Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Mildred L. Oliver, Oliver, Mildred L., filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case against City Of Oakland, Oakland Police Department, represented by Quirk, Michael J., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior with James R. Reilly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames R. Reilly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2019 |
CategoryCivil Unlimited (Civil Rights/Discrimination) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Mildred Oliver
Date: February 21, 2019Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: July 08, 2019Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: July 08, 2019Motion for Discovery Filed by Mildred L. Oliver
Date: November 06, 2019Response to Motion Filed
Date: December 09, 2019Declaration in Support to the Def's reply to opposition to Plts MTN... Filed
Date: December 13, 2019Reply to the Def's opposition to Plts MTN... Filed
Date: December 13, 2019Case Management Statement of Mildred L. Oliver Filed
Date: August 24, 2020Case Management Statement of City of Oakland Filed
Date: August 28, 2020Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: September 08, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: November 06, 2019Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time Granted
Date: February 26, 2021Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time Filed for City of Oakland, Oakland Police Department
Date: February 25, 2021Complaint - Civil Rights Filed (Amended)
Date: February 21, 2019Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: February 28, 2019Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: February 21, 2019Initial Case Management Conference 07/08/2019 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: February 28, 2019First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: April 23, 2019Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed
Date: May 13, 2019Case Management Statement of City of Oakland Filed
Date: June 21, 2019Case Management Statement of Mildred L. Oliver Filed
Date: June 20, 2019Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: July 08, 2019Notice of Court Mediation Referral Filed
Date: September 11, 2020Letter re Mediator Selection Filed
Date: July 24, 2019Order re: Court Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 14, 2021Minute Order (Court Order)
Date: December 14, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: November 06, 2019Proof of Service on Motion
Date: November 06, 2019Supplemental Declaration in Support Filed
Date: December 09, 2019Declaration of Rosemary O'Brien Filed
Date: December 09, 2019Proof of Service to the Def's reply to opposition to Plts MTN... Filed
Date: December 13, 2019Association of Attorneys Filed
Date: December 19, 2019Declaration of Oakland Police Department's Custodian of Records Karolina Zachoszcz Filed
Date: December 27, 2019Proof of Service on Motion
Date: December 18, 2019Proposed Order Received
Date: December 09, 2019Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: March 18, 2021Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: December 20, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 29, 2021Proposed Order
Date: September 29, 2021Stipulated Protective Order Filed
Date: December 27, 2019Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 15, 2022Evidence in Support of Motion
Date: September 29, 2021Motion for Discovery Taken Under Submission
Date: December 20, 2019Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: December 27, 2019Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: January 09, 2020Notice of Withdrawal of Individual Counsel Lizabeth N Devries Filed
Date: March 09, 2020Case Management Statement Filed by: Mildred L. Oliver (Plaintiff)
Date: February 08, 2022Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: December 27, 2019Declaration Declaration of Kiona Suttle Filed by: City of Oakland (Defendant)
Date: February 02, 2022Motion for Discovery Granted
Date: December 27, 2019Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for City of Oakland
Date: July 08, 2020Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 14, 2022Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted
Date: July 10, 2020Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: September 08, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: September 08, 2020Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: August 17, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: August 17, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: March 18, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: March 18, 2021Case Management Conf Continuance 03/18/2021 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: February 26, 2021Motion to Seal Record Filed for Defendant
Date: September 29, 2021Evidence in Support of Motion
Date: September 29, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication Filed by City of Oakland
Date: September 29, 2021Proposed Order
Date: September 29, 2021Evidence in Support of Motion
Date: September 29, 2021Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts
Date: September 29, 2021Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts
Date: September 29, 2021Minute Order (Hearing on Joinder to Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication)
Date: December 15, 2021Order re: Hearing on Motion to Seal Motion to Seal Record Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 15, 2021Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Seal Motion to Seal Record)
Date: December 15, 2021Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 18, 2022Certificate of Mailing for [Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Seal Records] Issued by: Clerk
Date: December 16, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by: City of Oakland (Defendant)
Date: February 14, 2022Minute Order (Hearing on Motion of Summary Judgment/Adjudication)
Date: March 16, 2022Separate Statement Filed by: Mildred L. Oliver (Plaintiff)
Date: March 11, 2022Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Discovery of Peace Officer Personnel Re...)
