Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Diane Saracino, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Kennedy Johnson Schwab & Roberge Llc, against Huntington Senior Housing Limited Partnership, Mutual Housing Association Of Southwestern Connecticut, Inc., represented by Esty & Buckmir Llc, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts with Barry K. Stevens presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 01, 2019 |
CategoryT12 - Torts - Defective Premises - Public - Other |
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/6/2019 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: May 06, 2019MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/5/2019 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: July 22, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: April 01, 2019ORDER RESULT: Order 7/1/2019 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: July 01, 2019CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 9/15/2020 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: September 15, 2020ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: September 10, 2019ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/8/2020 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: September 08, 2020ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE of Mutual Housing Assoc. of Southwestern CT, Inc.
Date: November 01, 2019ORDER REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER RESULT: Order 10/24/2020 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: October 24, 2020WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION Re: Answer & SD
Date: September 10, 2019MOTION IN LIMINE re: financial condition RESULT: Order 6/3/2022 HON ELIZABETH STEWART
Date: October 14, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/5/2019 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: August 05, 2019DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS
Date: October 08, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/9/2019 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: September 09, 2019ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/17/2021 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: June 17, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/15/2020 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: September 15, 2020MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 5/6/2019 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: April 23, 2019ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/24/2019 HON DALE RADCLIFFE
Date: June 24, 2019ORDER Trial Proceedings RESULT: Order 10/18/2021 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: October 18, 2021MOTION IN LIMINE re: other alleged incidents RESULT: Order 6/3/2022 HON ELIZABETH STEWART
Date: October 14, 2021MOTION IN LIMINE re: insurance RESULT: Order 6/3/2022 HON ELIZABETH STEWART
Date: October 14, 2021ORDER RESULT: Order 6/17/2021 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: June 17, 2021REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: September 19, 2019REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE Defendant - Mutual Housing Association of Southwestern Connecticut Inc.
Date: November 12, 2019ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/3/2021 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: November 03, 2021MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Jury Trial RESULT: Granted 11/3/2021 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: November 02, 2021ORDER REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER RESULT: Order 11/3/2021 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: November 03, 2021DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS re: A.C. Macris Consultants
Date: November 02, 2021CLAIM FOR JURY OF 6
Date: April 23, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 01, 2019NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: July 01, 2019MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD RESULT: Denied 9/12/2019 BY THE CLERK
Date: September 04, 2019SUMMONS
Date: April 01, 2019CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST
Date: November 14, 2019NOTICE of service of discovery to plaintiff
Date: April 23, 2019APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: April 23, 2019APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: September 25, 2019TRIAL MANAGEMENT REPORT
Date: October 14, 2021MOTION TO PRECLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY RESULT: Order 6/6/2022 HON ELIZABETH STEWART
Date: April 25, 2022TRIAL MANAGEMENT REPORT Defendants' Revised TMR
Date: May 18, 2022PROPOSED PRELIMINARY REQUESTS TO CHARGE
Date: June 10, 2022LIST OF EXHIBITS (JD-CL-28/JD-CL-28a) Defendants' Revised List of Exhibits
Date: June 10, 2022LIST OF EXHIBITS (JD-CL-28/JD-CL-28a)
Date: June 08, 2022LIST OF EXHIBITS (JD-CL-28/JD-CL-28a)
Date: June 13, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 6/20/2022 HON ELIZABETH STEWART
Date: June 20, 2022ORDER Trial Management Order RESULT: Order 5/26/2022 HON ELIZABETH STEWART
Date: May 26, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/8/2022 HON ELIZABETH STEWART
Date: June 08, 2022TRIAL MANAGEMENT REPORT
Date: June 01, 2022PROPOSED VERDICT FORMS AND JURY INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 10, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/13/2022 HON ELIZABETH STEWART
Date: June 13, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 6/6/2022 HON ELIZABETH STEWART
Date: June 06, 2022ORDER RESULT: Sustained 6/3/2022 HON ELIZABETH STEWART
Date: June 03, 2022PROPOSED PRELIMINARY REQUESTS TO CHARGE
Date: May 27, 2022PROPOSED VERDICT FORMS AND JURY INTERROGATORIES jury interrogatories
Date: June 10, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 5/26/2022 HON ELIZABETH STEWART
Date: May 26, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 6/3/2022 HON ELIZABETH STEWART
Date: June 03, 2022ORDER RESULT: Off 6/3/2022 HON ELIZABETH STEWART
Date: June 03, 2022CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) Request for Status New Trial
Date: June 21, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/23/2022 HON ELIZABETH STEWART
Date: June 23, 2022OBJECTION TO MOTION Objection to Plaintiff's Motion for Immediate Trial
Date: June 28, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 7/6/2022 HON THOMAS WELCH
Date: July 06, 2022MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Trial 7/26/22 RESULT: Order 7/25/2022 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: July 25, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 7/25/2022 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: July 25, 2022MOTION IN LIMINE Re: Other Alleged Incidents
Date: December 02, 2022MOTION IN LIMINE re: Financial Condition
Date: December 02, 2022MOTION IN LIMINE re: Insurance
Date: December 02, 2022MOTION IN LIMINE re: Subsequent Remedial Repairs
Date: December 02, 2022MOTION IN LIMINE re: Conditions of other buildings and/or properties
Date: December 02, 2022MOTION IN LIMINE re: Evidence Of Alleged Statements Or Recordings Made During P&Z Hearings
Date: December 06, 2022MOTION IN LIMINE re: Building Code
Date: December 06, 2022MOTION TO PRECLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY Portions of Plaintiff's Expert Athos Macris' Testimony
Date: December 06, 2022VERDICT FOR DEFENDANT(S) RESULT: HON CHARLES REED
Date: December 08, 2022INTERROGATORIES TO THE JURY
Date: December 09, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/15/2022 HON CHARLES REED
Date: December 15, 2022LIST OF EXHIBITS (JD-CL-28/JD-CL-28a)
Date: December 09, 2022CERTIFICATE
Date: December 09, 2022MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME To file post verdict Motions
Date: January 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME To file post verdict Motions | |
December 27, 2022 | Short Calendar SC-13 #042 | ||
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/15/2022 HON CHARLES REED | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME Motion for Extension of Time re: Post Verdict Motions RESULT: Granted 12/15/2022 HON CHARLES REED | |
December 12, 2022 | Evidence | ||
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | INTERROGATORIES TO THE JURY | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | LIST OF EXHIBITS (JD-CL-28/JD-CL-28a) | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE | |
December 09, 2022 | Evidence | ||
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | VERDICT FOR DEFENDANT(S) RESULT: HON CHARLES REED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.