Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Linda Doak, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bart A Sayet, against Carol Rogers, Scott Rogers, represented by Beletsky Barry P Law Office Of Llc, in the jurisdiction of New London County, CT, . New London County, CT Superior Courts with Shari A. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShari A. Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2020 |
CategoryV01 - Vehicular - Motor Vehicles - Driver And/Or Passenger(S) Vs. Driver(S) |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew London County, CT |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION Withdrawl of Appearance
Date: March 06, 2020ANSWER
Date: April 07, 2020DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS EMT
Date: August 18, 2020CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 12/10/2020 BY THE COURT
Date: December 10, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: February 28, 2020DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS Defendants' Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: February 03, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/10/2020 BY THE COURT
Date: December 10, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/27/2020 HON SHARI MURPHY
Date: May 27, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/25/2020 BY THE COURT
Date: September 25, 2020DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS Orthopedic Partners
Date: August 18, 2020DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS Radiology
Date: August 18, 2020DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS L+M Hospital
Date: August 18, 2020DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS Police Officer
Date: August 18, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | OFFER OF COMPROMISE Defendants' Offer of Compromise | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS Defendants' Disclosure of Expert Witness | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 12/10/2020 BY THE COURT | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/10/2020 BY THE COURT | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/25/2020 BY THE COURT | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS EMT | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS Orthopedic Partners | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS Radiology | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS L+M Hospital |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.