Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Kevin Mcswiggin, filed a(n) T90 - Torts - All Other case represented by Coyne Von Kuhn Brady & Fries Llc, against O'Brien Insurance Agency, Llc, represented by Delsole & Delsole Llp, in the jurisdiction of New Haven County, CT, . New Haven County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Carletha S. Parkinson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarletha S. Parkinson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2020 |
CategoryT90 - Torts - All Other |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationNew Haven County, CT |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
ORDER RESULT: Off 2/5/2024 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: February 05, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/7/2023 HON JOHN CORDANI
Date: September 07, 2023ORDER RESULT: Off 1/22/2024 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: January 22, 2024REQUEST TO REVISE
Date: December 16, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/28/2020 HON SALVATORE AGATI
Date: December 28, 2020OBJECTION TO INTERROGATORIES/PRODUCTION PB 13-8 and 13-10
Date: December 15, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: September 11, 2020MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 11/9/2020 HON SALVATORE AGATI
Date: October 22, 2020REQUEST TO AMEND COMPLAINT/AMENDMENT
Date: September 22, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/9/2020 HON SALVATORE AGATI
Date: November 09, 2020ORDER RESULT: Order 11/6/2023 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: November 06, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/11/2022 KIMBERLY MASSICOTTE
Date: October 11, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 10/3/2023 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: October 03, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 10/25/2023 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: October 25, 2023MOTION FOR ORDER to compel RESULT: Order 10/25/2023 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: October 11, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 1/11/2024 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: January 11, 2024ORDER RESULT: Order 11/20/2023 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: November 20, 2023DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS -Amado J. Vargas, Esquire
Date: November 16, 2022ANSWER
Date: December 17, 2021REVISED COMPLAINT
Date: March 18, 2021CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) -Request for status conference
Date: August 25, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: October 25, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE -Supplemental compliance
Date: January 09, 2024ORDER RESULT: Off 4/2/2024 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: April 02, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/11/2024 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: March 11, 2024ORDER RESULT: Denied 2/5/2024 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: February 05, 2024ORDER RESULT: Sustained 2/5/2024 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: February 05, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/14/2022 KIMBERLY MASSICOTTE
Date: November 14, 2022APPELLATE COURT DECISION APPEAL DISMISSED RESULT: BY THE COURT
Date: March 20, 2024OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: March 27, 2024NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE -supplemental compliance dated 3/6/2024
Date: March 06, 2024CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) Defendant's Request for 2024 Trial Date
Date: September 07, 2023ORDER RESULT: Denied 12/12/2022 KIMBERLY MASSICOTTE
Date: December 12, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/22/2024 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: January 22, 2024MOTION TO REARGUE/RECONSIDER RESULT: Denied 2/5/2024 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: January 24, 2024DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS -revised & supplemental - Vargas, Esquire
Date: March 15, 2024OBJECTION TO MOTION RESULT: Off 3/11/2024 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: February 23, 2024NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: March 16, 2023ORDER RESULT: Off 3/11/2024 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: March 11, 2024ORDER RESULT: Off 2/15/2024 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: February 15, 2024APPEAL TO APPELLATE COURT
Date: February 22, 2024ORDER RESULT: Off 12/18/2023 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: December 18, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/18/2023 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: December 18, 2023MOTION FOR ORDER -compel RESULT: Order 11/6/2023 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: October 25, 2023MOTION FOR NONSUIT FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ORDER
Date: November 28, 2023OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR NONSUIT RESULT: Off 12/18/2023 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: December 05, 2023OBJECTION TO MOTION to compel RESULT: Overruled 10/25/2023 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: October 25, 2023ORDER RESULT: Overruled 10/25/2023 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: October 25, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 9/6/2022 HON W PIERSON
Date: September 06, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 6/6/2022 HON W PIERSON
Date: June 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
May 15, 2024 | Trial Management Conference | ||
April 29, 2024 | Remote Hearing | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Off 4/2/2024 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | APPELLATE COURT DECISION APPEAL DISMISSED RESULT: BY THE COURT | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to disclose expert RESULT: Off 4/2/2024 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS -revised & supplemental - Vargas, Esquire | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/11/2024 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Off 3/11/2024 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.