Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
James E Barbara, Lina T Barbara, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by 420 Gulf Street, Brown Law Llc, against Colonial Surety Company, represented by Mcelroy Deutsch Mulvaney & Carpenter Ph, in the jurisdiction of New Haven County, CT, . New Haven County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Barbara N. Bellis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 04, 2017 |
CategoryC90 - Contracts - All Other |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew Haven County, CT |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSION PB 13-22 Filed by Linda T. Barbara
Date: April 01, 2019ORDER RESULT: Denied 7/9/2019 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: July 09, 2019OBJECTION TO MOTION to Dismiss RESULT: Sustained 10/30/2018 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: June 15, 2018AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: November 20, 2018SCHEDULING ORDER Proposed by Colonial Surety Companyh
Date: April 30, 2018ORDER General Case Management Order RESULT: Order 12/31/2018 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: December 31, 2018OBJECTION TO TRANSFER TO COMPLEX LITIGATION
Date: December 03, 2018ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/7/2018 HON JAMES ABRAMS
Date: December 07, 2018SCHEDULING ORDER Scheduling order agreed to by all parties 2/1/19
Date: February 01, 2019MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 12/10/2018 HON JAMES ABRAMS
Date: December 10, 2018ORDER RESULT: Order 11/8/2018 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: November 08, 2018ORDER Initial Status Conference Order RESULT: Order 1/2/2019 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: January 02, 2019ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/10/2018 HON JAMES ABRAMS
Date: December 10, 2018ORDER RESULT: Order 12/6/2018 HON JAMES ABRAMS
Date: December 06, 2018ORDER RESULT: Order 12/19/2018 HON JAMES ABRAMS
Date: December 19, 2018COMPLEX LITIGATION APPLICATION (JD-CV-39) with Addendum RESULT: Order 12/6/2018 HON JAMES ABRAMS
Date: November 19, 2018ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/30/2018 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: April 30, 2018ORDER RESULT: Sustained 10/30/2018 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: October 30, 2018ORDER RESULT: Off 6/7/2018 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: June 07, 2018MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION L. Barbara opposition to Summary Judgment
Date: February 29, 2024SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: April 26, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 04, 2017ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/18/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: December 18, 2023APPELLATE COURT DECISION JUDGMENT/ORDER OF TRIAL COURT AFFIRMED RESULT: BY THE COURT
Date: August 22, 2023ORDER RESULT: Sustained 2/9/2018 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: February 09, 2018ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/11/2017 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: August 11, 2017ORDER RESULT: Order 3/20/2018 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: March 20, 2018MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION J. Barbara opposition to Summary Judgment
Date: February 29, 2024MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RESULT: Order 6/28/2021 BY THE CLERK
Date: August 22, 2019MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: January 19, 2024APPELLATE COURT MATERIAL Notice of Decision of the Appellate Court
Date: August 22, 2023OBJECTION objection to motion for extnesion of time
Date: April 22, 2021ORDER RESULT: Overruled 5/30/2017 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: May 30, 2017ORDER RESULT: Denied 10/30/2018 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: October 30, 2018APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: April 18, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: April 04, 2017ORDER RESULT: Order 10/29/2019 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: October 29, 2019OBJECTION
Date: April 22, 2021SUMMONS
Date: April 04, 2017ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/12/2024 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: April 12, 2024OBJECTION TO REQUEST TO REVISE RESULT: Order 11/8/2018 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: April 13, 2018MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 8/11/2017 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: August 11, 2017ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/4/2018 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: April 04, 2018ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/5/2019 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: November 05, 2019ORDER RESULT: Order 6/7/2018 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: June 07, 2018REQUEST TO REVISE Plaintffs' March 8, 2017 Complaint
Date: March 20, 2018ORDER RESULT: Denied 4/27/2018 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: April 27, 2018ORDER RESULT: Denied 2/9/2018 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: February 09, 2018MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 4/4/2018 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: April 03, 2018ORDER RESULT: Order 9/25/2017 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: September 25, 2017ORDER RESULT: Withdrawn 9/28/2017 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: September 28, 2017ORDER RESULT: Denied 3/27/2018 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: March 27, 2018ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/22/2018 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: February 22, 2018ORDER RESULT: Denied 8/18/2021 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: August 18, 2021MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 19, 2024ORDER RESULT: Order 6/18/2018 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: June 18, 2018ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/20/2019 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: September 20, 2019MEMORANDUM OF DECISION ON MOTION
Date: October 30, 2018OBJECTION TO MOTION RESULT: Sustained 2/9/2018 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: October 13, 2017WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION
Date: September 27, 2017REPLY J. Barbara reply to objection to disqualify
Date: August 16, 2021APPELLATE COURT MATERIAL AC dismiss appeal AC 44937
Date: September 29, 2021ORDER See memorandum of decision #171 RESULT: Order 6/28/2021 BY THE CLERK
Date: June 28, 2021REQUEST FOR ADJUDICATION COMPLEX LITIGATION (JD-CL-77) as to continuance #191
Date: April 12, 2024REPLY L. Barbara reply to objection to disqualify
Date: August 16, 2021APPEAL TO APPELLATE COURT AC 44937
Date: September 07, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/30/2017 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: November 30, 2017MEMORANDUM OF DECISION ON MOTION memoradum of decision re: summary judgment #155
Date: June 28, 2021APPEAL TO APPELLATE COURT
Date: July 15, 2021Certificate of Completion JD-CL-122
Date: December 12, 2023ORDER RESULT: Sustained 8/18/2021 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: August 18, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/30/2017 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: May 30, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2024 | Remote Court Trial | ||
September 19, 2024 | Remote Court Trial | ||
September 18, 2024 | Remote Court Trial | ||
September 17, 2024 | Remote Court Trial | ||
September 13, 2024 | Remote Court Trial | ||
September 12, 2024 | Remote Court Trial | ||
September 11, 2024 | Remote Court Trial | ||
September 10, 2024 | Remote Court Trial | ||
April 15, 2024 | Remote Hearing | ||
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE continuance of 4/15/24 hearing RESULT: Granted 4/12/2024 HON BARBARA BELLIS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.