Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Cynthia Brown Conservator Of The Person And Estate Of Elizabeth Stewart, Cynthia Brown Individually, Edward Stewart, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Howard Kohn Sprague & Fitzgerald, against Angela Quatrocelli Md, Dylan Stempel Pa, Mark Stevens Pa, Middle Ct Emergency Physicians, Llc, Saint Mary'S Hospital, Inc., (total of 7) See All represented by Halloran & Sage Llp, Neubert Pepe & Monteith Pc, in the jurisdiction of New Haven County, CT, . New Haven County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Carletha S. Parkinson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 07, 2021 |
CategoryT28 - Torts - Malpractice - Medical |
Last RefreshedMarch 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Haven County, CT |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal case filed by Cynthia Brown, the conservator of the person and estate of Elizabeth Stewart, against Saint Mary's Hospital, Inc. The complaint alleges that the defendant, Saint Mary's Hospital, was negligent in providing medi...
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Order 4/11/2022 HON W PIERSON
Date: March 24, 2022WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION Motion Entry #176.00
Date: March 20, 2023ORDER RESULT: Off 6/27/2022 BY THE CLERK
Date: June 27, 2022MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: April 20, 2022MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Order 3/7/2022 HON W PIERSON
Date: February 17, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/3/2023 HON JOHN CORDANI
Date: April 03, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 3/21/2022 HON W PIERSON
Date: March 21, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 3/7/2022 HON W PIERSON
Date: March 07, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by Def. Middle CT Emergency Physicians, LLC
Date: February 01, 2022MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Order 3/21/2022 HON W PIERSON
Date: February 17, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by Def. Angela Quatrocelli, M.D.
Date: February 01, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE By Def. Dylan Stempel, PA-C
Date: February 01, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD
Date: March 23, 2022ORDER RESULT: Denied 2/5/2024 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: February 05, 2024DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS
Date: December 06, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PB 10-40
Date: September 18, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE By def. Sarah Garceu, PA-C
Date: August 30, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE AMENDED RE DYLAN STEMPEL PA
Date: August 21, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD RESULT: Denied 3/13/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: March 06, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE as to P.A. Stevens Responses to plantiff's supplemental discovery request
Date: December 01, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/14/2023 HON JOHN CORDANI
Date: August 14, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 10/13/2023 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: October 13, 2023OBJECTION TO INTERROGATORIES/PRODUCTION PB 13-8 and 13-10 by Def. Angela Quatrocelli, M.D.
Date: February 01, 2022REVISED COMPLAINT
Date: January 19, 2022MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Strike
Date: March 10, 2023OBJECTION TO INTERROGATORIES/PRODUCTION PB 13-8 and 13-10 By Def. Dylan Stempel, PA-C
Date: February 01, 2022OBJECTION TO INTERROGATORIES/PRODUCTION PB 13-8 and 13-10 by Def. Sarah Garceau, PA-C
Date: February 01, 2022MOTION TO STRIKE RESULT: Denied 2/5/2024 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: March 10, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD
Date: March 20, 2023OBJECTION TO REQUEST TO REVISE RESULT: Sustained 12/22/2021 HON W PIERSON
Date: December 08, 2021NOTICE of Filing Supp D&P to SMH and Trinity Health
Date: March 14, 2023ANSWER TO REVISED SUBSTITUTED COMPLAINT
Date: March 08, 2023ELECTRONIC SERVICE NOTICE JD-ES-286
Date: December 10, 2021ORDER RESULT: Order 4/11/2022 HON W PIERSON
Date: April 11, 2022MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RESULT: Order 11/29/2021 HON W PIERSON
Date: October 29, 2021ORDER RESULT: Off 12/7/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: December 07, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/13/2021 HON W PIERSON
Date: December 13, 2021ORDER RESULT: Order 1/18/2022 HON W PIERSON
Date: January 18, 2022REQUEST TO REVISE
Date: November 23, 2021ORDER RESULT: Sustained 12/22/2021 HON W PIERSON
Date: December 22, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/2/2022 HON W PIERSON
Date: May 02, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/8/2021 HON W PIERSON
Date: November 08, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RE DISCOVERY MOTION OR REQUEST PB CH13
Date: November 01, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 11/8/2021 HON W PIERSON
Date: October 25, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: November 05, 2021ORDER RESULT: Order 11/29/2021 HON W PIERSON
Date: November 29, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL, INC.
