Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The Department Of Family And Protective Services, Wilcox, Ashleagh Ruth, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case against Phelps, Jamie Dwayne, Wilcox, Ashleagh Ruth, represented by Alicia Barkley, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Wilson, Robert H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilson, Robert H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 08, 2021 |
CategoryModify - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
This complaint is an original petition for protection of a child, conservatorship, and termination in a suit affecting the parent-child relationship. It is brought by the Department of Family and Protective Services ("the Department") in the District...
Mediated Settlement Agreement
Date: June 06, 2022Casa Court Report
Date: September 13, 2021Order
Date: January 26, 2022Motion
Date: January 04, 2022Family Service Plan
Date: September 29, 2021Kinship Caregiver Home Assessments
Date: August 04, 2021Appearance of Counsel
Date: April 27, 2021Docket Sheet
Date: June 04, 2021Family Service Plan
Date: May 24, 2021Report
Date: April 09, 2021Citation Returned Served
Date: April 13, 2021Request for Citation
Date: April 08, 2021Casa Court Report
Date: December 20, 2021Court of Continuing Jurisdiction
Date: July 20, 2021Kinship Caregiver Home Assessments
Date: May 27, 2021Department of Defense
Date: September 20, 2021Temporary Orders
Date: August 12, 2021Motion
Date: May 21, 2021Order For Drug Testing
Date: April 15, 2021Notice
Date: April 09, 2021Education Decision Maker
Date: April 09, 2021Permanency Report to the Court
Date: December 27, 2021Affidavit
Date: May 06, 2022Family Service Plan
Date: January 25, 2022Motion to Substitute Counsel
Date: August 20, 2021Permanency Report to the Court
Date: April 12, 2022Status Hearing Order
Date: July 21, 2021Notice Returned Served
Date: April 13, 2021Temporary Orders
Date: June 03, 2021Motion to Consolidate
Date: January 05, 2022Permanency Hearing Order
Date: October 25, 2021Permanency Report to the Court
Date: September 14, 2021Visitation Plan
Date: May 24, 2021Notification Regarding Consent for Medical Care
Date: June 15, 2021Original Answer
Date: April 27, 2021Kinship Caregiver Home Assessments
Date: August 06, 2021Certificate of Paternity Registry Search
Date: December 21, 2021Family Service Plan
Date: April 19, 2021Child Caregiver Resource Form
Date: April 09, 2021Discovery Control Plan
Date: April 08, 2021Amended Petition
Date: April 08, 2021Original Petition (OCA)
Date: April 08, 2021Docket Sheet
Date: August 13, 2021Certificate of Paternity Registry Search
Date: July 20, 2021Docket Sheet
Date: April 19, 2021Subpoena Returned Served
Date: May 25, 2022Preliminary Home Assessment
Date: April 09, 2021Order Substituting Counsel
Date: August 20, 2021Permanency Hearing Order
Date: January 26, 2022Citation
Date: April 09, 2021Motion
Date: December 29, 2021Scheduling Order
Date: April 08, 2021Family Service Plan
Date: July 28, 2021Status Report
Date: May 24, 2021Order
Date: June 03, 2021Notification Regarding Consent for Medical Care
Date: April 22, 2021Notification Regarding Consent for Medical Care
Date: April 09, 2021Order for Temporary Appointment of Ad Litems for Parents
Date: April 08, 2021Education Decision Maker
Date: July 07, 2021Casa Court Report
Date: May 26, 2021Petition in Intervention
Date: May 14, 2021Order to Consolidate
Date: January 05, 2022Order for Protection of a Child in an Emergency and Notice
Date: April 08, 2021Casa Court Report
Date: April 18, 2022Court of Continuing Jurisdiction
Date: November 29, 2021Family Service Plan
Date: September 14, 2021Permanency Report To the Court
Date: April 12, 2022Permanency Report To the Court
Date: December 27, 2021Permanency Report To the Court
Date: September 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
321 RR NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS-NO FINAL ORDER Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution |
|
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.)
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet : PAPERLESS Docket Sheet - Paperless |
|
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter to Court - Mediation Letter to Court |
|
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Mediated Settlement Agreement | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Mediated Settlement Agreement | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
321 RR SCHEDULING ORDER Scheduling Order Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Temporary Order (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.)
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet : PAPERLESS Docket Sheet - Paperless Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.