Date: February 23, 2022Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Issued by: Clerk
Date: March 03, 2022Separate Statement Filed by: City of Oakland (Defendant)
Date: March 30, 2022General Order (Case Management Order) Entered by: Clerk
Date: April 01, 2022Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Discovery of Peace Officer Personnel Re...)
Date: April 13, 2022General Order (Case Management Order) Entered by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Discovery of Peace Officer Personnel Re...)
Date: 2022-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Discovery of Peace Officer Personnel Re...)
Date: 2022-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Discovery of Peace Officer Personnel Re...)
Date: 2022-09-02T00:00:00General Order (Case Management Order) Entered by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: Mildred L. Oliver (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Discovery of Peace Officer Personnel Re...)
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Discovery of Peace Officer Personnel Re...)
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: City of Oakland (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Discovery of Peace Officer Personnel Re...)
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Discovery of Peace Officer Personnel Re...)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Ex Parte Application Order Shortening Time Filed by: Mildred L. Oliver (Plaintiff) Type: Without Hearing
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Updated -- Ex Parte Application Order Shortening Time: As To Parties: removed
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application Filed by: Mildred L. Oliver (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Opposition City of Oakland's Response to Pitchess Motion Filed by: City of Oakland (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Updated -- Ex Parte Application Order Shortening Time: Result: Granted Result Date: 12/14/2021
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Updated -- Ex Parte Application Order Shortening Time: As To Parties: removed
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Updated -- Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts: As To Parties: removed
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Updated -- Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support: As To Parties: removed
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Updated -- Motion to Seal Record Filed for Defendant: Result: Granted Result Date: 12/15/2021
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 07/08/2019 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Mildred L. Oliver Filed
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Complaint - Civil Rights Filed (Amended)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for City of Oakland, Oakland Police Department
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Mildred Oliver
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement of City of Oakland Filed
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Response to Motion Filed
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Stipulated Protective Order Filed
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Motion for Discovery Filed by Mildred L. Oliver
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Motion for Discovery Taken Under Submission
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Proof of Service to the Def's reply to opposition to Plts MTN... Filed
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Association of Attorneys Filed
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time Filed for City of Oakland, Oakland Police Department
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Declaration of Rosemary O'Brien Filed
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time Granted
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Court Mediation Referral Filed
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for City of Oakland
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Letter re Mediator Selection Filed
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Withdrawal of Individual Counsel Lizabeth N Devries Filed
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Reply to the Def's opposition to Plts MTN... Filed
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement of City of Oakland Filed
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Declaration of Oakland Police Department's Custodian of Records Karolina Zachoszcz Filed
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration in Support Filed
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Motion for Discovery Granted
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Case Management Conf Continuance 03/18/2021 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Mildred L. Oliver Filed
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Proof of Service on Motion
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Declaration in Support to the Def's reply to opposition to Plts MTN... Filed
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2024 | Jury Trial | ||
April 19, 2024 | Pre-Trial Conference | ||
April 02, 2024 | Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) | ||
February 01, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | RG19007799: Oliver VS City of Oakland 02/01/2024 Hearing on Motion of Summary Judgment/Adjudication in Department 25 Tentative Ruling - 02/01/2024 Jenna Whitman Parties to appear. The court is incline... | |
February 01, 2024 | Hearing on Motion of Summary Judgment/Adjudication | ||
August 03, 2023 | Case Management Conference | ||
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Minute Order |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Motion of Summary Judgment/Adjudication scheduled for 02/01/2024 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 Event |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/02/2023 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 08/02/2023 Result Type to Held Event |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Motion of Summary Judgment/Adjudication scheduled for 07/27/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 02/01/2024 03:00 PM Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.