Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
TAMARA BASKIN VS HUGHES REALTY INC
On December 30, 2011 a civil rights/discrimination (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Edward A. Ferns presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 30, 2011
Last Refreshed
February 13, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Civil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Intentional Torts
Case Outcome Type
Judgment by Court
Status
Appealed
Case Duration
2 years and 19 days
Time To Trial
1 year and 10 months
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Request to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court): Filed By: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff); Result changed from Denied to Granted; Result Date changed from to |
|
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER; Filed by: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs; Signed and Filed by: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff); As to: Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order (on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fee...) of and Order) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fee...)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order Re Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fee...) | |
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order Re Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fee...) of and Order; Filed by: Clerk |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, William F\. Fahey, Presiding Court Order Court Order Judge: William F. Fahey |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order (on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fee...) of 02/19/2019 and Order) Filed by Clerk |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, William F\. Fahey, Presiding Court Order Judge: William F. Fahey |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fee...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of and Order) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order (on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees; Issued and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, William F\. Fahey, Presiding Ruling on Submitted Matter Ruling on Submitted Matter Judge: William F. Fahey |
|
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of and Order; Filed by: Clerk |
|
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) | |
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk |
|
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, William F\. Fahey, Presiding Ruling on Submitted Matter Judge: William F. Fahey |
|
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order (on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees) Filed by Clerk |
|
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/30/2019 and Order) Filed by Clerk |
|
January 24, 2019 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 69 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission | |
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees) | |
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, William F\. Fahey, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Held - Taken under Submission Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Held - Taken under Submission Judge: William F. Fahey |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Mabel Hayek, CSR#11815)) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Mabel Hayek, CSR#11815); Signed and Filed by: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)) Filed by Clerk |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, William F\. Fahey, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Held - Taken under Submission Judge: William F. Fahey |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Mabel Hayek, CSR#11815)) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Updated -- Request to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court): Filed By: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date: ; As To Parties: removed |
|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order) | |
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, William F\. Fahey, Presiding Court Order Court Order Judge: William F. Fahey |
|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 01/23/2019) Filed by Clerk |
|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, William F\. Fahey, Presiding Court Order Judge: William F. Fahey |
|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Reply (PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration ( OF SARA PEZESHKPOUR IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REPLY RE: MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration OF SARA PEZESHKPOUR IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REPLY RE: MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES; Filed by: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Reply PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES; Filed by: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Reply (PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration ( OF SARA PEZESHKPOUR IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REPLY RE: MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Not Held - Continued - Ex Parte Motion Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Not Held - Continued - Ex Parte Motion Judge: Maureen Duffy-Lewis |
|
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Not Held - Continued - Ex Parte Motion Judge: Maureen Duffy-Lewis |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Opposition Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys Fees; Filed by: Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition (Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys Fees) Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration (Declaration of Chilleen in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff Baskin's Motion for Attorneys Fees) Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration Declaration of Chilleen in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff Baskin's Motion for Attorneys Fees; Filed by: Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration (Declaration of Chilleen in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff Baskin's Motion for Attorneys Fees) Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition (Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys Fees) Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court); Filed by: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
January 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Updated -- Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff): Middle Name: blank | |
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 26, 2018 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 38 Not Held - Continued - Ex Parte Motion was rescheduled to 09:30 AM at Department 69 | |
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Jordon Metz in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees; Filed by: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Jeff A. Harrison in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees; Filed by: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Christopher H. Kanuf in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for attorneys' Fees; Filed by: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Sara Pezeshkpour in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fee; Filed by: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Jordon Metz in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Attorney Fees Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion for Attorney's Fees Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Jeff A. Harrison in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Christopher H. Kanuf in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for attorneys' Fees Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Sara Pezeshkpour in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fee Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling on Defendant's Ex parte Request to Transfer Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees to Department 69 Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Annette Morasch in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion for Attorney's Fees; Filed by: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Annette Morasch in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees; Filed by: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling on Defendant's Ex parte Request to Transfer Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees to Department 69; Filed by: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion for Attorney's Fees Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Sara Pezeshkpour in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fee Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Jordon Metz in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Christopher H. Kanuf in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for attorneys' Fees Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Attorney Fees Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Annette Morasch in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling on Defendant's Ex parte Request to Transfer Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees to Department 69 Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Jeff A. Harrison in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Address for Sara Pezeshkpour, Esq. (Attorney) null | |
