Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Cheryl Chiari-Mccarthy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Weber & Rubano Llc, against Edahol Independent Distributor, Inc., Edgardo Hoyos, represented by Markey Barrett Pc, in the jurisdiction of New Haven County, CT, . New Haven County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Jon M. Alander presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJon M. Alander Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2021 |
CategoryV01 - Vehicular - Motor Vehicles - Driver And/Or Passenger(S) Vs. Driver(S) |
Last RefreshedMarch 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Haven County, CT |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Supplemental Compliance
Date: April 03, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Supplemental Compliance
Date: March 22, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Supplemental Compliance
Date: April 12, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Supplemental Compliance
Date: July 21, 2023ORDER RESULT: Denied 3/18/2024 HON JON ALANDER
Date: March 18, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/10/2023 HON BARBARA JONGBLOED
Date: February 10, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Supplemental Compliance
Date: August 25, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2021MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 7/13/2023 HON MICHAEL KAMP
Date: July 11, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Supplemental Compliance
Date: July 19, 2022MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE See Pleading No. 128.00 RESULT: Granted 2/10/2023 HON BARBARA JONGBLOED
Date: February 10, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Supplemental Compliance
Date: August 23, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/13/2023 HON ROBERT YOUNG
Date: March 13, 2023TRIAL MANAGEMENT REPORT
Date: March 07, 2024REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION JD-CV-130
Date: February 10, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Supplemental Compliance
Date: October 19, 2022MOTION FOR ORDER to Compel Plaintiff's Deposition RESULT: Granted 3/13/2023 HON ROBERT YOUNG
Date: February 24, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER BY AGREEMENT C50,T02,T03,T11,T12,T61,V01,V04, V09 CASES
Date: January 18, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Supplemental Compliance
Date: July 11, 2022MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Trial 11/21/23
Date: October 16, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Supplemental Compliance
Date: September 19, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Supplemental Compliance
Date: September 01, 2023OBJECTION
Date: March 18, 2024NOTICE Form 217 upon Plaintiff
Date: December 10, 2021REQUEST Joint Request to Continue Trial
Date: February 10, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 11/26/2023 HON KEVIN MURPHY
Date: November 26, 2023SUPPLEMENTAL RETURN Notice of Filing Supplemental Return
Date: March 18, 2022MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE of Trial
Date: February 29, 2024REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION JD-CV-130 Second Request
Date: May 03, 2023MOTION FOR ORDER OF COMPLIANCE – PB SEC 13-14 (INTERR/PROD – 13-6/13-9)
Date: February 14, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Supplemental Compliance
Date: July 20, 2023OBJECTION re: mil RESULT: Order 12/10/2023 HON KEVIN MURPHY
Date: November 27, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 7/13/2023 HON MICHAEL KAMP
Date: July 13, 2023NOTICE of Compliance with Pltff's Discovery Requests
Date: March 16, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: February 28, 2022CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) to Continue 2/20/24 Hearing
Date: January 12, 2024CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) re 2/19/24 Hearing RESULT: Granted 1/16/2024 HON KEVIN MURPHY
Date: January 11, 2024MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Continuance of Trial
Date: February 29, 2024CLAIM FOR JURY OF 6
Date: December 10, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Supplemental Compliance
Date: January 12, 2024NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Supplemental Compliance
Date: February 23, 2024ORDER RESULT: Order 2/29/2024 HON BARBARA JONGBLOED
Date: February 29, 2024SUMMONS
Date: September 27, 2021NOTICE of Service of Discovery Defendant, Edahol Independent Distributor, Inc.
Date: January 18, 2022ANSWER
Date: December 15, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: September 27, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/16/2024 HON KEVIN MURPHY
Date: January 16, 2024MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD
Date: December 10, 2021NOTICE Interrogatories and RFPs upon Plaintiff
Date: December 10, 2021OFFER OF COMPROMISE
Date: October 19, 2023MOTION IN LIMINE re Knee Replacement Causation RESULT: Order 11/26/2023 HON KEVIN MURPHY
Date: October 31, 2023NOTICE of Supplemental Compliance w Discovery
Date: March 25, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/5/2024 HON JON ALANDER
Date: February 05, 2024DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS
Date: October 23, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 11/4/2023 HON KEVIN MURPHY
Date: November 04, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Supplemental Compliance
Date: December 18, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 1/1/2024 HON KEVIN MURPHY
Date: January 01, 2024NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Supplemental Compliance
Date: November 30, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 12/10/2023 HON KEVIN MURPHY
Date: December 10, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Supplemental Compliance
Date: November 29, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 11/21/2023 HON BARBARA JONGBLOED
Date: November 21, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Supplemental Compliance
Date: November 27, 2023ORDER RESULT: Denied 10/16/2023 HON BARBARA JONGBLOED
Date: October 16, 2023NOTICE of Service of Discovery Defendant, Edgardo Hoyos
Date: January 18, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Supplemental Compliance
Date: July 08, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Supplemental Compliance
Date: August 01, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Supplemental Compliance
Date: August 02, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Supplemental Compliance
Date: June 29, 2023TRIAL MANAGEMENT REPORT Trial Management Report - for TMC scheduled 03/08/2024
Date: March 06, 2024NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Supplemental Compliance
Date: August 31, 2023CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST
Date: January 18, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: December 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Denied 3/18/2024 HON JON ALANDER | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | OBJECTION | |
March 18, 2024 | Short Calendar SC-14 #021 | ||
March 08, 2024 | Remote Trial Management Conference | ||
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | TRIAL MANAGEMENT REPORT | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | TRIAL MANAGEMENT REPORT Trial Management Report - for TMC scheduled 03/08/2024 | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ORDER to Bar Plaintiff from Presenting Evidence RESULT: Denied 3/18/2024 HON JON ALANDER | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE of Trial | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Continuance of Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.