Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Mirakle Dressikie Ppa Sasha Montgomery, Sasha Montgomery, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Kennedy Johnson Schwab & Roberge Llc, Kennedy Johnson Schwab & Roberge Pc, against Julianne Y. Icatar Md, Physicians For Womens Health Llc, Sarah Leite Md, Stevan Marjanovic Md, St. Vincent'S Medical Center, (total of 6) See All represented by Danaherlagnese Pc, Day Pitney Llp, Gfeller Laurie Llp, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Thomas J. Welch presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 03, 2020 |
CategoryT28 - Torts - Malpractice - Medical |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/7/2021 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: June 07, 2021MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/11/2024 HON THOMAS WELCH
Date: April 10, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/9/2021 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: August 09, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 7/12/2021 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: July 12, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/8/2021 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: February 08, 2021MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Remote Pretrial on March 26, 2024
Date: March 25, 2024REQUEST TO REVISE Request to Revise re Drs. Leite & Marjanovic, WHC & PWH
Date: November 23, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/26/2024 HON MARK GOULD
Date: March 26, 2024OBJECTION TO INTERROGATORIES/PRODUCTION PB 13-8 and 13-10 Sarah Leite, MD
Date: November 25, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/11/2024 HON THOMAS WELCH
Date: April 11, 2024MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 11/23/2020 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: November 09, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/23/2020 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: November 23, 2020MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME Defendants' Motion to Strike dated October 13, 2020
Date: November 02, 2020APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: July 20, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: August 13, 2020MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 16, 2024MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 10/26/2020 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: October 13, 2020MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 9/28/2020 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: September 10, 2020ORDER RESULT: Denied 12/12/2020 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: December 12, 2020ORDER RESULT: Denied 12/14/2020 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: December 14, 2020MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION TO COMPEL SUBSTITUTE COMPLAINT
Date: February 08, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/26/2020 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: October 26, 2020SUMMONS
Date: August 03, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 03, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/28/2020 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: September 28, 2020APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: August 11, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: August 03, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: November 17, 2022ADDITIONAL PARTIES PAGE
Date: August 03, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 7/5/2022 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: July 05, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/6/2022 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: June 06, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/9/2022 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: May 09, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/10/2021 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: May 10, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/4/2022 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: April 04, 2022OBJECTION TO INTERROGATORIES/PRODUCTION PB 13-8 and 13-10 Physicians for Women's Health, LLC,
Date: December 01, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/4/2021 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: January 04, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/7/2022 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: March 07, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/12/2021 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: April 12, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/7/2022 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: February 07, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/3/2022 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: January 03, 2022OBJECTION TO INTERROGATORIES/PRODUCTION PB 13-8 and 13-10 Women?s Health Connecticut, LLC
Date: December 01, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/6/2021 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: December 06, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/14/2020 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: December 14, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/8/2021 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: November 08, 2021ORDER RESULT: Denied 5/10/2021 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: May 10, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/15/2021 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: March 15, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/12/2021 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: October 12, 2021ORDER RESULT: Sustained 12/14/2020 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: December 14, 2020OBJECTION TO INTERROGATORIES/PRODUCTION PB 13-8 and 13-10 Stevan Marjanovic, MD
Date: November 25, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/30/2021 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: August 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2025 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
March 27, 2025 | Pretrial Conference | ||
November 05, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
October 09, 2024 | Pretrial Conference | ||
September 12, 2024 | Remote Pretrial Conference | ||
April 22, 2024 | Short Calendar SC-13 #054 | ||
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/11/2024 HON THOMAS WELCH | |
April 11, 2024 | Remote Pretrial Conference | ||
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/11/2024 HON THOMAS WELCH | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Jury Trial on November 5, 2024 RESULT: Granted 4/11/2024 HON THOMAS WELCH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.