Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Heidi Oatis, Oatis, Heidi, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Brian K Ross, Ross, Brian K, against A Perfect Day Franchise, Inc., A Perfect Day Spa, Business For Unknown, Gu, Hemant, Hemant Gu, represented by Chao Jen Wahng, Wahng, Chao Jen, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Ronni B. MacLaren presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management138 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2008 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Tort |
Time To Trial314 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions658 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time680 days |
Case Management Statement of Heidi Oatis Filed
Date: July 06, 2009Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed (Amended)
Date: December 17, 2008Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Heidi Oatis
Date: December 17, 2008Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: December 17, 2008Case Management Statement of A Perfect Day Spa, business for unknown Filed
Date: August 24, 2009Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: September 08, 2009Case Management Statement of Heidi Oatis Filed
Date: August 21, 2009Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: September 08, 2009Case Management Statement of Heidi Oatis Filed
Date: October 13, 2009Declaration in Support Application
Date: October 09, 2009Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: July 16, 2009Application Re: Publication of Summons and Complaint Granted
Date: October 16, 2009Case Management Statement of A Perfect Day Spa, business for unknown Filed
Date: October 14, 2009Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: October 27, 2009Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: October 27, 2009Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: July 30, 2010Proposed Order Stipulation and Order
Date: July 14, 2010Notice of Judicial Assignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: December 18, 2008Initial Case Management Conference 05/04/2009 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: December 18, 2008Answer to Complaint Filed for A Perfect Day Spa, business for unknown
Date: March 02, 2009Case Management Statement of Heidi Oatis Filed
Date: April 20, 2009Proof of Service on Complaint As to A Perfect Day Spa, business for unknown Filed
Date: March 03, 2009Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: May 04, 2009Case Management Statement of A Perfect Day Spa, business for unknown Filed
Date: April 20, 2009Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: July 16, 2009Declaration of Heide Oatis in Opposition to Motion in Limine #3 Filed
Date: August 03, 2010Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: May 04, 2009Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: May 04, 2009Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: July 16, 2009Case Management Statement of A Perfect Day Spa, business for unknown Filed
Date: July 01, 2009Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: September 08, 2009Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed
Date: October 09, 2009Application Re: Publication of Summons and Complaint Filed for Heidi Oatis
Date: October 09, 2009Order Granting Stipulation to Amend Complaint Filed
Date: July 15, 2010Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed
Date: July 20, 2010Settlement Conference Statement of Heidi Oatis Filed
Date: July 20, 2010Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Denied
Date: July 15, 2010Judge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference
Date: July 21, 2010Declaration in Support Application Lee Sheldon
Date: July 14, 2010Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: July 15, 2010Settlement Conference Statement of Heidi Oatis Filed
Date: September 27, 2010Settlement Conference Statement of A Perfect Day Spa, business for unknown Filed
Date: July 20, 2010Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: September 28, 2010Proof of Service on Subpoena/Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed
Date: August 16, 2010Proof of Publication As to A Perfect Day Spa, business for unknown, Hemant Gu Filed
Date: August 19, 2010Motion in Limine #1 (Defendant's) Filed
Date: July 30, 2010Motion in Limine #2 (Defendant's) Filed
Date: July 30, 2010Motion in Limine #3 (Defendant's) Filed
Date: July 30, 2010Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: July 21, 2010Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: July 30, 2010Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To Hemant Gu Filed
Date: October 06, 2010Declaration Other: Request
Date: October 06, 2010Motion in Limine #5 (Defendant's) Filed
Date: July 30, 2010Motion in Limine #4 (Defendant's) Filed
Date: July 30, 2010Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: October 08, 2010Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: August 06, 2010Proof of Service on Subpoena/Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed
Date: August 02, 2010Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: August 06, 2010Answer to Complaint Filed for A Perfect Day Franchise, Inc.
