Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Broughton, Allen, Kretzer, Seth, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Roberts, Sean Alan, against Centerpoint Energy Houston Electric Llc, Centerpoint Inc, Tradesmen International Llc, Utility Service & Maintenance Inc, Roberts, Sean A, (total of 5) See All represented by Anand, Tarush R., Barger, Jessica Zavadil, Lucero, Gina A, Miller, Allison R, Moore, Colin William, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 125th with KYLE CARTER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKYLE CARTER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryPersonal Inj (Non-Auto) |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House125th |
Defendants Plea to the Jurisdiction and Original Answer
Date: January 27, 2020DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: February 03, 2020Exhibit A - 2020.01.15 1st Amended Petition
Date: March 02, 2020Intervention Receiver Original Petition
Date: December 26, 2019ORDER SIGNED GRANTING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION
Date: February 13, 2020ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION SIGNED
Date: March 03, 2020Motion to Strike Receiver's Plea in Intervention
Date: April 08, 2020Proposed Order
Date: May 01, 2020Proposed Agreed Protective Order
Date: March 03, 2020ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED
Date: March 30, 2020ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD
Date: June 12, 2020ORDER SIGNED DENYING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: October 28, 2020Plaintiff's Supplemental Designation of Expert Witnesses
Date: October 30, 2020Proposed Order
Date: January 07, 2021Proposed Order
Date: November 09, 2020Joint Motion for Trial Continuance, Extension of Deadlines, and Preferential Trial Setting
Date: January 07, 2021ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: January 11, 2021ORDER SIGNED GRANTING LEAVE TO DESIGNATE RESPONSIBLE 3RD PARTY
Date: February 24, 2021Proposed Order
Date: April 23, 2021PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION
Date: May 27, 2021Defendant Centerpoint Energy Houston Electric, LLC's First Amended Answer
Date: May 17, 2021ORDER SIGNED DENYING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 19, 2021Exhibit_17_James_Knorpp_Expert_Report
Date: June 04, 2021Proposed Order on CEHE's Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: May 21, 2021CEHE's Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Traditional Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: June 10, 2021ORDER SIGNED DENYING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: June 17, 2021Response to CenterPoint's Motion For Summary Judgment
Date: June 04, 2021Proposed Order Denying CEHE Motion For Summary Judgment
Date: June 11, 2021TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER SIGNED
Date: June 24, 2021Defendant CenterPoint Energy Houston Electric, LLC's Second Amended Answer
Date: July 30, 2021Plaintiff's Motion in Limine
Date: August 06, 2021ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD
Date: April 21, 2020Proposed Agreed Docket Control Order
Date: May 01, 2020Proposed Order
Date: October 02, 2020DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: May 04, 2020ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: May 04, 2020ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED
Date: May 18, 2020Unopposed Motion to Withdraw and for Substitution of Counsel
Date: May 19, 2020Proposed Order
Date: June 11, 2020Proposed Order
Date: June 12, 2020Rule 11 Agreement
Date: September 01, 2020Proposed Order
Date: October 13, 2020Proposed Order
Date: October 22, 2020Proposed Order Denying
Date: October 22, 2020TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER SIGNED
Date: December 07, 2020Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel
Date: October 13, 2020Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery of Defendant CenterPoint Energy Houston Electric, Llc
Date: January 22, 2020DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: January 19, 2021PROTECTIVE ORDER (CIVIL) ORD SGND
Date: March 03, 2020Defendant's Plea to the Jurisdiction and Original Answer
Date: January 27, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2022 |
TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR) Trial Setting |
||
January 07, 2022 |
DOCKET CALL (MOTION FOR) Trial Coordinators Docket |
||
September 06, 2021 |
TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR) Trial Setting |
||
September 06, 2021 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting |
||
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | TRIAL SETTING | |
August 27, 2021 |
DOCKET CALL (MOTION FOR) Trial Coordinators Docket PER JUDGE: DKT CANCELLED/RESET CASE |
||
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Reporter's Certification Deposition of Susan Rapant July 23,2021 | |
August 27, 2021 |
DOCKET CALL Trial Coordinators Docket |
||
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Proposed Jury Charge | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation and Contact Information |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.