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Updated -- Sara Pezeshkpour, Esq. (Attorney): First Name: Sara; Last Name: Pezeshkpour; Organization Name changed from Metz & Harrison, LLP to Metz & Harrison LLP; Name Suffix: Esq. | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted Judge: Maureen Duffy-Lewis |
|
December 06, 2018 | hearing | Ex-parte Ex-Parte Proceedings scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 38 | |
December 06, 2018 | hearing | Ex-parte Ex-Parte Proceedings scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 38 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Application to Transfer Plaintiff's Motion for Attor...)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Ex-Parte Application to Transfer Plaintiff's Motion for Attor...) | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Application to Transfer Plaintiff's Motion for Attor...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted Judge: Maureen Duffy-Lewis |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Sara Pezeshkpour; Filed by: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration (of Sara Pezeshkpour) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Opposition (to Ex Parte) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Opposition to Ex Parte; Filed by: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Opposition (to Ex Parte) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration (of Sara Pezeshkpour) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Updated -- Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees: As To Parties: removed | |
November 27, 2018 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 38 | |
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Christopher H. Knauf in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees; Filed by: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Annette Morasch in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees; Filed by: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion for Attorney Fees Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof; Filed by: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Jeff A. Harrison in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees; Filed by: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice (in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Attorney Fees (Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration (of Jordon Metz in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration (of Annette Morasch in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration (of Jeff A. Harrison in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs on Appeal Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration (of Christopher H. Knauf in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration (of Sara Pezeshkpour in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff); As to: Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons & Complaint ?: No |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Sara Pezeshkpour in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees; Filed by: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs on Appeal; Filed by: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff); As to: Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Jordon Metz in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees; Filed by: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees; Filed by: Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration (of Sara Pezeshkpour in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration (of Christopher H. Knauf in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration (of Jordon Metz in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs on Appeal Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Attorney Fees (Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration (of Annette Morasch in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration (of Jeff A. Harrison in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice (in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Appeal - Remittitur - Reversed B279645; Filed by: Clerk |
|
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Appeal - Remittitur - Reversed (B279645) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Appeal - Remittitur - Reversed (B279645) Filed by Clerk |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Unknown Document Type Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Document:Remittitur Filed by: Clerk |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Unknown Document Type Filed by Clerk |
|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) | |
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) | |
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FEES DUE FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL (CIVIL) | |
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FEES DUE FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL (CIVIL) | |
May 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ntc to Prty re fee Clk's Transcpt Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
May 11, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FEES DUE FOR CLERK' TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL | |
May 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Ntc to Prty re fee Clk's Transcpt Filed by: Clerk |
|
May 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ntc to Prty re fee Clk's Transcpt Filed by Clerk |
|
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FEES DUE FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE) | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Designation of Record Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Designation of Record Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Appellant |
|
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE) | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Designation of Record Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED JURISDICTION) | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED JURISDICTION) | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk |
|
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Appeal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Appellant |
|
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request to Waive Court Fees Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER | |
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL/CROSS-APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE) (APPELLATE) | |
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Request-Waive Court Fees Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Appellant |
|
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request to Waive Court Fees Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL/CROSS-APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE) (APPELLATE) | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES | |
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Ruling on Submitted Matter - Held - Motion Granted Ruling on Submitted Matter - Held - Motion Granted |
|
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Ruling on Submitted Matter William Fahey 1:30 pm | |
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-11-17 00:00:00 | |
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Order Filed by: Court |
|
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-11-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Ruling on Submitted Matter - Held - Motion Granted |
|
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Court |
|
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-11-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:MOTION - ATTORNEY FEES William Fahey 9:30 am | |
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-11-16 00:00:00 | |
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Held - Taken under Submission Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Held - Taken under Submission |
|
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-11-16 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-11-16 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Held - Taken under Submission |
|
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE CIVIL | |
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES | |
