Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Deborah Tomko, Thomas Tomko, filed a(n) T20 - Torts - Products Liability - Other Than Vehicular case represented by Early Lucarelli Sweeney & Meisenkothen L, Phv Long Amber R 6 19 12, against Cleaver Brooks, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Llc, Rogers Corp., Special Electric Company, (total of 9) See All represented by Adam Charles Martin, Adler Pollock & Sheehan Pc, Brad Warren Graham, Brian Matthew Gibbons, Carlie Shane Seigal, (total of 18) See All in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Barbara N. Bellis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 21, 2022 |
CategoryT20 - Torts - Products Liability - Other Than Vehicular |
Last RefreshedMarch 20, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a part of an asbestos litigation case. The plaintiffs, Thomas Tomko and Deborah Tomko, are residents of Connecticut. They have filed a complaint against multiple defendants, including Union Carbide Corporation, Rogers Corporation, S...
DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS
Date: November 14, 2022CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) re: Motion for Limited Modification of Pro Hac Vice Order (198.00)
Date: September 05, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 6/28/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: June 28, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 5/26/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: May 26, 2023REPLY to PL OBJ to Seco's MTD
Date: May 31, 2022CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) re: Motion for Continuance (203.00)
Date: October 03, 2023LIST OF WITNESSES Lay Witness List
Date: September 15, 2022MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE
Date: January 22, 2024MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Trial date to 1/16/2024 RESULT: Granted 10/3/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: October 03, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER Revised RESULT: Order 3/28/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: March 27, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE re: amended complaint
Date: May 12, 2022WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION AGAINST PARTICULAR DEFENDANT(S) – CASE REMAINS PENDING Cleaver-Brooks
Date: February 13, 2024CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) re: Status Conference
Date: November 13, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 4/1/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: April 01, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/5/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: September 05, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/16/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: March 16, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/7/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: August 07, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 8/18/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: August 18, 2023CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) re: Motion to Exceed Page Limit (161.00)
Date: March 16, 2023CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) Caseflow Request for Rogers Corporation
Date: May 31, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 4/19/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: April 19, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/3/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: June 03, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/28/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: March 28, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 5/9/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: May 09, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE Supplemental Return - Superior Combustion Industries
Date: June 09, 2022MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE PB 2-16 Amber Long
Date: May 16, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 8/2/2022 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: August 02, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 6/1/2022 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: June 01, 2022DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS Supplemental Disclosure of Expert Witnesses
Date: March 14, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 8/23/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: August 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Alexander G. Calfo re: Pro Hac Vice Application
Date: February 24, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 4/1/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: February 28, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: April 07, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE Supplemental Return
Date: May 02, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 6/21/2022 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: June 21, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: April 06, 2022LIST OF EXHIBITS (JD-CL-28/JD-CL-28a) Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Date: April 12, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: February 22, 2023MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 3/28/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: March 27, 2023EXHIBITS Exhibit A in support of Motion for Trial Continuance #172.00
Date: May 08, 2023OBJECTION Objection to Mine Safety Appliances Company's Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: August 15, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 02, 2022MOTION TO CITE ADDITIONAL PARTY RESULT: Granted 4/25/2022 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: April 07, 2022LIST OF WITNESSES Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Date: April 12, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: March 28, 2022DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Date: April 12, 2022APPEARANCE
Date: April 25, 2023APPEARANCE
Date: September 11, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: February 02, 2024ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC
Date: April 21, 2022ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Date: April 12, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: April 18, 2022CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) re: Motion for Continuance (196.00)
Date: August 30, 2023DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS Defendant Cleaver-Brooks Inc.'s Expert Witness Disclosure
Date: January 13, 2023AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 07, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: August 09, 2023ADDITIONAL PARTIES PAGE
Date: March 21, 2022APPEARANCE
Date: April 20, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER RESULT: Order 4/28/2022 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: April 21, 2022APPEARANCE
Date: August 03, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: April 04, 2022ANSWER Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint
Date: April 06, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 7/22/2022 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: July 22, 2022OBJECTION TO MOTION Objection to Rogers Corporation's Motion to Strike
Date: May 09, 2022SUMMONS
Date: March 21, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: March 21, 2022APPEARANCE
Date: June 12, 2023NOTICE Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Answers to Interrogatories
Date: June 27, 2023MOTION TO STRIKE Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Complaint
Date: May 02, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: April 12, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 3/28/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: March 28, 2023APPEARANCE
Date: September 21, 2023ORDER RESULT: Denied 12/14/2022 BY THE CLERK
Date: December 14, 2022MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC's Motion For Summary Judgment
Date: December 14, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 8/2/2022 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: July 19, 2022CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) for Adjudication of #184.00 Motion for Trial Continuance
Date: August 03, 2023AMENDED COMPLAINT Revised amended complaint with underlined edits
Date: November 02, 2022AMENDED COMPLAINT Revised Amended Complaint
Date: November 02, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: April 14, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: April 13, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: February 01, 2024DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Date: January 13, 2023NOTICE First Supplemental Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 22, 2023NOTICE Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 05, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/3/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: October 03, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: July 28, 2023DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS Defendant Rogers Corporation's Expert Witness List
Date: January 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2024 | Evidence | ||
October 08, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | REPLY Plaintiffs' Reply to Rogers Corporation's Objection to Motion to Consolidate Cases for Trial | |
March 04, 2024 | Short Calendar SC-10 #028 | ||
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO MOTION Rogers Corporation's Amended Objection to Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases for Trial | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO MOTION Defendant Rogers Corporations Objection to Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate Cases for Trial | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION AGAINST PARTICULAR DEFENDANT(S) – CASE REMAINS PENDING Cleaver-Brooks | |
February 06, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
February 06, 2024 | Remote Status Conference | ||
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION AGAINST PARTICULAR DEFENDANT(S) – CASE REMAINS PENDING MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES COMPANY, LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.