Date: August 17, 2010Miscellaneous Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine #1 Filed
Date: October 15, 2010Judge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference
Date: September 28, 2010Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: October 08, 2010Motion in Limine No. 1 for Order Predcluding Evidence Filed
Date: October 05, 2010Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: October 08, 2010Proof of Service by Personal Service Filed
Date: October 08, 2010List of Witness - Plaintiff's Filed
Date: October 08, 2010Miscellaneous Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Proposed Jury Instructions Filed
Date: October 15, 2010List of Witness - Defendant's Filed
Date: October 08, 2010Miscellaneous Defendant's Proposed Special Jury Instructions and Verdict Form Filed
Date: October 15, 2010Miscellaneous Defendant's Exhibit List Filed
Date: October 15, 2010Miscellaneous Defendant's Proposed List of Supplemental Voir Dire Questions Filed
Date: October 15, 2010Miscellaneous Joint Statement of the Case Filed
Date: October 20, 2010Miscellaneous Joint Set of Agreed Upon Jury Instructions Filed
Date: October 15, 2010Miscellaneous Joint Statement of the Case Filed
Date: October 22, 2010Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: October 26, 2010Miscellaneous Plaintiff's Jury Instructions In Dispute Filed
Date: October 15, 2010Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: October 25, 2010Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: October 20, 2010Miscellaneous Joint Set of Agreed Upon Jury Instructions Filed
Date: October 22, 2010Miscellaneous Questions by the Jurors Filed
Date: October 26, 2010Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: October 27, 2010Miscellaneous Questions by the Jurors Filed
Date: October 27, 2010Jury Verdict Filed
Date: October 28, 2010Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: October 28, 2010Judgment after Jury Trial Filed
Date: November 17, 2010Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for A Perfect Day Franchise, Inc.
Date: December 03, 2010Judgment Entered
Date: November 17, 2010Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: December 21, 2010Opposition Filed
Date: January 27, 2011Log of Court Reporter Fees Filed
Date: October 28, 2010List of Jurors and Fees Paid Filed
Date: October 28, 2010Miscellaneous Jury Poll Sheet Filed
Date: October 28, 2010Final Jury Instructions Filed
Date: October 28, 2010Log of Court Reporter(s) Filed
Date: October 28, 2010Declaration in Opposition Filed by A Perfect Day Franchise, Inc.
Date: January 27, 2011Exhibit Lists Filed
Date: October 28, 2010Proof of Service on Subpoena/Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed
Date: November 16, 2010Miscellaneous Receipt for Withdrawal of Exhibits Filed
Date: October 28, 2010Order Re: Plaintiff's Application for Entry of Default against defendant Hemant Gu Filed
Date: October 29, 2010Motion to Tax Costs Filed for Debtor
Date: December 21, 2010Declaration in Support
Date: December 21, 2010Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: February 10, 2011Motion to Tax Costs - Granted in Part
Date: February 10, 2011Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: February 10, 2011Judgment Entered
Date: February 10, 2011Amended Judgment Filed
Date: February 10, 2011Substitution of Attorney Filed for A Perfect Day Spa, business for unknown
Date: April 13, 2012Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed (Amended)
Date: 2008-12-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Denied
Date: 2010-07-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous Questions by the Jurors Filed
Date: 2010-10-26T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of A Perfect Day Spa, business for unknown Filed
Date: 2010-07-20T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 1 for Order Predcluding Evidence Filed
Date: 2010-10-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous Questions by the Jurors Filed
Date: 2010-10-27T00:00:00Application Re: Amend Complaint Filed for A Perfect Day Spa, business for unknown
Date: 2010-07-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Heidi Oatis Filed
Date: 2009-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Assignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2008-12-18T00:00:00Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To Hemant Gu Filed
Date: 2010-10-06T00:00:00Declaration of Heide Oatis in Opposition to Motion in Limine #3 Filed
Date: 2010-08-03T00:00:00Motion in Limine #1 (Defendant's) Filed
Date: 2010-07-30T00:00:00Miscellaneous Plaintiff's Opposition to Def's A Perfect Day Franchise, Inc., Motion in Limine #3 Fil
Date: 2010-08-03T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for A Perfect Day Spa, business for unknown
Date: 2009-03-02T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2008-12-17T00:00:00Application Re: Publication of Summons and Complaint Granted
Date: 2009-10-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine #1 Filed
Date: 2010-10-15T00:00:00Judge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference
Date: 2010-09-28T00:00:00Order Granting Stipulation to Amend Complaint Filed
Date: 2010-07-15T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for A Perfect Day Franchise, Inc.
