Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Elizabeth J. Ripps, Jennie R. Ripps, Michael J. Ripps, Susan Shapiro Barash Trustee, filed a(n) T90 - Torts - All Other case represented by Marino Zabel & Schellenberg Pllc, against John Finguerra, Laurence P. Rubinow Individually, Laurence P. Rubinow Trustee Of Richard Ripps Am. And Rest. Rev. Trust Dtd 2 8 06, Mccarter & English, Llp, represented by Motley Rice Llc, Wiggin & Dana Llp, in the jurisdiction of Hartford County, CT, . Hartford County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Cesar A. Noble presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 09, 2019 |
CategoryT90 - Torts - All Other |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationHartford County, CT |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of David B. Zabel
Date: June 16, 2021REQUEST FOR ADJUDICATION COMPLEX LITIGATION (JD-CL-77)
Date: June 17, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/31/2024 HON CESAR NOBLE
Date: January 31, 2024EXHIBITS Exhibits 119-131
Date: June 02, 2021EXHIBITS Exhibits 132-140
Date: June 02, 2021NOTICE OF INTENTION TO APPEAL
Date: July 20, 2021CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116)
Date: March 15, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/27/2024 HON CESAR NOBLE
Date: March 27, 2024MEMORANDUM Plaintiff's Supplemental Appendix of Exhibits
Date: June 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of John J. Galvin, MAI
Date: June 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 03, 2021CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116)
Date: August 11, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 1/5/2024 HON CESAR NOBLE
Date: January 05, 2024AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of David B. Zabel
Date: June 03, 2021MEMORANDUM Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law on Bifurcation of Trials
Date: March 01, 2024BRIEF Regarding Bifurcation of Consolidated Cases for Trial
Date: February 16, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 09, 2019REQUEST FOR ADJUDICATION COMPLEX LITIGATION (JD-CL-77)
Date: July 16, 2020ORDER TMO RESULT: Order 4/30/2021 HON THOMAS MOUKAWSHER
Date: April 30, 2021REQUEST FOR ADJUDICATION COMPLEX LITIGATION (JD-CL-77)
Date: April 30, 2021ORDER RESULT: Order 6/5/2019 HON JAMES ABRAMS
Date: June 05, 2019MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 21, 2021EXHIBITS EXHIBITS 113 - 118
Date: April 21, 2021REQUEST FOR ADJUDICATION COMPLEX LITIGATION (JD-CL-77)
Date: October 03, 2019ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/30/2021 HON THOMAS MOUKAWSHER
Date: April 30, 2021AMENDED SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: March 11, 2020AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF DAVID B. ZABEL
Date: April 21, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: April 09, 2019REQUEST FOR ADJUDICATION COMPLEX LITIGATION (JD-CL-77)
Date: June 17, 2019REPLY in further support of Defendants Rubinow and McCarter & English Motion to Dismiss
Date: August 23, 2019MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER (Joint)
Date: April 14, 2020REQUEST FOR ADJUDICATION COMPLEX LITIGATION (JD-CL-77)
Date: November 20, 2020REQUEST FOR ADJUDICATION COMPLEX LITIGATION (JD-CL-77)
Date: December 02, 2019OBJECTION TO MOTION Plaintiffs' Objection to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss
Date: August 07, 2019ORDER RESULT: Order 1/29/2020 HON THOMAS MOUKAWSHER
Date: January 29, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/24/2020 HON THOMAS MOUKAWSHER
Date: November 24, 2020OBJECTION Defendant McCarter & English's Objections to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories
Date: December 04, 2019ANSWER to Complaint
Date: November 22, 2019REQUEST FOR ADJUDICATION COMPLEX LITIGATION (JD-CL-77) (docket entry 168.00)
Date: May 04, 2021ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: November 22, 2019MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER Joint RESULT: Granted 3/1/2021 HON THOMAS MOUKAWSHER
Date: February 26, 2021REQUEST FOR ADJUDICATION COMPLEX LITIGATION (JD-CL-77)
Date: August 16, 2019REPLY MEMORANDUM In Support of Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Stay
Date: August 23, 2019APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: March 26, 2020CLAIM FOR JURY OF 6
Date: May 15, 2019ORDER Stipulated Order
Date: September 23, 2019ADDITIONAL PARTIES PAGE
Date: April 09, 2019AMENDMENT CORRECTED PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 22, 2021REPLY Plaintiffs' Response to Lembo Motion for Consolidation
Date: September 27, 2019ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/28/2021 HON THOMAS MOUKAWSHER
Date: May 28, 2021PROPOSED ORDER
Date: September 20, 2019ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/21/2019 HON THOMAS MOUKAWSHER
Date: June 21, 2019ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/16/2019 HON THOMAS MOUKAWSHER
Date: August 16, 2019APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: February 22, 2024MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/24/2020 HON THOMAS MOUKAWSHER
Date: November 20, 2020MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD
Date: May 14, 2019ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/22/2021 HON THOMAS MOUKAWSHER
Date: January 22, 2021SUMMONS
Date: April 09, 2019APPEARANCE
Date: September 13, 2019DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS (David A. Swerdloff)
Date: March 12, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/5/2021 HON THOMAS MOUKAWSHER
Date: May 05, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/12/2021 HON THOMAS MOUKAWSHER
Date: April 12, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/1/2021 HON THOMAS MOUKAWSHER
Date: March 01, 2021MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 21, 2021MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER (Joint) RESULT: Granted 1/22/2021 HON THOMAS MOUKAWSHER
Date: January 21, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/2/2019 HON THOMAS MOUKAWSHER
Date: December 02, 2019ORDER Discovery Order RESULT: Order 1/9/2020 HON THOMAS MOUKAWSHER
Date: January 09, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 7/21/2020 HON THOMAS MOUKAWSHER
Date: July 21, 2020ORDER Case management order RESULT: Order 6/10/2019 HON THOMAS MOUKAWSHER
Date: June 10, 2019ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/3/2019 HON THOMAS MOUKAWSHER
Date: October 03, 2019OBJECTION Defendant Rubinow's Objections to Plaintiffs Interrogatories
Date: December 04, 2019AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MICHAEL J. RIPPS
Date: April 21, 2021REQUEST FOR ADJUDICATION COMPLEX LITIGATION (JD-CL-77)
Date: May 27, 2021REPORT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Date: July 25, 2019MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Joint) RESULT: Granted 8/16/2019 HON THOMAS MOUKAWSHER
Date: August 16, 2019RECORD CORRECTION SEE #167 Last Updated: Result Information - 04/30/2021
Date: April 28, 2021APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: April 17, 2019REQUEST FOR ADJUDICATION COMPLEX LITIGATION (JD-CL-77) Motion to Dismiss Entry No. 112
Date: August 27, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
September 19, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
September 18, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
September 17, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
September 16, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
September 13, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
September 12, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
September 11, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
September 10, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
September 09, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.