Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Energy Capital Credit Union, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jennifer Mccammon, against Maier, Theodore Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBays, Kristin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryContract Consumer/Comm/Debt >$100,000 But <$200,000 |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: November 01, 2019Order Granting Nonsuit
Date: October 31, 2019Signed Order
Date: October 04, 2019Order to Reinstate (OCA)
Date: October 04, 2019Motion to Reinstate
Date: September 05, 2019Dismissed for Want of Prosecution
Date: August 23, 2019Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: August 23, 2019Signed Order
Date: July 11, 2019Signed Order
Date: June 21, 2019Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: June 21, 2019Proposed Order
Date: June 13, 2019E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: December 31, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
No Fee Documents
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
No Fee Documents
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Order Dismiss for Want of Prosecution CANCELED Dismiss for Want of Prosecution (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Case Disposed Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Nonsuit Without Prejudice Order Granting Nonsuit Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Order Signed Order Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order for Reinstatement Order to Reinstate (OCA) Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin)
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.