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Reply/Response Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Reply/Response Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL | |
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Designation of Record Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Appellant |
|
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Designation of Record Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Designation of Record Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF TAMARA BASKIN'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES | |
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF SARA PEZESHKPOUR IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF TAMARA BASKIN'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES | |
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING (SUPERIOR COURT) | |
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING (SUPERIOR COURT) | |
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by: Clerk |
|
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk |
|
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request to Waive Court Fees Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Appeal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Appellant |
|
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Request-Waive Court Fees Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Appellant |
|
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request to Waive Court Fees Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
October 21, 2016 | hearing | Calendaring:MOTION - ATTORNEY FEES William Fahey | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF CARRIE STRAND IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MICHAEL J. CHILLEEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF GREGORY F. HURLEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Memorandum of Costs Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) | |
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) | |
August 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
August 16, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
August 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
August 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
August 11, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF TAMARA BASKIN'S OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED JUDGMENT | |
August 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Objection Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Objection Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
August 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Objection Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
July 15, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING RE LIABILITY ON PLAINTIFF'S UNRUH CIVIL RIGHTS ACT CLAIM | |
July 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
July 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Statement of Decision Filed by: Court |
|
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Dispo/Manner:Judgment by Court 749 Days | |
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF DECISION | |
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Statement of Decision Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-07-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Ruling on Submitted Matter William Fahey 8:30 am | |
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-07-07 00:00:00 | |
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Ruling on Submitted Matter (Ruling on Submitted Matter; Court makes order) - Ruling on Submitted Matter (Ruling on Submitted Matter; Court makes order) - |
|
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-07-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Statement of Decision Filed by Court |
|
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Ruling on Submitted Matter (Ruling on Submitted Matter; Court makes order) - |
|
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Oral Argument William Fahey 10:00 am | |
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-07-01 00:00:00 | |
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Non-Jury Trial Non-Jury Trial |
|
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE | |
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Court Trial - Short Cause Maureen Duffy-Lewis 8:30 am | |
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Unknown Event Type - Held - Taken under Submission Unknown Event Type - Held - Taken under Submission |
|
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-07-01 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Non-Jury Trial |
|
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-07-01 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Unknown Event Type - Held - Taken under Submission |
|
June 27, 2016 | hearing | Calendaring:Oral Argument William Fahey | |
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MICHAEL J. CHILLEEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S TRIAL BRIEF RE LEGAL ISSUES | |
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Brief Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF TAMARA BASKIN'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES RE: DEFENDANT'S LIABILITY UNDER THE DISABLED PERSONS ACT (CAL. CIV. CODE 54.1 ET SEQ.) | |
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE | |
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S TRIAL BRIEF RE LEGAL ISSUES | |
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF SARA PEZESHKPOUR IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES RE: DEFENDANT'S LIABILITY UNDER THE DISABLED PERSONS ACT (CAL. CIV. CODE 54.1 ETSEQ.) | |
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Points and Authorities Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF TAMARA BASKIN'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES RE: DEFENDANT'S LIABILITY UNDER THE DISABLED PERSONS ACT (CAL. CIV. CODE 54.1 ET SEQ.) | |
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Brief Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Points and Authorities Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF SARA PEZESHKPOUR IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES RE: DEFENDANT'S LIABILITY UNDER THE DISABLED PERSONS ACT (CAL. CIV. CODE 54.1 ETSEQ.) | |
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 23, 2016 | hearing | Calendaring:Court Trial - Short Cause Maureen Duffy-Lewis | |
June 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Objection Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Objection Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
June 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Objection Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-06-16 00:00:00 | |
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 (Motion; Advanced to a Previous Date) - (Motion; Advanced to a Previous Date) - |
|
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-06-16 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Motion Maureen Duffy-Lewis 9:30 am | |
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 (Motion; Advanced to a Previous Date) - |
|
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-06-16 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE RULING RE: JUNE 13, 2016 FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE | |
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-06-13 00:00:00 | |
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Court Trial - Short Cause William Fahey 11:50 am | |
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE | |
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Non-Jury Trial (Court Trial - Short Cause; Court makes order) - Non-Jury Trial (Court Trial - Short Cause; Court makes order) - |
|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Court Trial - Short Cause Maureen Duffy-Lewis 9:30 am | |
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Non-Jury Trial (Court Trial - Short Cause; Transferred for Trial) - Non-Jury Trial (Court Trial - Short Cause; Transferred for Trial) - |
|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-06-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-06-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Non-Jury Trial (Court Trial - Short Cause; Transferred for Trial) - |
|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Non-Jury Trial (Court Trial - Short Cause; Court makes order) - |
|
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF PLAINTIFF TAMARA BASKIN | |
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF TAMARA BASKIN | |
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND SPECIAL VERDICT FORM. | |
