed ("U1")
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff Andrew Milder's Ex Parte Application to Set Aside Judgment)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Default (NOA:06/28/19 B298984)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Appellate Order Extension of Time (NOA:06/28/19 B298984)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Notice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript on Appeal (;B298984, NOA 6/28/19;)
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees))
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Reply (of Defendants to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Prevailing Party Attorney Fees)
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Judgment ([Proposed] Amended Judgment)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail ("U2")
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 (NOA:12/16/19)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:12/16/19; "U2")
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed ("U2")
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Default ("U2")
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Respondent's Ntc Designating Record of Appeal "U2"
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Notice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript on Appeal (;B303175, NOA 12/16/19;)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Certificate of Clerk Re: Missing Record For Appeal (N.O.A 6/28/19 B298984)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal (N.O.A. 12/16/19 B303175)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal (N.O.A. B298984 6/28/19 SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 11 Volumes Certified (for Notice of Appeal, filed 6/28/19, "U1")
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal (N.O.A. 12/16/19 B303175 SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 1 Volume Certified (for Notice of Appeal, filed 12/16/19, "U2")
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Request for Refund of Reporter Appeal Transcript Deposit (;NOA 12/16/19;)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Default ("U2")
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/01/2021)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Notice of Related Cases) of 03/01/2021)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Notice of Related Cases))
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Response (to notice of related cases)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered (SUPPLEMENTAL CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Default ("U1")
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge) of 03/15/2021)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge))
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal ("U1")
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (;B298984, NOA 6/28/19;)
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 (NOA:12/16/19)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (;B303175, NOA 12/16/19;)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued ("U2")
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Appeal - Certificate of Clerk Re: Missing Record For Appeal (N.O.A 6/28/19 B298984)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued ("U2")
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued ("U1")
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.