Date: October 01, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Off 8/11/2021 HON MATTHEW GORDON
Date: July 22, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 7/6/2021 HON SALVATORE AGATI
Date: July 06, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 7/19/2021 HON SALVATORE AGATI
Date: July 19, 2021MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Supp Memo in Opposition to Motion to Strike
Date: February 05, 2024MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Order 10/12/2021 HON W PIERSON
Date: September 27, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Mark Stevens, P.A.
Date: July 22, 2022ORDER As to D-01, D-02, and D-03 RESULT: Denied 3/13/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: March 13, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 10/25/2021 HON W PIERSON
Date: October 25, 2021SUMMONS
Date: June 07, 2021REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT - NON-ARG MATTER (JD-CV-128) On Docket No. 174 and 175
Date: January 22, 2024APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: August 03, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 07, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Order 9/7/2021 HON W PIERSON
Date: August 24, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Supplemental Compliance (Saint Mary's Hospital)
Date: September 23, 2022ADDITIONAL PARTIES PAGE
Date: June 07, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Order 10/4/2021 HON W PIERSON
Date: September 21, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: June 07, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/27/2021 HON W PIERSON
Date: September 27, 2021ORDER RESULT: Off 8/3/2021 HON MATTHEW GORDON
Date: August 03, 2021ORDER RESULT: Order 10/12/2021 HON W PIERSON
Date: October 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF ATTEMPT TO RESOLVE DISCOVERY OBJECTION
Date: January 22, 2024DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS Plaintiff's Disclosure of Expert Witnesses
Date: December 12, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by Def. Sarah Garceau, PA-C
Date: February 01, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: April 06, 2023MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY RESULT: Granted 10/11/2022 KIMBERLY MASSICOTTE
Date: September 26, 2022OBJECTION TO INTERROGATORIES/PRODUCTION PB 13-8 and 13-10
Date: March 17, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/2/2024 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: January 02, 2024ORDER RESULT: Order 4/4/2023 HON W PIERSON
Date: April 04, 2023ORDER RESULT: Accepted 4/6/2023 HON W PIERSON
Date: April 06, 2023MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike
Date: April 08, 2022NOTICE of Filing Supplemental D&P to MCEP
Date: March 14, 2023ANSWER
Date: March 22, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20
Date: July 02, 2021OBJECTION TO INTERROGATORIES/PRODUCTION PB 13-8 and 13-10 Mark Stevens, PA
Date: August 31, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE TRINITY HEALTH OF NEW ENGLAND CORPORATION, INC.
Date: October 01, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Mark Stevens, P.C.
Date: October 25, 2021ORDER RESULT: Order 11/8/2021 HON W PIERSON
Date: November 08, 2021MOTION TO CITE ADDITIONAL PARTY RESULT: Granted 7/6/2021 HON SALVATORE AGATI
Date: June 23, 2021ORDER RESULT: Off 8/11/2021 HON MATTHEW GORDON
Date: August 11, 2021APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: July 15, 2021APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: June 22, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/27/2021 HON W PIERSON
Date: October 27, 2021REQUEST TO REVISE Request to Revise Amended Complaint
Date: September 30, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 7/12/2021 BY THE CLERK
Date: July 12, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Off 8/3/2021 HON MATTHEW GORDON
Date: July 20, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/13/2021 HON W PIERSON
Date: September 13, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: September 30, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 9/7/2021 HON W PIERSON
Date: September 07, 2021AMENDED COMPLAINT AS SERVED
Date: July 27, 2021NOTICE Notice of Service of Discovery upon Plaintiff, Cynthia Brown
Date: August 25, 2021ORDER RESULT: Order 10/4/2021 HON W PIERSON
Date: October 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
September 17, 2024 | Trial Management Conference | ||
March 25, 2024 | Short Calendar SC-13 #027 | ||
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM In Support of Supplemental Interrogatories and Production Requests Re: Audit Trail | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM 175.00, Objection to Interrogatories/Production Last Updated: Date Filed - 03/08/2024 | |
February 13, 2024 | Short Calendar SC-13 #039 | ||
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Denied 2/5/2024 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON | |
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Supp Memo in Opposition to Motion to Strike | |
February 05, 2024 | Remote Motion to Strike Hearing | ||
January 31, 2024 | Remote Status Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.