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND SPECIAL VERDICT FORM. | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-06-08 00:00:00 | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATIONS OF FACTS FOR TRIAL | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF TAMARA BASKIN'S OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Ex-Parte Application | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | JOINT EXHIBIT LIST AND STIPULATION RE: AUTHENTICATION AND ADMISSIBILITY OF EVIDENCE | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | JOINT WITNESS LIST | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Objection Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO BIFURCATE | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - CIVIL | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | JOINT SHORT STATEMENT OF THE CASE | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | COMPENDIUM OF PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Order Filed by: Plaintiff |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Ex Parte Motion Maureen Duffy-Lewis 8:30 am | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Plaintiff |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Objection Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
June 08, 2016 | hearing | Calendaring:Ex Parte Motion Maureen Duffy-Lewis | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Witness List Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Statement of the Case Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Objection Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-06-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Statement of the Case Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-06-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF TAMARA BASKIN'S OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S SPECIAL VERDICT FORM | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Witness List Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted |
|
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event | REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO BIFURCATE ISSUES OF LIABILITY AND DAMAGES | |
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Reply to Motion Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event | REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #1 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO PLAINTIFF'S PRIOR STIPULATIONS RE: DAMAGES | |
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event | REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 2-TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING ALLEGED ACCESSIBILITY BARRIER CLAIMS NOT PLED IN THE COMPLAINT | |
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Reply to Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Reply to Motion Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event | REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 1 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY REGARDING LEGAL OPINIONS | |
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S PARTIAL OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO BIFURCATE ISSUES OF LIABILITY AND DAMAGES | |
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #1 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO PLAINTIFF'S PRIOR STIPULATIONS RE DAMAGES | |
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE [#2] TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING ALLEGED ACCESSIBILITY BARRIER CLAIMS NOT PLED IN THE COMPLAINT | |
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MICHAEL J. CHILLEEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #1 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO PLAINTIFF'S PRIOR STIPULATIONS RE DAMAGES | |
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE #1 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY REGARDING LEGAL OPINIONS | |
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE [#3] TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF REMEDIAL MEASURES | |
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S MOTION IN LIM1NE NUMBER 2-TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING ALLEGED ACCESSIBILITY BARRIER CLAIMS NOT PLED IN THE COMPLAINT | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF SARA PEZESHKPOUR RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE [#1] TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO PLAINTIFF'S PRIOR STIPULATIONS RE: DAMAGES | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MICHAEL J. CHILLEEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S MOTION INLIMINE NUMBER 3-TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF REMEDIAL MEASURES | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MICHAEL J. CHILLEEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 2-TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING ALLEGED ACCESSJBILITY BARRIER CLAIMS NOT PLED IN THE COMPLAINT | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE [#1] TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO PLAINTIFF'S PRIOR STIPULATIONS RE: DAMAGES | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S MOTION INLIMINE NUMBER 1-TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY REGARDING LEGAL OPINIONS | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BIFURCATE ISSUES OF LIABILITY AND DAMAGES | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MICHAEL J. CHILLEEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER I -TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY REGARDING LEGAL OPINIONS | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S MOTION INLIMINE NUMBER 3-TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF REMEDIAL MEASURES | |
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event | ELA1NTIFF S OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF VICTOR NELSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | |
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Ruling on Submitted Matter (Ruling on Submitted Matter; Denied) - Ruling on Submitted Matter (Ruling on Submitted Matter; Denied) - |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-04-21 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Ruling on Submitted Matter Maureen Duffy-Lewis 8:30 am | |
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-04-21 00:00:00 | |
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Ruling on Submitted Matter (Ruling on Submitted Matter; Denied) - |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-04-21 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Defendant |
|
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Denied) - Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Denied) - |
|
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-04-20 00:00:00 | |
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-04-20 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE | |
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Motion for Summary Judgment Maureen Duffy-Lewis 9:30 am | |
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-04-20 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Defendant |
|
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Denied) - |
|
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Defendant Filed by Defendant |
|
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-04-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Non-Jury Trial Non-Jury Trial |
|
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-04-19 00:00:00 | |
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Court Trial - Short Cause Maureen Duffy-Lewis 9:30 am | |
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Non-Jury Trial |
|
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-04-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MEDIATION COMPLETION | |
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-04-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-04-18 00:00:00 | |
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Motion for Summary Judgment Maureen Duffy-Lewis 9:30 am | |
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-04-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
April 14, 2016 | hearing | Calendaring:Motion for Summary Judgment Maureen Duffy-Lewis | |
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-04-14 00:00:00 | |
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Motion for Summary Judgment Maureen Duffy-Lewis 9:30 am | |
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-04-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Reply to Motion Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S SURREPLY AND OBJECTIONS TO NEW EVIDENCE AND ISSUES PRESENTED BY DEFENDANT IN ITS REPLY RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Reply to Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Matter continued) - Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Matter continued) - |
|
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Matter continued) - |
|
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Reply to Motion Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-04-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF SARA PEZESHKPOUR IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S SURREPLY AND OBJECTIONS TO NEW EVIDENCE AND ISSUES PRESENTED BY DEFENDANT IN ITS REPLY RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