Date: 2010-08-17T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2010-10-08T00:00:00Judge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference
Date: 2010-07-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement of A Perfect Day Spa, business for unknown Filed
Date: 2009-04-20T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2009-09-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous Defendant's Proposed List of Supplemental Voir Dire Questions Filed
Date: 2010-10-15T00:00:00Proof of Service on Subpoena/Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed
Date: 2010-08-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement of A Perfect Day Spa, business for unknown Filed
Date: 2009-08-24T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed
Date: 2010-07-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement of A Perfect Day Spa, business for unknown Filed
Date: 2009-07-01T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2009-07-16T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2009-05-04T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2010-07-21T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 05/04/2009 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: 2008-12-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Heidi Oatis Filed
Date: 2009-04-20T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2009-05-04T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to A Perfect Day Spa, business for unknown Filed
Date: 2009-03-03T00:00:00Motion in Limine #4 (Defendant's) Filed
Date: 2010-07-30T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2009-09-08T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed
Date: 2009-10-09T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of Heidi Oatis Filed
Date: 2010-07-20T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2009-07-16T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2010-09-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Heidi Oatis
Date: 2008-12-17T00:00:00Application Re: Publication of Summons and Complaint Filed for Heidi Oatis
Date: 2009-10-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Heidi Oatis Filed
Date: 2009-07-06T00:00:00Proof of Service on Subpoena/Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed
Date: 2010-08-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine #5 (Defendant's) Filed
Date: 2010-07-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine #3 (Defendant's) Filed
Date: 2010-07-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Heidi Oatis Filed
Date: 2009-08-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2010-10-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous Plaintiff's Opposition to Def's A Perfect Day Franchise, Inc., Motion in Limine #1 Fil
Date: 2010-08-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous Plaintiff's Opposition to Def's A Perfect Day Franchise, Inc., Motion in Limine #4 Fil
Date: 2010-08-03T00:00:00List of Witness - Defendant's Filed
Date: 2010-10-08T00:00:00Proof of Publication As to A Perfect Day Spa, business for unknown, Hemant Gu, A Perfect Day Franchi
Date: 2010-10-01T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2009-10-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for A Perfect Day Spa, business for unknow
Date: 2010-07-14T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of Heidi Oatis Filed
Date: 2010-09-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine #2 (Defendant's) Filed
Date: 2010-07-30T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2010-08-06T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: 2010-07-15T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2010-10-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement of A Perfect Day Spa, business for unknown Filed
Date: 2009-10-14T00:00:00Proof of Publication As to A Perfect Day Spa, business for unknown, Hemant Gu Filed
Date: 2010-08-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous Joint Statement of the Case Filed
Date: 2010-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2010-07-30T00:00:00List of Witness - Plaintiff's Filed
Date: 2010-10-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous Plaintiff's Jury Instructions In Dispute Filed
Date: 2010-10-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous Defendant's Exhibit List Filed
Date: 2010-10-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous Joint Set of Agreed Upon Jury Instructions Filed
Date: 2010-10-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Proposed Jury Instructions Filed
Date: 2010-10-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous Joint Statement of the Case Filed
Date: 2010-10-20T00:00:00Miscellaneous Joint Set of Agreed Upon Jury Instructions Filed
Date: 2010-10-15T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2010-10-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Personal Service Filed
Date: 2010-10-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous Defendant's Proposed Special Jury Instructions and Verdict Form Filed
Date: 2010-10-15T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2010-10-20T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2010-10-27T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs Filed for Debtor
Date: 2010-12-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous Receipt for Withdrawal of Exhibits Filed
Date: 2010-10-28T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: 2010-10-28T00:00:00Order Re: Plaintiff's Application for Entry of Default against defendant Hemant Gu Filed
Date: 2010-10-29T00:00:00Miscellaneous Jury Poll Sheet Filed
Date: 2010-10-28T00:00:00Final Jury Instructions Filed
Date: 2010-10-28T00:00:00Judgment after Jury Trial Filed
Date: 2010-11-17T00:00:00Declaration in Opposition Filed by A Perfect Day Franchise, Inc.
Date: 2011-01-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for A Perfect Day Franchise, Inc.
Date: 2010-12-03T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2011-02-10T00:00:00Log of Court Reporter Fees Filed
Date: 2010-10-28T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs - Granted in Part
Date: 2011-02-10T00:00:00List of Jurors and Fees Paid Filed
Date: 2010-10-28T00:00:00Judgment Entered
Date: 2011-02-10T00:00:00Opposition Filed
Date: 2011-01-27T00:00:00Proof of Service on Subpoena/Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed
Date: 2010-11-16T00:00:00Exhibit Lists Filed
Date: 2010-10-28T00:00:00Jury Verdict Filed
Date: 2010-10-28T00:00:00Amended Judgment Filed
Date: 2011-02-10T00:00:00Writ of Execution - Unsatisfied from Alameda Filed
Date: March 15, 2013Judgment Entered
Date: 2010-11-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for A Perfect Day Spa, business for unknown
Date: April 13, 2012Log of Court Reporter(s) Filed
Date: 2010-10-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.