Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Perez, Edgar, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by James Michael Moore, against Round Table Physicians Group, Pllc, Signature Care Emergency Center, represented by Melaine A. Rubinsky, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Ysmael D. Fonseca presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 07, 2019 |
CategoryCprc Chapter 12 |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeTransfer |
Certificate
Date: September 20, 2023Certificate
Date: September 19, 2023Certificate
Date: September 19, 2023Certificate
Date: September 12, 2023Certificate
Date: September 15, 2023Clerk's Certificate
Date: August 25, 2023Order to Transfer Case, Signed
Date: April 25, 2023Notice Sent
Date: July 10, 2023Status Hearing Order Signed
Date: July 10, 2023Notice of Appearance, Filed
Date: July 07, 2023Transfer to 476th District Court
Date: June 21, 2023Notice Sent
Date: June 28, 2023Notice
Date: June 23, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: June 27, 2023Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 25, 2022Cover Letter
Date: June 23, 2022Cover Letter
Date: June 22, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: January 24, 2020Notice Sent
Date: January 24, 2020Citation Issued
Date: June 11, 2019Notice
Date: June 11, 2019Original Petition (OCA)
Date: June 07, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Return Receipt Received FROM FORT BEND COUNTY FROM FORT BEND COUNTY Judge: Fonseca, Ysmael D., Jr. |
|
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate TRANSFER CERTIFICATE (ENVELOPE # 79734969) TRANSFER CERTIFICATE (ENVELOPE # 79734969) Judge: Fonseca, Ysmael D., Jr. |
|
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate TRANSFER CERTIFICATE 3 (ENVELOPE #79718763) TRANSFER CERTIFICATE 3 (ENVELOPE #79718763) Judge: Fonseca, Ysmael D., Jr. |
|
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate TRANSFER CERTIFICATE 2 (ENVELOPE # 79701117) TRANSFER CERTIFICATE 2 (ENVELOPE # 79701117) Judge: Fonseca, Ysmael D., Jr. |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate TRANSFER CERTIFICATE 1 (ENVELOPE # 79610793) NEW CASE NUMBER 23-DCV-308851 TRANSFER CERTIFICATE 1 (ENVELOPE # 79610793) NEW CASE NUMBER 23-DCV-308851 Judge: Fonseca, Ysmael D., Jr. |
|
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate TRANSFER TRANSFER Judge: Fonseca, Ysmael D., Jr. |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Certificate OF TRANSFER ENVELOPE #79403334 OF TRANSFER ENVELOPE #79403334 Judge: Fonseca, Ysmael D., Jr. |
|
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Entries ATTY MOORE PRESENT. ATTY RUBINSKY APPEARED VIA TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. ATTYS ANNOUNCED COURT HAS NO JURISDICTION. HIDALGO COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK TO SEND ORDER FROM 444TH DC TO MOVE CASE TO FORT BEND COUNTY. ATTY RUBINSKY TO COMMUNICATE WITH DISTRICT CLERK OFFICE ON ORDER. IF ORDER TO BE FILED TO ASSIST, JUDGE FONSECA GRANTS, OTBS. JUDGE FONSECA, E. RODRIGUEZ CT REPORTER. 7.13.23 MDL ATTY MOORE PRESENT. ATTY RUBINSKY APPEARED VIA TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. ATTYS ANNOUNCED COURT HAS NO JURISDICTION. HIDALGO COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK TO SEND ORDER FROM 444TH DC TO MOVE CASE TO FORT BEND COUNTY. ATTY RUBINSKY TO COMMUNICATE WITH DISTRICT CLERK OFFICE ON ORDER. IF ORDER TO BE FILED TO ASSIST, JUDGE FONSECA GRANTS, OTBS. JUDGE FONSECA, E. RODRIGUEZ CT REPORTER. 7.13.23 MDL Judge: Fonseca, Ysmael D., Jr. |
|
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Fonseca, Ysmael D., Jr.) TRANSFERRED CASE OSH BY COURT SIGNED 6.27.23 MDL Result: Held TRANSFERRED CASE OSH BY COURT SIGNED 6.27.23 MDL Judge: Fonseca, Ysmael D., Jr. |
|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER ON MOTION TO REQUEST TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER ON MOTION TO REQUEST TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR STATUS CONFERENCE Judge: Fonseca, Ysmael D., Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.