Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Natina Pagan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Weber & Rubano Llc, against Clarence Williamson, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, represented by Mazza & Welch, Penino & Moynihan Llp, in the jurisdiction of New Haven County, CT, . New Haven County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Robin L. Wilson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2023 |
CategoryV01 - Vehicular - Motor Vehicles - Driver And/Or Passenger(S) Vs. Driver(S) |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Haven County, CT |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
The legal document involves a complaint filed by Natina Pagan against Clarence Williamson and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. The complaint includes two counts detailing collisions that resulted in injuries to Natina Pagan. The first ...
APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: December 13, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Off 1/29/2024 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: January 12, 2024SUMMONS
Date: December 04, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: December 04, 2023ORDER RESULT: Off 1/29/2024 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: January 29, 2024NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE INIITAL COMPLIANCE
Date: March 07, 2024WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION
Date: April 10, 2024CLAIM FOR JURY OF 6
Date: January 16, 2024ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: January 25, 2024OBJECTION TO MOTION re: MSJ
Date: March 25, 2024MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: March 11, 2024REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE Defendant, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Date: April 12, 2024NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE SUPPLEMENTAL COMPIANCE
Date: March 20, 2024ORDER RESULT: Withdrawn 4/12/2024 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: April 12, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 04, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE SUPPLEMENTAL COMPIANCE
Date: April 12, 2024NOTICE of Service of Discovery Defendant, Clarence Williamson
Date: April 12, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/5/2024 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: April 05, 2024ORDER RESULT: Order 1/3/2024 HON BARBARA JONGBLOED
Date: January 03, 2024ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: January 16, 2024CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST
Date: April 12, 2024NOTICE Notice of Service of Interrogatories and Request for Production
Date: December 13, 2023MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RESULT: Withdrawn 4/12/2024 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: January 22, 2024REQUEST
Date: January 16, 2024REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE Defendant, Clarence Williamson
Date: April 12, 2024MOTION TO TRANSFER
Date: December 20, 2023SUPPLEMENTAL RETURN Notice of Filing Supplemental Return
Date: December 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2024 | Remote Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing | ||
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE of Service of Discovery Defendant, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company | |
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE Defendant, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company | |
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Withdrawn 4/12/2024 HON ROBIN WILSON | |
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE SUPPLEMENTAL COMPIANCE | |
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE of Service of Discovery Defendant, Clarence Williamson | |
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST | |
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE Defendant, Clarence Williamson | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION | |
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/5/2024 HON ROBIN WILSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.