Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Merchant Cash And Capital Llc, filed a(n) Negligent Breach - Commercial case represented by Dryden Christopher R. Esq., against Bronco Caballo, Ferlo Corp., Lopez Fernando, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michael J. Raphael presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael J. Raphael Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 05, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions57 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeNegligent Breach |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time98 days |
Document:Writ issued Filed by: Attorney for Creditor
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Document:Request Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Motion to Amend Judgment; Filed by: Merchant Cash And Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Default Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Document:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: April 05, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: April 05, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: April 12, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: April 30, 2018REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -
Date: June 01, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 17, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: June 12, 2018Default Judgment
Date: July 12, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: June 28, 2018RULING RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: July 12, 2018Minute Order -
Date: July 12, 2018JUDGMENT BY COURT BY DEFAULT
Date: July 12, 2018REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -
Date: July 12, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: July 12, 2018DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER R. DRYDEN IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: July 12, 2018NOTICE OF RULING
Date: August 01, 2018Motion to Amend Judgment
Date: March 22, 2019Writ - Return
Date: June 07, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 26, 2019Default Judgment
Date: June 28, 2019Default Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Request Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Merchant Cash And Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Writ issued Filed by Creditor
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Motion to Amend Judgment Filed by Merchant Cash And Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Court
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-12 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Merchant Cash And Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Merchant Cash And Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: June 26, 2019Complaint Filed by Merchant Cash And Capital, LLC (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Merchant Cash And Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Merchant Cash And Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Default Judgment Filed by Merchant Cash And Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: June 28, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Merchant Cash And Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other to Amend Judgment and add Ferchu Co...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Writ issued
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Motion to Amend Judgment
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Request
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Default Judgment
Date: June 28, 2019Minute order entered: 2018-07-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Default Judgment
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other to Amend Judgment and add Ferchu Co...))
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 26, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.