April 12, 2016 | hearing | Calendaring:Motion for Summary Judgment Maureen Duffy-Lewis | |
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 21 Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Mandatory Settlement Conference Abraham Khan 1:30 pm | |
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Mandatory Settlement Conference Edward A\. Ferns 10:45 am | |
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-04-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Reply to Motion Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MICHAEL J. CHILLEEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ETC. | |
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT OF ITS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ETC. | |
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ETC. | |
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Response Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | DFFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS ETC. | |
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-04-08 00:00:00 | |
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Reply to Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 13 Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ETC. | |
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT OF ITS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ETC. | |
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-04-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ETC. | |
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | DFFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS ETC. | |
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 13 Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MICHAEL J. CHILLEEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ETC. | |
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Response Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 21 Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Reply to Motion Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF BARTON KIRKLAND IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC. S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ETC. | |
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ETC. | |
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF BARTON KIRKLAND IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC. S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ETC. | |
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Response Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF BARTON KIRKLAND IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | |
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | |
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF JEFF MASTIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | |
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | ) PLAINTIFF S RESPONSES TO ) DEFENDANT S SEPARATE STATEMENT ) OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS; PLAINTIFF S ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | |
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF SARA PEZESHKPOUR IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | |
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | ) PLAINTIFF S RESPONSES TO ) DEFENDANT S SEPARATE STATEMENT ) OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS; PLAINTIFF S ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | |
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Response Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Response Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S NOTICE RE JURY TRIAL | |
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail | |
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-03-14 00:00:00 | |
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Maureen Duffy-Lewis 9:30 am | |
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Matter continued) - Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Matter continued) - |
|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Matter continued) - |
|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-03-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-03-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Plaintiff |
|
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE TRIAL BY APPROXIMATELY SIXTY (60) DAYS | |
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order | |
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-03-04 00:00:00 | |
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Matter continued) - Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Matter continued) - |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-03-04 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Final Status Conference Maureen Duffy-Lewis 9:30 am | |
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Matter continued) - |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-03-04 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 29, 2016 | hearing | Calendaring:Mandatory Settlement Conference Abraham Khan | |
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | |
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-01-27 00:00:00 | |
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Motion for Summary Judgment Maureen Duffy-Lewis 9:30 am | |
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-01-27 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Denied) - Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Denied) - |
|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-01-27 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Denied) - |
|
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Reply to Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF BARTON KIRKLAND IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | |
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HER MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | |
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF SARA PEZESHKPOUR IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REPLY RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | |
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Reply to Motion Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Reply to Motion Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF BASKIN'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | |
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Response Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MICHAEL J. CHILLEEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF BASKIN'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF BARTON KIRKLAND IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | |
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Response Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, 1NC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF HUGHES REALTY, INC. S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
January 08, 2016 | hearing | Calendaring:Motion for Summary Judgment Maureen Duffy-Lewis | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF BARTON KIRKLAND IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MICHAEL J. CHILLEEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY INC.'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | |
November 13, 2015 | hearing | Calendaring:Court Trial - Short Cause Maureen Duffy-Lewis | |
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S NOTICE RE CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE | |
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2015-11-12 00:00:00 | |
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Defendant |
|
November 12, 2015 | hearing | Calendaring:Ex Parte Motion Maureen Duffy-Lewis | |
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Ex Parte Motion Maureen Duffy-Lewis 8:30 am | |
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted |
|
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING DATE OR, ETC. | |
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2015-11-12 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant Filed by Defendant |
|
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING DATE OR, ETC. | |
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2015-11-12 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant |
|
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted |
|
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF TAMARA BASKIN IN SUPPORT OF HER MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR., IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | |
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event | SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | |
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF JEFF MASTIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | |
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AM) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | |
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF SARA PEZESRKPOUR IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | |
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | |
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
September 28, 2015 | hearing | Calendaring:Motion for Summary Judgment Maureen Duffy-Lewis | |
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
First Amended Complaint Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event | FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR DISABLLITY DISCRIMINATION TN VIOLATION OF THE UNRUH CIVIL RIGHTS ACT, CAL CIVIL CODE 51 ET SEQ., AND THE DISABLED PERSONS ACT, CAL. CIVIL CODE 54 ET SEQ. | |
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event | FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR DISABLLITY DISCRIMINATION TN VIOLATION OF THE UNRUH CIVIL RIGHTS ACT, CAL CIVIL CODE 51 ET SEQ., AND THE DISABLED PERSONS ACT, CAL. CIVIL CODE 54 ET SEQ. | |
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
First Amended Complaint Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Order Filed by: Plaintiff |
|
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF TAMARA BASKIN'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Order | |
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ON PLAENTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted |
|
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Motion Maureen Duffy-Lewis 9:30 am | |
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2015-09-04 00:00:00 | |
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2015-09-04 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2015-09-04 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted |
|
September 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Motion Maureen Duffy-Lewis 9:30 am | |
September 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2015-09-03 00:00:00 | |
September 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Unknown Event Type Unknown Event Type |
|
September 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2015-09-03 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
September 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Unknown Event Type |
|
September 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2015-09-03 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2015-09-02 00:00:00 | |
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Motion for Leave Maureen Duffy-Lewis 9:30 am | |
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2015-09-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Unknown Event Type Unknown Event Type |
|
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Unknown Event Type |
|
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2015-09-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
August 28, 2015 | hearing | Calendaring:Motion Maureen Duffy-Lewis | |
August 26, 2015 | hearing | Calendaring:Motion Maureen Duffy-Lewis | |
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Reply to Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Clerk |
|
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING | |
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF SARA PEZESHKPOUR IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF TAMARA BASKIN'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HER MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Reply to Motion Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF TAMARA BASKIN'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HER MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Reply to Motion Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk |
|
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MICHAEL J. CHILLEEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
August 14, 2015 | hearing | Calendaring:Motion for Leave Maureen Duffy-Lewis | |
August 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Motion for Leave Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
August 11, 2015 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF TANIARA BASKINS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANI)UM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES | |
August 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Leave Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
August 11, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF SARA PEZESHKPOUR IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF TAMARA BASKINS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
August 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
August 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Leave Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
June 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 08, 2015 | Docket Event | JOINT NOTICE OF MEDIATION COMPLETION | |
June 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
June 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Hughes Realty, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
June 05, 2015 | Docket Event | HUGHES REALTY, INC.S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | |
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Order Filed by: Court |
|
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Maureen Duffy-Lewis 8:30 am | |
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2015-02-25 00:00:00 | |
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2015-02-25 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) - Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) - |
|
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) - |
|
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2015-02-25 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Court |
|
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 22, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT HUGHES REALTY, INC. 'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES | |
January 22, 2015 | Docket Event | CIVIL DEPOSIT | |
January 12, 2015 | hearing | Calendaring:Conference-Case Management Maureen Duffy-Lewis | |
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
October 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Maureen Duffy-Lewis 8:30 am | |
October 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2014-10-28 00:00:00 | |
October 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2014-10-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
October 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Vacated) - Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Vacated) - |
|
October 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2014-10-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
October 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Vacated) - |
|
August 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 04, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR REMAND | |
August 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
August 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Court Order Maureen Duffy-Lewis 8:30 am | |
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2014-07-21 00:00:00 | |
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2014-07-21 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) - Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) - |
|
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 38 Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) - |
|
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2014-07-21 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk |
|
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
July 08, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTIES AND SUPERIOR COURT OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT | |
July 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
July 02, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS | |
July 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
June 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Affidavit of Prejudice Susan Bryant-Deason 8:30 am | |
June 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2014-06-26 00:00:00 | |
June 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2014-06-26 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
June 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted |
|
June 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2014-06-26 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
June 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted |
|
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:CCP 170.6 Application Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE | |
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A |
|
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Filed/Opened:Civil Rights | |
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES FOR DISABILITY DISCRIMINATIN IN VIOLATION OF CAL. HEALTH & SAFETY CODE SECTION 19955 ET SEQ. AND, ETC. | |
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES FOR DISABILITY DISCRIMINATIN IN VIOLATION OF CAL. HEALTH & SAFETY CODE SECTION 19955 ET SEQ. AND, ETC. | |
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Tamara Baskin (Plaintiff) |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|